Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Serenissima - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-11 - 2020-05-12 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Marella Explorer 2 - Cruise Liner / 2020-02-02 - 2020-05-06 (3 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Marella Explorer 2 - Cruise Liner / 2019-03-13 - 2019-10-30 (8 months)
Cabin Steward assistant: Marella Explorer 1 - Cruise Liner / 2018-04-17 - 2018-10-19 (6 months)
Cabin Steward assistant: Aida nova - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-10 - 2020-05-05 (9 months)
Cabin Steward assistant: Aida prima - Passenger vessel / 2018-08-08 - 2019-06-08 (10 months)
1st Officer: LA BAMBA - Crane vessel / 2016-05-03 - 2020-05-03 (4 years)
1st Officer: SUBSEA 204 - AHTS / 2014-09-28 - 2016-04-14 (1 year)
Cook Assistant: COSTA VICTORIA - Cruise Liner / 2019-10-13 - 2020-04-04 (6 months)
Motorist: Mogychi - Tug boat / 2020-01-24 - 2020-03-25 (2 months)
OS: M/V RIWAL - General cargo / 2019-05-12 - 2020-03-09 (10 months)
Electric Cadet: Knyaz Vladimir - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-19 - 2020-03-08 (7 months)
Electrician: Khersones - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-01 - 2018-07-10 (3 months)
Motorman: Santhye MSC - Container Ship / 2019-12-06 - 2020-03-08 (3 months)
OS: Волго-балт 153 - General cargo / 2019-08-15 - 2020-02-23 (6 months)
OS: Корсар - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-04 - 2019-08-14 (4 months)
Oiler: Pacific Assegai - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-27 - 2020-02-07 (2 months)
OS: Atlantic Orion - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-01 - 2020-01-27 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mv Al salmy 5 - RO-RO / 2018-12-26 - 2020-01-27 (1 year)
Master: NS Yakutia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-03 - 2020-01-05 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Tsirul - Bulk Carrier / 2010-03-05 - 2010-10-05 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Ussury - Timber Carrier / 2009-11-12 - 2009-12-17 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Fesco Aleut - Container Ship / 2009-02-21 - 2009-06-02 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Delmas Marok - Container Ship / 2008-11-30 - 2009-02-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Cobalt Sun - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-24 - 2019-12-29 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Zenith Leader - RO-RO / 2018-07-13 - 2018-12-22 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Baku Breeze - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-21 - 2019-12-29 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Baku Breeze - Dry Cargo / 2018-05-29 - 2018-11-30 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: AVIVA - RO-RO / 2019-06-11 - 2019-12-19 (6 months)
Barwaiteress: MARCO POLO - Cruise Liner / 2018-08-19 - 2019-01-09 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Pyotr Velikiy - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-03 - 2019-12-08 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Olustvere - Fishing vessel / 2018-06-01 - 2018-09-27 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Mir - Yacht / 2017-10-01 - 2017-12-01 (2 months)
OS: Dnieper Princess - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-11 - 2019-12-03 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: ARTMA - General cargo / 2018-09-01 - 2018-10-28 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Стивидор - Tug boat / 2018-10-01 - 2019-12-02 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Esi Anax - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-11 - 2015-09-25 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Stellar Maestro - General cargo / 2014-08-21 - 2015-01-03 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Stellar Maestro - General cargo / 2014-02-11 - 2014-08-20 (6 months)