Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB / Motorman: Bugaz - Training Ship / 2020-09-01 - 2020-11-04 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Bugaz - Training Ship / 2020-06-18 - 2020-08-21 (2 months)
Messman: NAMEJS - General cargo / 2020-10-01 - 2020-10-31 (1 month)
OS: ELITA - General cargo / 2019-12-21 - 2020-10-31 (10 months)
Motorman: Salvinia - General cargo / 2019-11-13 - 2020-10-20 (11 months)
Wiper: Rishabh - Tug boat / 2020-02-24 - 2020-10-17 (8 months)
Messman: SEA TIGER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-07 - 2020-10-10 (11 months)
4th Engineer: Anton Gurin - Reefer / 2020-06-28 - 2020-10-08 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Posh Radiant - AHTS / 2019-10-20 - 2020-09-29 (11 months)
2nd Engineer: Zakher Commander - AHTS / 2019-06-30 - 2019-07-03 (3 days)
2nd Engineer: Zakher Alpfa - AHTS / 2019-03-26 - 2019-06-29 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Zakher Emperor - AHTS / 2018-11-10 - 2019-02-13 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Zakher Emperor - AHTS / 2018-05-26 - 2018-09-02 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Gaz Serenity - LPG / LNG / 2020-05-20 - 2020-09-21 (4 months)
Junior officer: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-27 - 2020-01-18 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Seagas Governor - LPG / LNG / 2018-04-23 - 2019-01-08 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: RIL - Tug boat / 2020-06-01 - 2020-09-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: т/х "ОМ - 106"пасажирское ,п. Херсон - Passenger vessel / 2020-06-08 - 2020-08-31 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: MB 304 - Tug boat / 2020-06-15 - 2020-08-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Druzhba - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: TSV "Druzhba" - Sailing Vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 month)
El. Engineer: Balthasar Schulte - Container Ship / 2020-02-10 - 2020-08-10 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Lilly Schulte - Container Ship / 2019-06-20 - 2019-09-23 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Т/Х "ПИНГВИН" - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-28 - 2020-07-31 (2 months)
4th Engineer: M.v CERULEAN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-11 - 2020-07-30 (10 months)
Master: Zhenis - Crew boat / 2020-03-14 - 2020-07-30 (5 months)
Master: Zhenis - Crew boat / 2013-05-25 - 2018-04-25 (4 years)
Master: Al Towfan - Tug boat / 2012-09-07 - 2012-12-16 (3 months)
Master: Al Towfan - Tug boat / 2012-03-24 - 2012-06-07 (2 months)
Master: Al Towfan - Tug boat / 2011-09-21 - 2011-12-25 (3 months)
OS: MSC Giannina - Container Ship / 2019-11-26 - 2020-07-19 (8 months)
OS: MSC Clea - Container Ship / 2018-08-29 - 2019-04-01 (7 months)
OS: MSC Federica - Container Ship / 2017-12-22 - 2018-07-21 (7 months)
OS: MSC Lena F - Container Ship / 2017-07-24 - 2017-11-30 (4 months)
4th Engineer: M/V Ocean Drover - Livestock / 2020-01-05 - 2020-07-07 (6 months)
4th Engineer: M/V Ocean Swagman - Livestock / 2019-03-28 - 2019-08-17 (5 months)
4th Engineer: M/V Ocean Swagman - Livestock / 2018-06-30 - 2018-11-13 (4 months)