Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Wiper: Heyma - RO-RO / 2020-05-22 - 2020-10-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: BENTLEY I - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-17 - 2020-09-29 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ANHONA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-20 - 2019-08-11 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ARAMIS - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-28 - 2018-12-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: NORSEL - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-01 - 2017-11-09 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Copenhagen - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-23 - 2017-03-13 (6 months)
Motorman: KOSMONAVT GAGARIN - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-07 - 2020-09-20 (1 year)
Master: Gerd - General cargo / 2019-08-14 - 2020-09-17 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Nuran Ana - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-10 - 2019-01-02 (1 year)
OS: SALLY M - General cargo / 2020-01-16 - 2020-09-11 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Chersonesos - Training Ship / 2020-08-01 - 2020-09-01 (1 month)
Trainee Engineer: Bakay - Tug boat / 2020-06-25 - 2020-08-31 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Carabobo - VLCC / 2020-01-13 - 2020-08-15 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Carabobo - VLCC / 2019-03-13 - 2019-08-04 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: DURBANSEA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-09 - 2020-08-13 (8 months)
Oiler: Toros M - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-18 - 2020-08-07 (1 year)
Oiler: PAULA 2 - General cargo / 2016-06-17 - 2017-05-31 (11 months)
Oiler: PAULA 2 - General cargo / 2015-12-02 - 2016-05-15 (5 months)
Oiler: Sea rchid - General cargo / 2004-09-27 - 2009-09-09 (4 years)
AB / Motorman: ADZHIGOL - Tug boat / 2020-04-01 - 2020-08-01 (4 months)
Wiper: ALYCIA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-19 - 2019-09-11 (8 months)
Wiper: DRAGOMYR - Tug boat / 2018-05-27 - 2018-10-21 (5 months)
Wiper: CHELSEA-4 - General cargo / 2018-01-13 - 2018-04-06 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Fair Wind - General cargo / 2020-03-14 - 2020-07-28 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Fair Wind - General cargo / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-29 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: NOVYY DONBASS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-03 - 2020-07-13 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Jascon 45 - AHT / 2019-12-20 - 2020-07-10 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Jascon 40 - AHTS / 2019-06-28 - 2019-10-06 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Jascon 45 - AHT / 2019-01-26 - 2019-04-25 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Jascon 57 - AHT / 2018-08-13 - 2018-12-10 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Jascon 66 - AHTS / 2017-03-19 - 2017-06-25 (3 months)
Messman: Sider Faioch - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-22 - 2020-07-07 (8 months)
Messman: NACC Napoli - Cement Carrier / 2018-06-21 - 2019-01-22 (7 months)
Messman: NACC Napoli - Cement Carrier / 2017-05-14 - 2017-11-10 (6 months)
Messman: Endeavor - Cement Carrier / 2016-05-03 - 2016-11-02 (6 months)
Messman: Navios Alegria - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-07 - 2015-11-04 (7 months)
Pumpman: Bareilly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-11 - 2020-07-07 (8 months)
Motorman: Bareilly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-11 - 2019-08-14 (4 months)
Motorman: Kanpur - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-28 - 2018-09-09 (3 months)
Motorman: Violet - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-26 - 2017-07-10 (7 months)
Motorman: [Violet 1k - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-26 - 2017-07-10 (7 months)
Cook: Celebrity silhoutte - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-08 - 2020-07-04 (8 months)
Junior officer: Msc Giulia - Container Ship / 2019-10-02 - 2020-06-25 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Msc Sara Elena - Container Ship / 2017-04-10 - 2017-12-19 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Msc Vidisha R. - Container Ship / 2015-11-22 - 2016-10-15 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: Bourbon Explorer 502 - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-11-10 - 2020-06-23 (1 year)
Oiler: MT Helm - VLCC / 2019-12-16 - 2020-06-20 (6 months)