Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: БМТ Борис Бутма - Bunkering Vessel / 2015-04-27 - 2016-09-24 (1 year)
AB Seaman: ПУС Надежда - Crew boat / 2014-02-23 - 2014-07-05 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Херсонес - Training Ship / 2016-06-16 - 2016-09-16 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: ST-174 - Tug boat / 2016-06-01 - 2016-08-01 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: ZAMORA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-06-15 - 2016-07-15 (1 month)
OS: Kapitan petrushevsky - Dry Cargo / 2016-02-12 - 2016-06-28 (5 months)
OS: m/vDelfin - Reefer / 2015-05-25 - 2015-07-27 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V West Ocean 5 - Dry Cargo / 2015-06-15 - 2016-06-18 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: M/V West Ocean 5 - Dry Cargo / 2016-06-14 - 2016-06-15 (1 day)
Boatswain: Рoseydon 1 - Reefer / 2015-04-04 - 2016-05-05 (1 year)
Boatswain: KHOLMSK - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-17 - 2014-01-23 (7 months)
Boatswain: pacific breez - Reefer / 2011-03-26 - 2011-10-15 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: "Alina" - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-23 - 2016-01-28 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: " Atlas-4" - Crane vessel / 2015-04-03 - 2015-11-17 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Myrte - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-04-22 - 2016-01-21 (9 months)
3rd Engineer: Uta - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-03-15 - 2015-07-15 (2 years)
Motorman: Kuyalnitskaye - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-08 - 2015-08-10 (11 months)
4th Engineer: Amanda - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-28 - 2015-02-04 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Alpena - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-13 - 2014-05-08 (8 months)
Motorman: Iron Kovdor - Bulk Carrier / 2012-08-13 - 2013-03-01 (7 months)
Motorman: Arnica - Bulk Carrier / 2011-10-15 - 2012-04-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Astana - Bulk Carrier / 2011-03-20 - 2011-08-04 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MOL EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2014-04-22 - 2014-11-03 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SOFIA - Tug boat / 2012-05-21 - 2012-08-22 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Stellar Maestro - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-06-11 - 2014-10-17 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Catrin-1 - General cargo / 2014-03-18 - 2014-09-19 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Magdalena , wybor , ahora - General cargo / 2010-10-10 - 2011-10-10 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: m/v taba - RO-RO / 2013-09-26 - 2014-03-30 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Four Aida - Platform Supply vessel / 2013-03-06 - 2013-09-03 (6 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Cote D`ivorian Star - Reefer / 2013-09-10 - 2013-11-15 (2 months)
Electrician: Nadeen - General cargo / 2012-08-18 - 2013-03-09 (7 months)
Boatswain: Dalmatia - RO-RO / 2013-04-28 - 2013-07-31 (3 months)
Boatswain: Anna Marine - RO-RO / 2012-03-27 - 2012-09-24 (6 months)
Boatswain: Trefin Adam - Chemical tanker / 2011-08-18 - 2011-10-18 (2 months)
Boatswain: Nordic Helsinki - Chemical tanker / 2009-05-27 - 2009-09-29 (4 months)
Boatswain: Nordic Stokholm - Chemical tanker / 2008-10-24 - 2009-03-16 (5 months)
2nd Officer: deep sea bird - Cement Carrier / 2013-01-01 - 2013-07-02 (6 months)
2nd Officer: SEA DEEP - Bulk Carrier / 2012-07-11 - 2013-01-02 (6 months)
2nd Officer: ocean 1 - Dry Cargo / 2011-07-14 - 2011-12-30 (6 months)
OS: MSC VERONIQUE - Container Ship / 2013-02-22 - 2013-05-30 (3 months)
OS: BLACKBIRD - General cargo / 2011-11-11 - 2012-04-21 (5 months)
OS: BALTICFAVOUR - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-07-02 - 2011-09-16 (2 months)
AB Seaman: DIPLOMAT - RO-RO / 2010-12-10 - 2011-03-20 (3 months)
AB Seaman: VICTOR TALALIKHIN - RO-RO / 2008-09-05 - 2009-03-01 (6 months)