Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Brothers Way - General cargo / 2012-12-08 - 2013-05-27 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Vilkovo - General cargo / 2011-12-14 - 2012-06-15 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Winner S - Dry Cargo / 2011-09-29 - 2011-11-19 (2 months)
Cook: Abai - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-12-23 - 2013-04-14 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Topaz Jafiliya - AHTS / 2012-12-11 - 2013-03-16 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Topaz Jumeirah - AHTS / 2012-09-11 - 2012-11-10 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Topaz Jumeirah - AHTS / 2012-03-04 - 2012-07-13 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Topaz Jafiliya - AHTS / 2012-02-10 - 2012-02-26 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Topaz Jumeirah - AHTS / 2011-12-17 - 2012-02-10 (2 months)
Motorman: Atlas - Container Ship / 2011-08-28 - 2013-01-14 (1 year)
OS: Горск - Fishing vessel / 2012-04-16 - 2012-11-01 (7 months)
El. Engineer: OTTO SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2012-05-30 - 2012-09-28 (4 months)
El. Engineer: RUBINA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2011-10-28 - 2012-02-13 (4 months)
El. Engineer: RUBINA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2011-04-04 - 2011-07-28 (4 months)
El. Engineer: RUBINA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2009-11-13 - 2010-03-15 (4 months)
El. Engineer: RUBINA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2009-03-07 - 2009-07-17 (4 months)
OS: m/t Arctic Bay - tanker / 2010-08-09 - 2011-03-23 (7 months)
OS: m/t Baltic Sea 1 - tanker / 2009-10-27 - 2010-04-24 (6 months)
OS: m/tBaltic Captain 1 - tanker / 2008-10-13 - 2009-05-03 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: EIT PALOMA - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-03-08 - 2012-08-23 (5 months)
OS: Novaya Zemlya - Reefer / 2012-01-07 - 2012-07-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Rainbow - Bulk Carrier / 2011-07-14 - 2011-08-09 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: Seafox - Drilling vessel / 2010-06-15 - 2012-03-25 (1 year)
OS: Korec - Tug boat / 2011-06-21 - 2012-02-10 (8 months)
OS: Korec - Tug boat / 2010-06-18 - 2010-09-20 (3 months)
OS: Gulf Deffi - Chemical tanker / 2011-08-06 - 2012-01-14 (5 months)
OS: Parkway - FSO / 2011-02-16 - 2011-05-27 (3 months)
Mess Boy: Fernie - Bulk Carrier / 2010-02-23 - 2010-08-14 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: HOEGH AMERICA - RO-RO / 2011-08-24 - 2012-01-12 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ADELINE DELMAS - Dry Cargo / 2010-10-09 - 2011-04-09 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: DELPHINE DELMAS - General cargo / 2009-11-19 - 2010-06-01 (6 months)
4th Engineer: DELMAS KISSAMA - Container Ship / 2009-09-15 - 2009-11-02 (2 months)
4th Engineer: KAMINA - Container Ship / 2009-03-09 - 2009-06-02 (3 months)
OS: Диорит - Research vessel / 2011-09-30 - 2011-12-01 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Sinbad - Chemical tanker / 2011-03-22 - 2011-11-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Sinbad - Chemical tanker / 2010-08-26 - 2010-11-23 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Sinbad - Chemical tanker / 2010-02-26 - 2010-06-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sinbad - Chemical tanker / 2009-07-22 - 2009-11-25 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sinbad - Chemical tanker / 2008-11-17 - 2009-03-29 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: BBC Nordland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-03-07 - 2011-09-16 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Pride of Telemark - RO-RO / 2010-06-11 - 2010-08-15 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Pride of Telemark - RO-RO / 2009-12-16 - 2010-04-23 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Pride of Telemark - RO-RO / 2008-11-24 - 2009-04-03 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Moorgate - Bulk Carrier / 2007-11-13 - 2008-07-12 (8 months)
Steward: Energy Power - Chemical tanker / 2010-12-24 - 2011-06-29 (6 months)
Steward: Energy Power - Chemical tanker / 2010-04-02 - 2010-08-01 (4 months)
ETO: CSCL NAPOLI - Container Ship / 2010-10-20 - 2011-02-13 (4 months)
ETO: MATE - Container Ship / 2010-04-28 - 2010-09-28 (5 months)
Electrician: ITAL UNIVERSO - Container Ship / 2009-09-06 - 2010-01-10 (4 months)
Electrician: SIDER SUN - Bulk Carrier / 2008-11-04 - 2009-05-17 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Filia Joy - Bulk Carrier / 2010-04-24 - 2010-10-22 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nats Emperor - Bulk Carrier / 2009-05-09 - 2010-01-18 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Sail - Dry Cargo / 2010-08-16 - 2010-10-07 (2 months)
2nd Officer: New Gemini - Bulk Carrier / 2008-10-15 - 2009-07-09 (9 months)
2nd Officer: Venedikt Andrev - Reefer / 2008-02-16 - 2008-07-06 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Sormovsky-119 - Coaster / 2007-10-10 - 2007-12-25 (2 months)