Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Millwall - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-30 - 2018-12-05 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Imavere - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-16 - 2018-05-12 (4 months)
Chief Officer: E.R.Bristol - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-29 - 2017-12-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Giant Causeway - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-04 - 2017-06-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Caju - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-08 - 2016-09-09 (4 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft 103 - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-03-01 - 2018-11-15 (8 months)
Motorman: OCEAN GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-14 - 2018-10-26 (2 years)
Motorman: LOUKHI - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-15 - 2015-04-15 (7 months)
Motorman: VASILIY TATISCHEV - Dry Cargo / 2013-10-13 - 2014-05-12 (7 months)
Motorman: M LYRA CHEM LYRA - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-02 - 2012-11-30 (6 months)
Motorman: VIBORA - General cargo / 2009-11-10 - 2010-05-26 (7 months)
OS: HH EAST - Container Ship / 2018-01-08 - 2018-10-19 (9 months)
OS: Petr - General cargo / 2016-05-01 - 2016-10-10 (5 months)
OS: ALESSANDRA I - General cargo / 2015-07-08 - 2015-12-24 (6 months)
Chief Cook: C forse - Bunkering Vessel / 2018-07-09 - 2018-10-18 (3 months)
Chief Cook: Silver soul - RO-RO / 2017-06-30 - 2018-01-28 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Sunrise - Oil tanker / 2015-06-21 - 2015-12-03 (5 months)
Cook: Ангаз - LPG / LNG / 2013-07-11 - 2013-11-09 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Звенигород - Barge / 2018-08-09 - 2018-10-05 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: MIR - Passenger vessel / 2018-06-16 - 2018-09-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2018-06-16 - 2018-09-11 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: JABAL ALI-3 - RO-RO / 2018-02-01 - 2018-09-04 (7 months)
AB Seaman: mv GULF PEARL - Well-stimulation vessel / 2018-02-01 - 2018-08-26 (7 months)
AB Seaman: mv Mecta S - General cargo / 2014-08-30 - 2015-03-31 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Геркулес - Tug boat / 2018-06-02 - 2018-08-22 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Геркулес - Tug boat / 2017-06-04 - 2017-12-25 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Геркулес - Tug boat / 2016-10-11 - 2017-02-06 (4 months)
Motorman: ВК-1 - Barge / 2016-03-20 - 2016-08-27 (5 months)
Motorman: ВК-1 - Barge / 2015-03-25 - 2015-10-26 (7 months)
Staff Chief Engineer: Silver Whisper - Passenger vessel / 2018-06-16 - 2018-08-03 (2 months)
Staff Chief Engineer: Silver Whisper - Passenger vessel / 2018-01-12 - 2018-04-12 (3 months)
Staff Chief Engineer: Silver Whisper - Passenger vessel / 2016-12-08 - 2018-02-22 (1 year)
Staff Chief Engineer: Silver Shadow - Passenger vessel / 2017-09-22 - 2017-12-19 (3 months)
Staff Chief Engineer: Silver Whisper - Passenger vessel / 2017-07-20 - 2017-09-12 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Dubreka - Reefer / 2018-01-17 - 2018-07-21 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Dubreka - Reefer / 2017-01-19 - 2017-07-07 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Varma - Icebreaker / 2018-06-01 - 2018-07-01 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Volgo-Don 207 - General cargo / 2018-03-22 - 2018-06-15 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: MAERSK VOLTA - Container Ship / 2017-11-23 - 2018-05-23 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Riace - Ferry / 2018-04-09 - 2018-04-20 (11 days)
Ref. Engineer: Marseille - Container Ship / 2017-09-26 - 2018-03-13 (5 months)
Ref. Engineer: CMA CGM Mekong - Container Ship / 2016-12-13 - 2017-05-27 (5 months)
Ref. Engineer: Maersk Saltoro - Container Ship / 2015-12-13 - 2016-05-28 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Maersk Saltoro - Container Ship / 2015-07-24 - 2015-12-12 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Afina - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-10 - 2014-12-20 (6 months)
2nd Officer: YM WORTH - Container Ship / 2017-09-22 - 2018-03-13 (6 months)
2nd Officer: YM Wish - Container Ship / 2016-10-03 - 2017-04-03 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantic Hero - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-03 - 2018-03-07 (6 months)