Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Messman: Stolt Sneland - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-30 - 2021-08-15 (9 months)
Messman: Stolt Sneland - Chemical tanker / 2019-05-28 - 2020-02-08 (8 months)
Messman: Stolt Palm - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-31 - 2019-03-04 (7 months)
Messman: Stolt Confidence - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-01 - 2018-04-10 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: “Druzhba” - Passenger vessel / 2021-07-02 - 2021-08-08 (1 month)
Oiler: M V Bricourt - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-01-19 - 2021-08-07 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Yellow refer - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-05-01 - 2021-08-05 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Amazonit - Chemical tanker / 2021-03-12 - 2021-08-02 (5 months)
Radio Officer: MB-12 - Tug boat / 2021-04-12 - 2021-08-02 (4 months)
Trainee Wiper: Diamond N - Tug boat / 2021-06-01 - 2021-08-01 (2 months)
Master: MV Argos - Container Ship / 2021-02-07 - 2021-07-27 (6 months)
Master: MV Argos - Container Ship / 2019-11-22 - 2020-09-23 (10 months)
Master: mv Maira - Container Ship / 2018-10-01 - 2019-01-09 (3 months)
Messman: N/A - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-27 - 2021-07-27 (0 days)
Oiler: Volgoneft-25 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-03 - 2021-07-26 (4 months)
Wiper: Vulkan - Tug boat / 2020-10-02 - 2021-04-02 (6 months)
Oiler: Volgoneft-25 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-04-01 - 2020-10-01 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Volgoneft-25 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-16 - 2020-03-31 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Yellow Submarine - Fishing vessel / 2019-12-25 - 2021-07-25 (1 year)
4th Engineer: East Cape marine - Crane vessel / 2018-12-25 - 2019-08-25 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Yellow Submarine - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-25 - 2018-11-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Oil tanker - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-23 - 2021-07-23 (6 months)
Motorman-welder: Astra Marine - Dry Cargo / 2021-05-25 - 2021-07-21 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Riverside - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-14 - 2021-07-19 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Lake Sturgeon - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-23 - 2020-07-04 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Flagship Tulip - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-06 - 2019-05-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Flagship Tulip - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-17 - 2018-10-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Ugo Ocha - VLCC / 2017-06-16 - 2017-09-28 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: DRUZHBA - Sailing Vessel / 2021-06-21 - 2021-07-18 (1 month)
Cook: MSC Sariska - Container Ship / 2020-11-09 - 2021-07-11 (8 months)
Cook: Kapitan Sukhondyayvskiy - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-04 - 2020-03-04 (6 months)
Cook: Kapitan Sukhondyayvskiy - Fishing vessel / 2018-11-22 - 2019-04-30 (5 months)
Cook: Kapitan Morgun - Fishing vessel / 2018-02-02 - 2018-08-14 (6 months)
Cook: Vancouver - General cargo / 2016-11-24 - 2017-06-12 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Neptune Thalassa - RO-RO / 2020-12-03 - 2021-06-23 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Neptune Hellas - RO-RO / 2020-04-02 - 2020-11-02 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Neptune Horizon - RO-RO / 2019-06-07 - 2019-12-28 (7 months)
OS: m/v Neptune Aegli - RO-RO / 2018-09-20 - 2019-04-11 (7 months)
OS: m/v Neptune Horizon - RO-RO / 2018-01-13 - 2018-07-13 (6 months)
Cook: Kristin - General cargo / 2021-01-29 - 2021-06-21 (5 months)
Cook: Falcona - General cargo / 2020-04-27 - 2020-10-30 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: MT DESH GAURAV - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-04 - 2021-06-17 (6 months)
4th Engineer: MT DESH GAURAV - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-26 - 2020-12-03 (2 months)
4th Engineer: MT SWARNA SINDHU - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-26 - 2020-06-12 (8 months)
Trainee Engineer: MT SWARNA PUSHP - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-14 - 2018-08-17 (10 months)
ETO: MSC ASLI - Container Ship / 2020-12-17 - 2021-06-11 (6 months)
ETO: MSC Elsa 3 - Container Ship / 2020-03-16 - 2020-09-12 (6 months)
ETO: Mac Annamaria - Container Ship / 2019-06-07 - 2019-11-13 (5 months)