Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: m/v Catharine - General cargo / 2017-03-08 - 2017-08-07 (5 months)
OS: m/v Chelsea-1 - General cargo / 2016-02-27 - 2016-10-16 (8 months)
OS: Капитан Меркулов - Tug boat / 2017-05-22 - 2017-07-22 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Djiadi 17 - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-07-30 - 2017-07-11 (1 year)
OS: T/V ORIENT TRANZIT - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-12 - 2017-06-30 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: LAGGAR - General cargo / 2016-05-30 - 2016-08-13 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Polkovnik Fesenko - General cargo / 2017-02-16 - 2017-06-19 (4 months)
Cook: Zamoskvorechye - Fishing vessel / 2016-12-20 - 2017-06-06 (6 months)
Ref. Engineer: Swedish Reefer - Other vessels / 2016-11-27 - 2017-05-13 (6 months)
Ref. Engineer: Italia Reefer - Other vessels / 2015-11-22 - 2016-05-13 (6 months)
Ref. Engineer: Brazilian Reefer - Other vessels / 2014-11-09 - 2015-05-25 (7 months)
Ref. Engineer: Brazilian Reefer - Other vessels / 2013-07-01 - 2013-12-23 (6 months)
Ref. Engineer: Peruvian Reefer - Other vessels / 2012-03-23 - 2012-06-07 (2 months)
Motorman-electrician: РК"КОНКВЕСТ" п.Усть-Дунайськ - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-16 - 2017-04-28 (2 months)
OS: Пожежне судно "Пивденний" - Training Ship / 2017-02-20 - 2017-04-23 (2 months)
2nd Officer: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-12 - 2017-04-23 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Ocean Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-25 - 2016-07-09 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Ocean Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-19 - 2015-09-23 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Arman 2 - General cargo / 2014-09-12 - 2014-12-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Focus PHNOM PENH - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-16 - 2017-03-30 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Gulf Lion Того - Dry Cargo / 2015-06-02 - 2015-08-30 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Academik Boris Petrov - Research vessel / 2016-08-19 - 2017-03-29 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Spring Bay 1987 cranes - Reefer / 2015-05-25 - 2015-09-26 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Spring Bay 1987 cranes - Reefer / 2014-10-29 - 2015-03-25 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Spring Bay 1987 cranes - Reefer / 2014-01-03 - 2014-09-07 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Academik Boris Petrov - Research vessel / 2013-03-05 - 2013-07-16 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantica HAV - General cargo / 2016-11-14 - 2017-02-24 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Pregol HAV - General cargo / 2016-03-05 - 2016-06-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Combi Dock 1 - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-08-20 - 2017-02-23 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nuclear Power Plant, Republic of Belarus - Chemical tanker / 2014-02-24 - 2015-10-02 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Artabaz - Container Ship / 2016-09-09 - 2017-02-22 (5 months)
4th Engineer: artavaz - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-08 - 2016-08-11 (6 months)
Motorman: Crested Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-15 - 2015-08-04 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Svyataya Anna - General cargo / 2016-04-28 - 2017-01-30 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: SICH - Other vessels / 2015-06-01 - 2015-08-31 (3 months)
3rd Officer: E.R Sweden - Container Ship / 2016-07-11 - 2016-12-12 (5 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM Mimosa - Container Ship / 2015-10-08 - 2016-03-06 (5 months)
Motorman: Brigadir - Tug boat / 2016-09-02 - 2016-11-03 (2 months)
OS: Athlos - Chemical tanker / 2016-04-02 - 2016-10-10 (6 months)
OS: Alemania - Container Ship / 2015-04-20 - 2015-11-10 (7 months)