Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Electric Cadet: No experience - Container Ship / 2020-12-18 - 2021-03-04 (2 months)
Master: Seychelles Patriot - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-09 - 2021-03-04 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: None - NAVY / 2021-03-01 - 2021-03-04 (3 days)
Deck Cadet: None - NAVY / 2018-05-10 - 2019-03-12 (10 months)
Boatswain: Topaz Don - General cargo / 2020-10-09 - 2021-03-03 (5 months)
Boatswain: Topaz Don - General cargo / 2020-05-03 - 2020-07-07 (2 months)
Motorman: Topaz Belay - General cargo / 2020-01-15 - 2020-03-16 (2 months)
Trainee OS: SAN ANTONIO - Container Ship / 2020-11-06 - 2021-02-22 (4 months)
Trainee OS: OM 106 - Other vessels / 2019-07-18 - 2019-08-31 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Sochi-14, - Training Ship / 2020-08-17 - 2021-02-19 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Mt Carlton - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-06 - 2021-02-18 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Mt Gulf Sunrise - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-23 - 2020-01-08 (6 months)
Motorman-welder: Aurelia - RO-RO / 2020-08-31 - 2021-02-13 (5 months)
Motorman: Patriot - Tug boat / 2019-02-28 - 2019-03-29 (1 month)
AB Seaman: OLUTORSKY - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-26 - 2021-02-10 (4 months)
Master: Conceptum - Yacht / 2020-08-01 - 2021-02-01 (6 months)
Master: Lotus 1 - Yacht / 2016-09-01 - 2020-02-01 (3 years)
Engine Cadet: Malburg - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-21 - 2021-01-31 (6 months)
OS: Atlantic Hermes - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-01 - 2021-01-29 (6 months)
OS: Atlantic Hermes - Fishing vessel / 2019-05-26 - 2019-10-13 (5 months)
Motorman: NUNAVIK - OBO / 2020-05-26 - 2020-12-11 (6 months)
Motorman: NUNAVIK - OBO / 2019-05-28 - 2019-12-28 (7 months)
Motorman: NUNAVIK - OBO / 2018-11-12 - 2019-05-06 (6 months)
Motorman: NUNAVIK - OBO / 2017-11-09 - 2018-04-15 (5 months)
Motorman: NUNAVIK - OBO / 2016-08-15 - 2017-03-31 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Mt oluwaseun - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-29 - 2020-12-01 (10 months)
Motorman: M.Andreev - General cargo / 2020-07-22 - 2020-11-27 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Brothers 7 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-25 - 2019-07-31 (2 months)
El. Engineer: NISYROS - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-20 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
El. Engineer: ITHAKI - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-17 - 2020-01-14 (6 months)
El. Engineer: kalolimnos - LPG / LNG / 2018-09-15 - 2019-03-02 (5 months)
ETO: Anaphi - LPG / LNG / 2017-11-15 - 2018-05-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2020-09-15 - 2020-11-17 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: LT BERYL - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2019-04-24 - 2020-11-16 (1 year)
AB Seaman: ZEYA - Container Ship / 2020-06-06 - 2020-11-14 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezhda - Training Ship / 2018-10-11 - 2018-12-12 (2 months)
Deckhand: Boris Pevkin - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-01 - 2020-11-09 (2 months)