Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: ABB Vanessa - General cargo / 2023-07-03 - 2023-11-23 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: BBC Plata - General cargo / 2022-12-14 - 2023-04-14 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: African River - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-10-20 - 2022-04-05 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: African Forest - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-09-16 - 2021-03-05 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: BBC Campana - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-09-05 - 2020-04-24 (8 місяців)
Junior officer: MEIN SCHIFF 3 - Cruise Liner / 2023-05-06 - 2024-01-10 (8 місяців)
Junior officer: MEIN SCHIFF 3 - Cruise Liner / 2022-05-21 - 2023-02-19 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: TB. PANDORA 8 - Tug boat / 2020-03-16 - 2022-04-04 (2 року)
2nd Officer: TB. MBS 55 - Tug boat / 2020-01-03 - 2020-03-10 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: TB. MEGA DAYA 15 - Tug boat / 2019-04-10 - 2019-07-19 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Aegeas - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-14 - 2022-04-04 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Andromeda - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-06 - 2021-02-14 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Andromeda - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-06 - 2020-10-05 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Arion - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-01 - 2019-09-20 (4 місяця)
Junior officer: Arion - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-04 - 2019-05-31 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: TINTIN - Container Ship / 2021-10-28 - 2022-04-04 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Tiina too - Chemical tanker / 2021-02-06 - 2021-08-12 (6 місяців)
OS: Tiina too - Chemical tanker / 2020-05-05 - 2020-08-22 (4 місяця)
Deck Cadet: ARIES J - Container Ship / 2018-11-02 - 2019-05-30 (7 місяців)
Deck Cadet: Kiliya - General cargo / 2018-05-14 - 2018-09-15 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: NCC FAJR - Chemical tanker / 2023-08-19 - 2023-11-22 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: NCC SAFA - Chemical tanker / 2022-11-18 - 2023-04-13 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Solar Sharna - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-05 - 2022-04-03 (1 місяць)
3rd Officer: Solar Sharna - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-20 - 2022-03-04 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: Mount Olympus - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-22 - 2021-07-06 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: GFS PERFECT - Container Ship / 2023-04-02 - 2023-08-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Athena - Container Ship / 2022-06-27 - 2022-10-26 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Elefteria Express - Container Ship / 2021-08-31 - 2022-04-03 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Europe - Container Ship / 2020-12-10 - 2021-05-07 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Pantelis - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-20 - 2020-10-03 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Pola Yaroslava - General cargo / 2021-11-24 - 2022-04-03 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Pola Yaroslava - General cargo / 2021-03-22 - 2021-07-24 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Pola Anastasia - General cargo / 2020-08-08 - 2020-11-24 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Pavel Yudin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-22 - 2019-11-18 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Pavel Yudin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-11-08 - 2019-03-16 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: FARMER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-26 - 2024-04-24 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: BUILDER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-24 - 2023-07-15 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: AEOLIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-03 - 2022-09-02 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: AEOLIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-05 - 2022-04-02 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: GEORGE P - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-27 - 2021-10-28 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Amazon Fortitude - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-24 - 2022-04-01 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: M/T Santa Pawlina - Chemical tanker / 2021-01-15 - 2021-05-22 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: M/T Santa Pawlina - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-18 - 2019-09-21 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: M/T Loengo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-16 - 2018-12-29 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: M/T Loengo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-24 - 2018-08-14 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2021-11-23 - 2022-04-01 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2021-04-05 - 2021-08-01 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2020-07-08 - 2020-11-08 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: X-Press Irazu - Container Ship / 2019-10-28 - 2020-03-10 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: X-Press Mulhacen - Container Ship / 2019-01-08 - 2019-05-17 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Mitiq - General cargo / 2021-11-10 - 2022-03-31 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Dijksgracht - General cargo / 2021-05-13 - 2021-08-17 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: SINAA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-11-10 - 2021-04-02 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: AGATA-M - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-02-17 - 2020-07-02 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: SYROS WIND - General cargo / 2019-12-08 - 2020-02-10 (2 місяця)
3rd Officer: Monsoon - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-23 - 2022-03-30 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Mistral - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-09 - 2021-07-17 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Gaz United - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-24 - 2020-08-23 (7 місяців)
3rd Officer: Gaz Concord - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-06 - 2019-09-06 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: Gaz United - LPG / LNG / 2018-05-30 - 2018-11-03 (5 місяців)
Master: Plavi Val - Passenger vessel / 2022-07-15 - 2022-09-30 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Eems Solar - General cargo / 2022-01-06 - 2022-03-29 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Eems Sky - General cargo / 2021-06-03 - 2021-09-23 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Eems Spirit - General cargo / 2020-09-18 - 2021-01-22 (4 місяця)
Master: Regina - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-11 - 2020-09-16 (1 місяць)
3rd Officer: Senata - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-08 - 2024-05-04 (8 місяців)
3rd Officer: Senata - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-29 - 2023-09-07 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: Senata - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-09 - 2023-05-05 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: CETUS STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-10 - 2022-08-14 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Nikolay Kuznetsov - General cargo / 2022-02-14 - 2022-03-28 (1 місяць)
2nd Officer: DS Vision - VLCC / 2022-01-11 - 2022-03-28 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: DS Vision - VLCC / 2021-10-30 - 2022-01-10 (2 місяця)
3rd Officer: DS Venture - VLCC / 2021-04-11 - 2021-07-27 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: DS VISION - VLCC / 2019-11-22 - 2020-07-27 (8 місяців)
3rd Officer: DS Commodore - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-15 - 2019-08-17 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Prigipos - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-28 - 2022-06-11 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Prigipos - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-28 - 2022-03-27 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Aspasia B - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-09 - 2021-04-29 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Cape Cross - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-09 - 2019-08-29 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Cape Cross - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-26 - 2018-11-30 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: NS Stella - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-18 - 2022-03-27 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NS Power - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-11 - 2021-04-29 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NS Power - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-09 - 2020-06-20 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NS Power - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-03-14 - 2019-08-02 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: NS Power - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-06-12 - 2018-11-02 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: NAV NEHA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-22 - 2024-08-12 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: UNIVERSE - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-27 - 2023-11-16 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: UNIVERSE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-21 - 2023-04-04 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: UNIVERSE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-28 - 2022-06-25 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: UNIVERSE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-27 - 2022-03-27 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Nordmaas - Container Ship / 2022-06-06 - 2022-09-21 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Nordleopard - Container Ship / 2021-09-20 - 2022-03-27 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Nordleopard - Container Ship / 2020-10-01 - 2021-05-01 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: NORDTIGRIS - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-16 - 2020-07-02 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NORDBALTIC - Container Ship / 2019-06-26 - 2019-10-31 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Aquanus - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-24 - 2022-03-26 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: KOI - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-25 - 2021-04-04 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Flagship Orchid - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-12 - 2020-02-10 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Flagship Orchid - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-25 - 2019-02-27 (6 місяців)