Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: Lotta Auerbach - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-11-16 - 2019-03-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Industrial Guide - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-02-12 - 2017-06-04 (1 year)
4th Engineer: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2018-08-09 - 2019-03-20 (7 months)
4th Engineer: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-10 - 2018-03-01 (8 months)
4th Engineer: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2016-06-22 - 2017-01-17 (7 months)
4th Engineer: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2015-04-30 - 2015-12-29 (8 months)
OS: Grigoleti - Fishing vessel / 2019-01-09 - 2019-03-12 (2 months)
OS: Artey - General cargo / 2018-10-19 - 2019-03-10 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Artey - General cargo / 2018-02-19 - 2018-07-10 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mv.Ceylon Princess - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-24 - 2019-02-08 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: KMRK - Tug boat / 2018-11-29 - 2019-02-04 (2 months)
Electrician: ARGO - General cargo / 2018-08-01 - 2019-02-03 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: ПК-59 - Crane vessel / 2018-04-10 - 2018-04-23 (13 days)
Cook: M/v Vasiliy Tatishev - General cargo / 2018-10-22 - 2019-02-03 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Linau 6 - Container Ship / 2017-07-14 - 2019-02-02 (1 year)
Chief Cook: Авангард - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-16 - 2018-12-16 (5 months)
Chief Cook: СильверАйс - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-28 - 2017-12-27 (6 months)
Chief Cook: СильверАйс - Fishing vessel / 2016-06-27 - 2016-12-27 (6 months)
Chief Cook: АтласДабл - Crane vessel / 2016-02-22 - 2016-04-05 (1 month)
Chief Steward: Атлас Дабл - Crane vessel / 2015-12-05 - 2016-01-10 (1 month)
Motorman: Ovit - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-06 - 2018-11-29 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Maganari - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-25 - 2018-04-05 (11 days)
Motorman: Bentley 1 - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-11 - 2017-08-12 (5 months)
Motorman: Someri - Tug boat / 2014-03-18 - 2014-10-23 (7 months)
2nd Officer: HOHERIFF - Container Ship / 2018-06-06 - 2018-11-21 (5 months)
2nd Officer: SINA - Container Ship / 2017-05-02 - 2017-11-06 (6 months)
2nd Officer: SINA - Container Ship / 2016-03-24 - 2016-09-29 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Black Sea Glory - General cargo / 2014-12-21 - 2015-06-19 (6 months)
3rd Officer: OSLO - General cargo / 2014-07-28 - 2014-12-19 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2018-09-12 - 2018-11-15 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Leonid Khotkin - General cargo / 2018-05-28 - 2018-11-12 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Pryazha - General cargo / 2017-02-11 - 2017-11-08 (9 months)
AB Seaman: KESTREL I - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-12 - 2018-11-10 (8 months)
OS: "Вега" - Dry Cargo / 2012-10-21 - 2012-12-30 (2 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Green Selje - Reefer / 2018-06-06 - 2018-11-08 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Green Selje - Reefer / 2017-10-09 - 2018-03-08 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Samskip Glacier - Reefer / 2017-04-01 - 2017-07-06 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Wind Forrader - Other vessels / 2014-03-31 - 2014-08-08 (4 months)
Motorman: "Kompozitor Rakhmaninov" - RO-RO / 2018-04-27 - 2018-11-04 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Vadim Klyuev - Tug boat / 2018-05-08 - 2018-10-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: M.V COSCO SHIPPING PANAMA - Container Ship / 2018-04-01 - 2018-10-10 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Eurobrave - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-03-20 - 2018-10-04 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nerissa - VLCC / 2016-11-04 - 2017-05-23 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nordic Moon - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-09-01 - 2016-05-15 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: MCT Stockhorn - Chemical tanker / 2014-09-04 - 2015-04-04 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: MCT Monte Rosa - Chemical tanker / 2013-12-06 - 2014-06-15 (6 months)