Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: "Гранит" - Tug boat / 2021-12-20 - 2022-02-21 (2 months)
AB / Motorman: Zaliv Vostok - Fishing vessel / 2021-11-11 - 2022-02-15 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: Kamsomoliya Kaliningrada - Reefer / 2019-12-10 - 2020-04-06 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: Nauta - Reefer / 2019-05-06 - 2019-07-04 (2 months)
AB / Motorman: Capitan Mokeev - Reefer / 2018-10-18 - 2019-04-30 (6 months)
AB / Motorman: Simfoniya - Reefer / 2017-09-15 - 2018-05-06 (8 months)
OS: Lucky Star - General cargo / 2021-09-02 - 2022-02-03 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: SK.conopus, ojas pride , logindo stamina , logindo stout,lagindo energy - AHTS / 2021-06-18 - 2022-01-31 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: CMA CGM CORNIELLE - Container Ship / 2021-07-01 - 2022-01-24 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: zim yokohama - Container Ship / 2017-05-01 - 2020-12-09 (3 years)
Master: TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2021-11-21 - 2022-01-21 (2 months)
Master: MS Tiger - Container Ship / 2020-12-23 - 2021-06-09 (6 months)
Master: MS Tiger - Container Ship / 2019-05-03 - 2019-09-10 (4 months)
Master: MS Tiger - Container Ship / 2018-09-12 - 2019-01-11 (4 months)
Master: MS Tiger - Container Ship / 2018-01-16 - 2018-05-18 (4 months)
2nd Officer: OOCL St. Lawrence - Container Ship / 2021-10-24 - 2022-01-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: OOCL St. Lawrence - Container Ship / 2021-06-28 - 2021-10-23 (4 months)
3rd Officer: BBC DANUBE - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-09-01 - 2021-01-23 (5 months)
3rd Officer: BBC AMBER - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-06-03 - 2019-12-21 (7 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Seabourn Cruise Liner - Cruise Liner / 2018-01-15 - 2022-01-17 (4 years)
Cabin Stewardess: Thomson Majesty - Cruise Liner / 2016-01-15 - 2017-12-10 (1 year)
2nd Officer: DS Vision - VLCC / 2021-09-04 - 2022-01-11 (4 months)
2nd Officer: DS Vision - VLCC / 2020-11-29 - 2021-04-13 (4 months)
2nd Officer: DS Vision - VLCC / 2020-02-16 - 2020-07-20 (5 months)
3rd Officer: CPO GERMANY - Chemical tanker / 2013-02-24 - 2013-06-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CPO NORWAY - Chemical tanker / 2012-09-01 - 2012-12-21 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty 164 - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-09-22 - 2022-01-06 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Eleanor Roosevelt - Ferry / 2021-05-01 - 2021-08-07 (3 months)
Motorman: OT-1504 - Tug boat / 2021-06-14 - 2021-12-29 (6 months)
Steward: Mv.Antwerpia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-31 - 2021-12-29 (11 months)
3rd Officer: HANS SCHOLL - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-12 - 2021-12-28 (5 months)
OS: EMCO 1 - General cargo / 2021-09-18 - 2021-12-17 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Капитан Демидюк - Fishing vessel / 2021-05-23 - 2021-07-29 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Иртыш - ROV Support vessel / 2021-02-08 - 2021-05-11 (3 months)
Trainee OS: NADEZHDA - Training Ship / 2020-04-01 - 2020-06-01 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Regal bay - Reefer / 2021-05-29 - 2021-12-13 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Профессор Хлюстин - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-03 - 2020-04-05 (2 months)
Wiper: Jsw raigad - General cargo / 2021-06-03 - 2021-12-10 (6 months)
Wiper: M. V. Supreme - General cargo / 2019-07-17 - 2020-07-17 (1 year)
Wiper: Mt lucky 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-02 - 2018-06-04 (1 year)
Master: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-25 - 2021-12-10 (2 months)
Master: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2021-04-13 - 2021-07-11 (3 months)
Master: Coral Favia - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-25 - 2021-04-10 (1 month)
Master: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-23 - 2021-02-11 (3 months)
Master: Coral Fungia - LPG / LNG / 2020-10-10 - 2020-11-18 (1 month)
OS: Volgo-Balt 203 - Dry Cargo / 2021-07-09 - 2021-12-10 (5 months)
OS: RUSLAN - Icebreaker / 2021-05-16 - 2021-06-18 (1 month)
OS: RUSLAN - Icebreaker / 2020-08-03 - 2020-10-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-04-25 - 2019-07-07 (2 months)
Motorman: Antur - Fishing vessel / 2021-07-12 - 2021-12-02 (5 months)
Cook Assistant: MS "CruceStar" - Cruise Liner / 2021-07-28 - 2021-11-04 (3 months)