Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Nevsky-30 - Dry Cargo / 2021-05-18 - 2021-07-18 (2 months)
3rd Officer: MT LADY VIK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-08 - 2021-07-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: MT-UNDINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-18 - 2020-11-18 (4 months)
OS: Aleksandr Beliakov - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-04 - 2021-07-07 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: Ocean Black Rhino - Drilling platform / 2021-05-20 - 2021-06-30 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Burgas - Tug boat / 2021-04-28 - 2021-06-29 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Wislaborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-02-16 - 2021-06-27 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-10 - 2020-10-04 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-07 - 2020-01-08 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Vechtborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-01 - 2018-12-16 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Hilke - General cargo / 2020-12-10 - 2021-06-25 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Hilke - General cargo / 2019-11-20 - 2020-06-24 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Palabora - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-03-23 - 2019-07-28 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Palabora - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-07-08 - 2018-11-19 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Palabora - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-11-16 - 2018-03-23 (4 months)
ETO: CMA CGM MISSOURI - Container Ship / 2020-11-29 - 2021-06-04 (6 months)
ETO: CMA CGM MISSOURI - Container Ship / 2020-01-22 - 2020-05-13 (4 months)
ETO: CMA CGM MISSOURI - Container Ship / 2019-05-10 - 2019-09-13 (4 months)
ETO: CMA CGM MISSOURI - Container Ship / 2018-09-07 - 2018-12-29 (4 months)
ETO: CMA CGM MISSOURI - Container Ship / 2017-11-22 - 2018-05-02 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantic Orion - Fishing vessel / 2021-03-07 - 2021-06-03 (3 months)
2nd Officer: ABI - General cargo / 2021-02-08 - 2021-05-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: queen zein - General cargo / 2015-09-03 - 2016-06-21 (10 months)
AB / Motorman: Ocean emarald - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-12 - 2021-05-11 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: Ocean emarald - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-20 - 2020-10-10 (1 year)
AB / Motorman: Hqua honer - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-01 - 2019-07-07 (10 months)
AB / Motorman: Msc Giselle - Container Ship / 2017-08-22 - 2018-05-14 (9 months)
AB / Motorman: Msc Didem - Container Ship / 2016-09-21 - 2017-03-29 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Barcelona - Training Ship / 2020-04-07 - 2021-05-04 (1 year)
Cook: sei vale - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-30 - 2021-04-30 (0 days)
2nd Officer: M.T Orkim Wisdom - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-12 - 2021-04-28 (8 months)
Chief Steward: Sea Partner - RO-RO / 2016-06-20 - 2021-04-27 (4 years)
Chief Steward: Sea Partner - RO-RO / 2013-05-04 - 2013-08-04 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: POLA PACIFIC - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-08 - 2021-04-24 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Oneriva 42 - General cargo / 2020-11-27 - 2021-04-23 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Oneriva 42 - General cargo / 2020-06-27 - 2020-11-11 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Orel 6 - General cargo / 2019-12-12 - 2020-03-20 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Port olya 1 - General cargo / 2019-07-06 - 2019-10-04 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Skif V - General cargo / 2018-12-09 - 2019-04-11 (4 months)
Oiler: wasaaa - NAVY / 2019-10-01 - 2021-04-01 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Sochi 14 - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-17 - 2021-03-31 (7 months)
Medical Officer: Emerald Driller - Jack-up Platform / 2021-01-21 - 2021-03-28 (2 months)