Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Trainee Wiper: Sea Princess - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-10-23 - 2021-05-16 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Irtysh - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-12 - 2021-05-16 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Irtysh - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-14 - 2021-04-16 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Mishref - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-02-08 - 2012-10-27 (9 months)
Wiper: Gaschem werra - LPG / LNG / 2020-09-19 - 2021-05-05 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Gaschem bremen - LPG / LNG / 2019-04-16 - 2019-12-07 (8 months)
Chief Engineer: Gala trio - General cargo / 2020-08-07 - 2021-05-03 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Fresher - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-16 - 2021-05-01 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Saros B - General cargo / 2020-06-15 - 2021-04-29 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Aurelia - Container Ship / 2019-02-13 - 2019-08-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Piri Reis Üniversitesi - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-15 - 2017-09-10 (3 months)
Crewing Officer: MT. Lucinda - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-15 - 2021-04-18 (8 months)
Crewing Officer: Crane barge Pelangi bravo - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-05-08 - 2020-08-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Mazovia - Passenger vessel / 2020-10-06 - 2021-04-17 (6 months)
3rd Officer: KMP trisna dwitya - Passenger vessel / 2020-04-01 - 2021-04-11 (1 year)
Master: Glovis Companion - RO-RO / 2021-01-06 - 2021-04-07 (3 months)
Master: NOCC Atlantic - RO-RO / 2020-01-23 - 2020-06-27 (5 months)
Master: NOCC Oceanic - RO-RO / 2019-04-06 - 2019-07-05 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Daya Maju - Container Ship / 2020-08-31 - 2021-03-19 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: M/v Tambey - General cargo / 2020-11-26 - 2021-03-17 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: M/v Tambey - General cargo / 2019-11-23 - 2020-03-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: no experience - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-13 - 2021-03-14 (1 day)
Deck Cadet: Pluto - Container Ship / 2021-01-25 - 2021-03-04 (1 month)
3rd Officer: L.J.JOHNSON - AHTS / 2020-09-25 - 2021-02-27 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: RAAHI - LPG / LNG / 2018-06-11 - 2019-01-17 (7 months)
Engineer Assistant: AIDA IV - Passenger vessel / 2020-09-21 - 2021-02-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: AIDA IV - Passenger vessel / 2015-08-09 - 2016-02-25 (7 months)
OS: BAHRI TABUK - RO-RO / 2020-10-21 - 2021-02-21 (4 months)
OS: LORRAINE - Container Ship / 2019-09-09 - 2020-07-19 (10 months)
OS: BHARI HOFUF - RO-RO / 2018-05-25 - 2019-03-10 (9 months)
OS: BAHRI TABUK - RO-RO / 2017-05-17 - 2018-01-17 (8 months)
OS: BAHRI HOFUF - RO-RO / 2016-10-03 - 2017-01-14 (3 months)
Cook: submarine - Pilot boat / 2021-02-01 - 2021-02-13 (12 days)
Cook: submarine2 - Dry Cargo / 2018-02-08 - 2019-02-08 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: STENA BALTICA - RO-RO / 2020-05-11 - 2021-02-07 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Baltic Winter - Reefer / 2020-08-23 - 2021-01-27 (5 months)