Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Messman: Bittern - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-05 - 2022-01-05 (7 months)
Messman: Hamburg Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-13 - 2021-02-06 (7 months)
Messman: Bittern - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-18 - 2020-02-05 (8 months)
Messman: Fairfield Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-15 - 2019-02-28 (7 months)
Messman: Crowned Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-19 - 2018-02-20 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-01 - 2022-01-02 (1 day)
Engine Cadet: N/A - Passenger vessel / 2022-01-01 - 2022-01-02 (1 day)
Deck Cadet: Catherin Bright - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-28 - 2021-12-23 (7 months)
Oiler: M.V Meyra - RO-RO / 2021-03-09 - 2021-12-21 (9 months)
4th Engineer: HAWKS GLORY - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-20 - 2021-12-16 (10 months)
Trainee OS: TAN BINH 136 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-12 - 2021-12-13 (10 months)
Motorman: Hawar - Tug boat / 2019-08-01 - 2021-11-30 (2 years)
ETO: seeb - VLCC / 2021-07-23 - 2021-11-26 (4 months)
ETO: Marbat - VLCC / 2020-07-20 - 2021-02-26 (7 months)
ETO: SEEB - VLCC / 2019-08-14 - 2019-12-25 (4 months)
ETO: Mahadah Silver - Chemical tanker / 2016-01-01 - 2019-01-01 (3 years)
Engine Cadet: KHERSONES - Sailing Vessel / 2021-11-25 - 2021-11-25 (0 days)
Deck Cadet: AS FLORA - Container Ship / 2021-04-28 - 2021-11-19 (7 months)
3rd Officer: NH ERLE - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-01 - 2021-11-15 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Alpine Marina - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-12-19 - 2021-04-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Alpine Marina - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-18 - 2020-12-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: LEON ZEUS - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-05 - 2020-02-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: LEON DIAS - Chemical tanker / 2019-04-08 - 2019-08-19 (4 months)
2nd Officer: NORMA - General cargo / 2021-05-17 - 2021-11-12 (6 months)
3rd Officer: RIMONA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-11 - 2020-07-31 (4 months)
3rd Officer: DAKOTA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-20 - 2019-09-09 (8 months)
3rd Officer: FIONA - General cargo / 2018-04-16 - 2018-08-17 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Юный Балтиец - Training Ship / 2021-09-10 - 2021-11-11 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V NYK Vesta - Container Ship / 2021-07-02 - 2021-11-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V AAL Brisbane - General cargo / 2020-06-27 - 2021-02-13 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Mtug TATAY - Tug boat / 2020-10-30 - 2021-11-01 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Leo Star1 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-09 - 2021-10-27 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Leo Star1 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-17 - 2020-09-01 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Leo Star1 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-06 - 2019-01-17 (6 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Leo Star1 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-24 - 2018-01-25 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Leo Star1 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-27 - 2017-07-23 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Stanislav Strebko - Tug boat / 2021-07-05 - 2021-10-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Global lady - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2021-03-10 - 2021-10-15 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Trammo Stanton - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-09 - 2021-10-05 (8 months)