Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: M/V Maria Xenia - RO-RO / 2019-06-21 - 2020-06-21 (1 year)
Oiler: Magellan - Cruise Liner / 2020-05-02 - 2020-06-13 (1 month)
Oiler: Columbus - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-07 - 2020-05-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Tatarbunary - General cargo / 2017-10-20 - 2017-12-15 (2 months)
OS: Стивидор - Repair Vessel / 2020-03-20 - 2020-05-22 (2 months)
Cook: Sormovskiy 121 - General cargo / 2019-12-15 - 2020-04-30 (4 months)
Master: RELIANCE - Bunkering Vessel / 2015-11-16 - 2020-04-01 (4 years)
1st Officer: MT .SENTEK 8 - Bunkering Vessel / 2010-09-16 - 2015-01-02 (4 years)
Motorman: Могучий буксир - Tug boat / 2020-01-20 - 2020-03-24 (2 months)
Motorman: Princess Nicole - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-04 - 2020-03-07 (7 months)
Chief Officer: PANDA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-30 - 2020-03-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ALBY MELODY - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-22 - 2019-05-22 (6 months)
Chief Officer: OURA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-17 - 2017-11-15 (5 months)
Chief Officer: SILVER SUN - RO-RO / 2016-04-20 - 2016-10-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: SILVER SUN - RO-RO / 2015-01-23 - 2015-09-02 (7 months)
Receptionist: Carnival pride - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-02 - 2020-03-02 (9 months)
Receptionist: Carnival pride - AHT / 2019-06-09 - 2020-03-01 (9 months)
Waitress: SEA Princess - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-25 - 2020-02-25 (6 months)
Waitress: Royal princess - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-04 - 2019-05-04 (6 months)
Master: Seychelles Prelude - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-16 - 2020-02-16 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: OML INTERVENTION II - Accomodation barge / 2019-11-13 - 2020-02-14 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: OML JACOB - Accomodation barge / 2019-04-04 - 2019-09-18 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MCP Graz - Container Ship / 2019-09-09 - 2020-01-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MCP Graz - Container Ship / 2018-09-05 - 2019-04-12 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MCP Graz - Container Ship / 2017-11-21 - 2018-05-01 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Joanna Borchard - Container Ship / 2016-10-18 - 2017-04-19 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Aman - Container Ship / 2016-01-16 - 2016-08-26 (7 months)
Cook: M.T STROVOLOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-10 - 2020-01-16 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: My queen - General cargo / 2019-01-03 - 2020-01-11 (1 year)
Single Engineer: Hanna - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-23 - 2020-01-09 (5 months)
Single Engineer: Hanna - Dry Cargo / 2018-12-21 - 2019-04-22 (4 months)
Single Engineer: Hanna /V2CE6/ - General cargo / 2018-04-08 - 2018-08-17 (4 months)
Single Engineer: Hanna /V2CE6/ - General cargo / 2017-07-26 - 2017-12-01 (4 months)
2nd Electrical Engineer: waetaewstasta - Yacht / 2019-12-27 - 2019-12-30 (3 days)
2nd ETO: eharahgadhg - Other vessels / 2019-12-27 - 2019-12-29 (2 days)
Master: PORT MOODY - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-03 - 2019-12-14 (4 months)
Master: ANAVATOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-06 - 2018-03-31 (5 months)
Master: TROITSKIY BRIDGE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-01-23 - 2017-06-22 (5 months)
Master: NS SILVER - Chemical tanker / 2016-03-21 - 2016-08-17 (5 months)
Master: TVERSKOY BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-06-07 - 2015-10-09 (4 months)
Carpenter: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-08 - 2019-12-07 (6 months)
Carpenter: Astoria - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-08 - 2019-04-13 (5 months)
Carpenter: Riviera - Passenger vessel / 2018-08-06 - 2018-09-06 (1 month)
Carpenter: Norwegian Breakaway - Cruise Liner / 2018-04-27 - 2018-05-11 (14 days)
Electric Cadet: BATM ZAMOSKVORECHYE - Fishing vessel / 2019-05-16 - 2019-11-13 (6 months)