Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Purser: PLB Fortuna - Pipe laying vessel / 2019-05-29 - 2019-09-29 (4 months)
Administrator: Armada Constructor - Cable laying vessel / 2016-06-01 - 2019-01-29 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: Teti - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-22 - 2019-09-28 (4 months)
Baker: Island Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-03-10 - 2019-09-27 (7 months)
Baker: Grand Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-01-02 - 2019-03-01 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Erik - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-03-15 - 2019-09-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Pia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-06-25 - 2018-12-25 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Crown Jade - Reefer / 2017-09-15 - 2018-02-27 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Wild Lotus - Reefer / 2016-09-07 - 2017-04-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Wild Lotus - Reefer / 2015-10-23 - 2016-05-24 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: DRUZHBA - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-05 - 2019-09-01 (1 month)
AB Seaman: КИЖУЧ "Kizhuch" - Tug boat / 2019-06-27 - 2019-08-30 (2 months)
Cook Assistant: Carnival cruise line - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-11 - 2019-08-22 (9 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Aetolia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-10 - 2019-08-16 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Lycavitos - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-17 - 2015-05-24 (1 year)
AB Seaman: m/v Meteora - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-09 - 2013-04-26 (8 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Aetolia - Bulk Carrier / 2011-04-01 - 2011-12-01 (8 months)
Cleaner: m/v Columbus - Cruise Liner / 2018-11-28 - 2019-08-11 (8 months)
Environmental Engineer: Fresher in Shipping fields - Drilling vessel / 2019-02-02 - 2019-08-09 (6 months)
OS: Khersones - Sailing Vessel / 2019-06-01 - 2019-07-31 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: STS Khersones - Sailing Vessel / 2019-07-01 - 2019-07-31 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Al Yasra - Container Ship / 2019-01-15 - 2019-07-09 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-04-25 - 2019-07-08 (2 months)
OS: Бугаз - Tug boat / 2019-04-18 - 2019-06-26 (2 months)
Motorman-welder: MV LUKA - General cargo / 2019-03-26 - 2019-06-13 (3 months)
Motorman-welder: MV LUKA - General cargo / 2018-10-25 - 2018-12-28 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: NIGHTHAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-01 - 2018-09-03 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: strofy - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-09 - 2017-12-31 (7 months)
Motorman: bugaz - Tug boat / 2016-04-23 - 2016-04-26 (3 days)
Deckhand: FU YUAN YU 7089 - Fishing vessel / 2018-11-15 - 2019-06-10 (7 months)
Deckhand: Shindar marine - Fishing vessel / 2017-01-07 - 2017-11-24 (11 months)
Messman: M/V VIRGEN DE PENAFRANCIA II - RO-RO / 2015-02-21 - 2016-02-21 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Mercurial Virgo - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-06 - 2019-06-05 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Navios Azimuth - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-09 - 2018-07-26 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Navios Melodia - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-31 - 2017-06-15 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Navios Etoile - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-18 - 2016-05-10 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Navios Etoile - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-18 - 2015-04-22 (6 months)
Master: Green Bodo - Reefer / 2019-01-15 - 2019-05-19 (4 months)
AB / Motorman : BEVERLI - General cargo / 2018-07-26 - 2019-03-01 (7 months)