Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Abdias Nascimento - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-17 - 2020-02-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Anita Garibaldi - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-03 - 2019-07-03 (6 months)
Store Keeper: NAVIGATOR OF THE SEAS - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-14 - 2020-02-08 (8 months)
OS: Alexander von humbolted - Container Ship / 2019-07-27 - 2020-01-23 (6 months)
OS: Harbour ruby - Container Ship / 2018-03-22 - 2019-05-20 (1 year)
3rd Officer: HSL Paraty - Container Ship / 2019-10-18 - 2020-01-11 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Najla McCall - AHTS / 2019-10-20 - 2020-01-06 (3 months)
Safety and Operations Manager: Crossway Dolphin - Jack-up Platform / 2018-11-05 - 2020-01-05 (1 year)
Safety and Operations Manager: Crossway Eagle - Accommodation barge / 2013-11-05 - 2016-08-24 (2 years)
Chief Officer: Etesco Millennium - Semi-submersible platform / 2012-08-01 - 2013-05-24 (10 months)
Master: Merweborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-21 - 2019-12-19 (3 months)
Master: Merweborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-20 - 2019-05-28 (4 months)
Master: Merweborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-03 - 2018-11-06 (3 months)
1st Officer: Lenneborg - General cargo / 2018-03-11 - 2018-06-12 (3 months)
1st Officer: Lenneborg - General cargo / 2017-08-14 - 2017-11-27 (3 months)
Motorist: PATRIA SEAWAYS - RO-RO / 2019-09-29 - 2019-12-18 (3 months)
Motorist: РК КОНКВЕСТ - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-04-24 - 2017-06-24 (2 months)
1st Officer: COSCO FORTUNE - Container Ship / 2019-06-30 - 2019-12-14 (5 months)
Motorman: M.V. Quebec express - Container Ship / 2019-02-12 - 2019-12-04 (10 months)
Motorman: M.V. Saga Fjord - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-21 - 2018-08-17 (11 months)
Motorman: M.V. Saga Adventure - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-12 - 2016-10-18 (10 months)
Motorman: M.V. Ottawa express - Container Ship / 2014-09-07 - 2015-06-08 (9 months)
Motorman: M.V. Milan express - Container Ship / 2013-09-28 - 2014-06-06 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
Pumpman: Energy Panter - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-29 - 2019-11-21 (5 months)
Pumpman: Energy Progress - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-15 - 2018-11-28 (7 months)
Pumpman: Energy Progress - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-13 - 2017-09-23 (7 months)
Pumpman: Energy Panter - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-26 - 2016-09-16 (3 months)
Pumpman: Energy Progress - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-04-27 - 2015-11-30 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Novator - Tug boat / 2019-09-02 - 2019-11-04 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Bulat - Tug boat / 2019-04-01 - 2019-06-26 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: Dunaiskii-45 - Tug boat / 2019-07-04 - 2019-11-04 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Balt-Flot4 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-21 - 2019-10-27 (6 months)
Steward: Grand Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-04 - 2019-10-21 (6 months)
Bartender: Celebrity millennium - Cruise Liner / 2018-06-14 - 2019-04-15 (10 months)
Steward: Celebrity Silhouette - Cruise Liner / 2016-01-17 - 2017-09-14 (1 year)
OS: ot-2064 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-01 - 2019-10-19 (7 months)
2nd Officer: M/V STARVIP - General cargo / 2019-02-27 - 2019-10-13 (8 months)
2nd Officer: M/V STARVIP - General cargo / 2017-12-02 - 2018-07-20 (8 months)
2nd Officer: M/V AMBRA - General cargo / 2017-02-22 - 2017-10-04 (7 months)
2nd Officer: M/V STARVIP - General cargo / 2016-06-01 - 2016-11-27 (6 months)
3rd Officer: M/V STARVIP - General cargo / 2016-05-19 - 2016-06-01 (13 days)
Deck Cadet: Vega Star - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-14 - 2019-10-12 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mol globe - Container Ship / 2018-06-22 - 2019-01-21 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: REYMAR - General cargo / 2019-05-18 - 2019-09-18 (4 months)