Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Ocean Tern - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-05-24 - 2018-11-09 (6 months)
OS: CM Mehran - Tug boat / 2018-01-11 - 2018-03-12 (2 months)
OS: Ocean Tern - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-08-25 - 2017-11-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Kapitan Chechkin - Icebreaker / 2015-07-01 - 2015-09-01 (2 months)
Wiper: N/A - General cargo / 2018-11-01 - 2018-11-01 (0 days)
OS: MSC SANTHYA - Container Ship / 2018-05-30 - 2018-10-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Borisfen - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-26 - 2018-10-28 (2 months)
OS: ASL WATER MASTERS - Other vessels / 2017-10-30 - 2018-10-18 (12 months)
Deck Cadet: JUMBO - RO-RO / 2018-03-18 - 2018-10-10 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MARIAN B - Dredger / 2016-09-01 - 2017-03-01 (6 months)
Oiler: ADELINA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-20 - 2018-10-05 (7 months)
Oiler: ADELINA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-06 - 2017-08-04 (7 months)
Motorman: L.S. AIZENSHTAT - Container Ship / 2015-10-14 - 2016-03-14 (5 months)
Motorman: L.S AIZENSHTAT - Container Ship / 2015-01-28 - 2015-05-31 (4 months)
Wiper : CSCL BRISBANE - Container Ship / 2011-12-22 - 2012-04-28 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Gemini - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-22 - 2018-10-01 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Fouma - Container Ship / 2018-09-21 - 2018-09-25 (4 days)
OS: Warnow Chief - Container Ship / 2017-10-21 - 2018-04-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Warnow Jupiter - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-12-12 - 2017-06-01 (6 months)
Master: CM Mehran - Tug boat / 2018-05-17 - 2018-09-15 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Prime lily - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-07 - 2018-08-30 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Prime lily - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-07 - 2017-08-27 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Yasa ozcan - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-15 - 2017-02-07 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Yasa ilhan - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-25 - 2014-08-27 (6 months)
Messman: frio canaias - RO-RO / 2018-03-08 - 2018-08-29 (6 months)
Messman: taganrogskiy zaliv - RO-RO / 2017-05-13 - 2017-11-13 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Moxon - Chemical tanker / 2017-12-03 - 2018-08-15 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Ice Energy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-07-26 - 2017-11-30 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Druzhba - Sailing Vessel / 2018-07-09 - 2018-08-05 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Karavas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-25 - 2018-07-20 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Mersini - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-13 - 2017-12-28 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Drepanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-06-08 - 2017-03-05 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: Mersini - Chemical tanker / 2015-09-15 - 2016-02-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Arendal - Chemical tanker / 2014-11-23 - 2015-06-14 (7 months)
OS: ARVIN - General cargo / 2018-04-26 - 2018-07-19 (3 months)
OS: Hizir - General cargo / 2015-07-12 - 2016-02-19 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Santa-Elena - General cargo / 2013-07-12 - 2013-10-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Burun - Tug boat / 2012-01-21 - 2012-04-01 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Gelius 1 - General cargo / 2018-02-12 - 2018-07-16 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Veerseborg - General cargo / 2016-11-20 - 2017-02-20 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Veerseborg - General cargo / 2016-10-26 - 2016-11-20 (1 month)
Restaurant Steward: Mein Schiff 5 - Cruise Liner / 2018-01-13 - 2018-07-14 (6 months)
Waitress: Carnival Fascination - Cruise Liner / 2016-06-17 - 2016-12-11 (6 months)
Waitress: Carnival Splendor - Cruise Liner / 2015-10-13 - 2016-05-15 (7 months)
OS: Apache - General cargo / 2017-11-13 - 2018-06-05 (7 months)
OS: m/v Finnsun - RO-RO / 2018-03-11 - 2018-05-27 (3 months)
OS: m/v Collector-335 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-17 - 2017-12-18 (2 months)