Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
2nd Officer: SCF Pechora - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-05 - 2022-04-20 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: SCF Amur - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-11 - 2021-07-15 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: SCF Amur - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-03 - 2020-10-26 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: Troitsky Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-22 - 2020-02-28 (5 місяців)
OS: Tower Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-02 - 2019-06-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Drait - General cargo / 2022-05-08 - 2022-08-08 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Tjonger - General cargo / 2021-12-01 - 2022-04-20 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Drait - General cargo / 2021-03-08 - 2021-07-24 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Drait - General cargo / 2020-06-16 - 2020-10-20 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Drait - General cargo / 2019-09-13 - 2020-01-14 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: NOCC ATLANTIC - RO-RO / 2021-10-09 - 2022-04-19 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NOCC ATLANTIC - RO-RO / 2020-10-15 - 2021-03-25 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: OPAL LEADER - RO-RO / 2019-03-20 - 2019-09-17 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: EMERALD LEADER - RO-RO / 2018-01-15 - 2018-07-14 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NOCC OCEANIC - RO-RO / 2016-11-14 - 2017-04-15 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LPG Navigator Capricorn - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-09 - 2022-04-19 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LPG Navigator Gemini - LPG / LNG / 2019-11-28 - 2020-09-19 (10 місяців)
2nd Officer: LPG/E Navigator Neptune - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-14 - 2019-09-26 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: LPG/E Navigator Neptune - LPG / LNG / 2018-02-24 - 2018-08-06 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LPG Navigator Capricorn - LPG / LNG / 2016-11-15 - 2017-02-04 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Schippersgracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-12-18 - 2022-04-19 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Schippersgracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-02-21 - 2021-06-23 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Stadiongracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-05-04 - 2020-09-18 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Stadiongracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-08-06 - 2019-12-07 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Schippersgracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-12-28 - 2019-04-19 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: ARES - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-06 - 2022-04-19 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: FREEDOM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-18 - 2021-01-27 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Carl Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-16 - 2019-08-04 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: ORIENT TRANSIT - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-28 - 2017-11-30 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: ORIENT TRAIL - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-30 - 2017-04-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: KSENA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-10-28 - 2024-03-23 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: ORION - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-15 - 2023-05-18 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: ORION - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-15 - 2022-12-11 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: ROZA - VLCC / 2021-11-24 - 2022-04-19 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LETO - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-24 - 2021-07-06 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: LMZ ATLAS - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-13 - 2024-07-25 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: LMZ FRANCISCO - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-21 - 2023-10-30 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: LMZ EUROPA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-02 - 2022-12-05 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LMZ CERES - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-07 - 2022-04-19 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: LMZ VEGA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-02 - 2021-07-21 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Sea Marathon - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-15 - 2024-07-18 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Golden Soul - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-11 - 2023-09-08 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Darya Devi - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-29 - 2023-04-19 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Darya Ma - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-04 - 2022-12-12 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Berge Asahidake - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-17 - 2022-04-19 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: INTAN DAYA 322 - General cargo / 2021-09-11 - 2022-04-18 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: BAHTERA KAPUAS - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-23 - 2021-08-05 (9 місяців)
3rd Officer: ANDHIKA VIDYANATA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-09 - 2020-08-15 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: SV. CENDRAWASIH - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-09-21 - 2019-09-28 (1 рік)
2nd Officer: “Lem Verbena” - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-27 - 2022-04-18 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: “Lem Geranium” - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-25 - 2021-08-24 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Aviva - RO-RO / 2019-10-29 - 2020-07-06 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Aviva - RO-RO / 2018-10-12 - 2019-05-29 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Aviva - RO-RO / 2017-07-23 - 2018-04-20 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: Akhty - Chemical tanker / 2021-11-27 - 2022-04-16 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Akhty - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-11 - 2021-09-14 (1 місяць)
3rd Officer: Akhty - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-29 - 2021-08-10 (1 місяць)
3rd Officer: Kura River - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-22 - 2021-06-28 (2 місяця)
AB Seaman: Lenkaran - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-24 - 2021-02-07 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: EXPRESS ATHENS - Container Ship / 2021-06-15 - 2022-04-12 (10 місяців)
2nd Officer: VANCOUVER - Container Ship / 2020-09-30 - 2021-02-27 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Progress C - Container Ship / 2019-09-29 - 2020-06-16 (9 місяців)
3rd Officer: Genoa - Container Ship / 2019-03-04 - 2019-06-04 (3 місяця)
Junior officer: Genoa - Container Ship / 2018-10-24 - 2019-03-03 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: MOL CREATION - Container Ship / 2022-01-02 - 2022-04-11 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: MOL CREATION - Container Ship / 2021-10-27 - 2022-01-01 (2 місяця)
3rd Officer: SUNRISE ACE - RO-RO / 2020-12-17 - 2021-06-02 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: MOL MOTIVATOR - Container Ship / 2020-01-24 - 2020-09-02 (7 місяців)
3rd Officer: CARNATION ACE - RO-RO / 2019-06-03 - 2019-10-22 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Brook Trout - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-30 - 2022-04-11 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: Brook Trout - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-05 - 2021-12-29 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Flagship Lotus - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-03 - 2021-04-21 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Selasse - Chemical tanker / 2019-11-05 - 2020-03-05 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Selasse - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-10 - 2019-07-11 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Viktor Tsoi - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-25 - 2023-12-03 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Viktor Tsoi - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-27 - 2022-04-10 (14 днів)
2nd Officer: NS Yakutia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-17 - 2021-09-08 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Anichkov Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-06 - 2020-11-28 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: NS CONSUL - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-03 - 2020-01-09 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Port Tokyo - Bulk Carrier / 2024-05-25 - 2024-09-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: S'hail Al Dukhan - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-03 - 2024-03-06 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Lila Tokyo - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-02 - 2023-07-02 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Lila Tokyo - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-16 - 2023-02-18 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: James - Dredger / 2021-12-12 - 2022-04-09 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: VOLGA-4009 - General cargo / 2022-02-14 - 2022-04-08 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: RIX Eleonora - General cargo / 2021-09-01 - 2021-10-26 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: CORAL MER - General cargo / 2020-12-23 - 2021-05-24 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: DERIBAS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-12 - 2017-10-12 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: ANTHEA - Container Ship / 2015-09-17 - 2016-03-23 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Super Servant 4 - Other vessels / 2021-12-05 - 2022-04-07 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Parkgracht - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-03-18 - 2021-08-03 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Prinsengracht - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-07-03 - 2020-11-08 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Apuana D - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-15 - 2019-12-10 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Fairplayer - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-07-31 - 2018-10-31 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: GSL TINOS - Container Ship / 2021-10-11 - 2022-04-06 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: HOLANDIA - Container Ship / 2021-02-17 - 2021-03-10 (1 місяць)
2nd Officer: HOLANDIA - Container Ship / 2020-06-01 - 2020-10-07 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Johannes-S. - Container Ship / 2019-07-21 - 2019-12-21 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Tim-S. - Container Ship / 2018-12-06 - 2019-04-18 (4 місяця)