Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Olimpia - General cargo / 2020-09-21 - 2021-01-25 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Houston pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-29 - 2021-01-01 (5 months)
OS: Phinex alfa - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-27 - 2018-11-13 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Orient Defender - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-24 - 2017-07-22 (6 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Sierra - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-03 - 2016-08-08 (7 months)
OS: Salvinia - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-23 - 2015-05-29 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: TAN BINH 256 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-04 - 2020-12-31 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Mv jabal ali 7 - RO-RO / 2020-10-28 - 2020-12-31 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Mv movers - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-31 - 2020-08-24 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv jabal ali 7 - RO-RO / 2016-07-02 - 2017-02-01 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Daleela - Ferry / 2019-11-14 - 2020-12-31 (1 year)
2nd Officer: IBN ELWALEED - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-04-15 - 2018-01-28 (9 months)
2nd Officer: ADAMS - General cargo / 2014-11-27 - 2015-03-31 (4 months)
2nd Officer: ALISRAA - Ferry / 2013-12-01 - 2014-05-28 (6 months)
2nd Officer: GALORIA - Container Ship / 2012-06-30 - 2013-01-04 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Goldeneye - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-24 - 2020-12-23 (6 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Shiprepair - Tug boat / 2018-03-20 - 2020-12-20 (2 years)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Tarpan - Tug boat / 2015-07-22 - 2015-11-30 (4 months)
Electrician: Pisti - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-08 - 2013-02-05 (8 months)
Electrician: Doro - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-20 - 2012-03-24 (6 months)
Electrician: Irini - Bulk Carrier / 2010-12-15 - 2011-06-15 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Piotr - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-06 - 2020-12-15 (4 months)
AB Seaman: LINDA1 - Tug boat / 2020-02-19 - 2020-12-14 (10 months)
AB Seaman: PC MARINE 1 - Tug boat / 2018-08-25 - 2018-11-04 (2 months)
AB Seaman: ASER - General cargo / 2015-03-05 - 2016-01-16 (10 months)
AB Seaman: ASER - General cargo / 2012-11-01 - 2014-05-04 (1 year)
AB Seaman: LAGUNA - Bulk Carrier / 2011-08-10 - 2011-12-09 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Paul Wurth - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-02 - 2020-11-30 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: Balaklava - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-01 - 2019-11-15 (1 year)
Fitter / Welder: Kazan - Cement Carrier / 2018-11-03 - 2019-11-04 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: STS MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2020-09-28 - 2020-11-29 (2 months)
Carpenter: Goundar Shipping - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-27 - 2020-11-28 (3 months)
Motorman: ОТ 1515 - Tug boat / 2020-09-25 - 2020-11-27 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-02 - 2020-11-17 (8 months)
Messman: Uglichanin «Sot’» - Tug boat / 2020-10-15 - 2020-11-16 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Mount butler - Container Ship / 2019-12-22 - 2020-11-15 (11 months)
Junior officer: Msc Tamara - Container Ship / 2019-04-25 - 2019-10-10 (5 months)
Radio Officer: JB114 - Jack-up Platform / 2020-10-05 - 2020-11-12 (1 month)
Radio Officer: JB115 - Accomodation barge / 2018-04-01 - 2019-10-03 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: MT majestic - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-23 - 2020-11-09 (11 months)
Messman: griffan - Mining Vessel / 2020-10-08 - 2020-11-07 (1 month)
Messman: JANA MARINE - Barge / 2016-02-02 - 2016-07-31 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: TP-1004 - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-04-29 - 2020-11-04 (6 months)