Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Kentavr - Tug boat / 2013-06-17 - 2013-12-31 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Dona Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-25 - 2013-05-15 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Breze - Tug boat / 2013-08-08 - 2013-11-15 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Ministar7 - General cargo / 2012-08-05 - 2013-06-10 (10 months)
Motorman: G.Rios - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-27 - 2013-09-16 (4 months)
Motorman: CITY - Bulk Carrier / 2012-10-11 - 2013-04-20 (6 months)
Motorman: Navin Kestrel - Bulk Carrier / 2012-05-21 - 2012-09-22 (4 months)
Motorman: CMA CGM BELLINI - Container Ship / 2011-04-25 - 2011-09-14 (5 months)
Motorman: Киевкая - Research vessel / 2013-05-20 - 2013-09-01 (3 months)
OS: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Tug boat / 2012-12-10 - 2013-05-27 (6 months)
OS: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Tug boat / 2012-05-27 - 2012-10-10 (4 months)
AB Seaman: SCF Samotlor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-11-25 - 2013-04-21 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Petrodvorets - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-12-21 - 2012-05-18 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Laptev sea - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-04-15 - 2011-08-19 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Deep Venture - Drilling vessel / 2008-12-25 - 2013-01-01 (4 years)
Trainee Wiper: M.V. Spar Taurus - Bulk Carrier / 2012-04-13 - 2012-12-30 (9 months)
Boatswain: Jorg N - Construction vessel / 2012-03-30 - 2012-08-24 (5 months)
No Experience
Deck Cadet: ОМ-106 - Cruise Liner / 2012-07-16 - 2012-08-21 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: KILIYA - Dry Cargo / 2012-06-11 - 2012-07-06 (1 month)
Steward: Emerald princess - Cruise Liner / 2011-11-28 - 2012-05-24 (6 months)
Steward: Emerald princess - Cruise Liner / 2011-04-07 - 2011-09-15 (5 months)
OS: M.V. Silver - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-06-25 - 2010-12-30 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Brazilian Ladi - Reefer / 2011-07-06 - 2011-12-28 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Brazilian Ladi - Reefer / 2011-07-06 - 2011-12-28 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Brazilian Ladi - Reefer / 2010-08-04 - 2011-03-01 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Tokyo Bay - Reefer / 2009-07-08 - 2009-11-19 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Tjkyo Bay - Reefer / 2008-08-12 - 2009-03-23 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Gas spirit 1 - LPG / LNG / 2011-08-25 - 2011-11-27 (3 months)
2nd Officer: BW suez Boston - LPG / LNG / 2010-09-15 - 2011-02-12 (5 months)
2nd Officer: BW suez Boston - LPG / LNG / 2010-03-03 - 2010-06-25 (4 months)
2nd Officer: BW SUEZ BOSTON - LPG / LNG / 2009-07-06 - 2009-11-14 (4 months)
2nd Officer: BE SUEZ BOSTON - LPG / LNG / 2008-10-31 - 2009-03-05 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Degtyasrk - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-01-04 - 2011-07-07 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Degtyarsk - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-05-21 - 2010-11-27 (6 months)
OS: Aetolia - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-26 - 2011-03-09 (4 months)
OS: Evanthia - Bulk Carrier / 2009-07-12 - 2010-04-17 (9 months)
Cook: JORAN SECONDO - Chemical tanker / 2009-11-29 - 2020-02-10 (10 years)
Cook: IEVOLI WHITE - Offshore Supply vessel / 2010-04-09 - 2010-06-24 (2 months)
Cook: IEVOLI WHITE - Offshore Supply vessel / 2009-01-22 - 2009-04-22 (3 months)
Cook: IEVOLI WHITE - Offshore Supply vessel / 2008-07-20 - 2008-11-07 (4 months)
Cook: JORAN - Chemical tanker / 2008-04-04 - 2008-07-09 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Wesertor - Container Ship / 2008-01-08 - 2008-07-02 (6 months)
Motorman: George - Bulk Carrier / 2005-07-14 - 2006-04-05 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Ostrog - Crew boat / 2007-08-31 - 2007-10-31 (2 months)
Sandblaster: Dubai dry docks uae - Other vessels / 2002-06-01 - 2005-08-17 (3 years)