Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Sanar - 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-26 - 2018-10-11 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Leonid Loza - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-26 - 2017-09-12 (5 months)
Oiler: BOMAR REBECCA - Container Ship / 2018-03-19 - 2018-09-19 (6 months)
Wiper : LONGFJELL - General cargo / 2017-04-05 - 2017-09-28 (6 months)
Wiper : AHS HAMBURG - Container Ship / 2016-04-23 - 2016-10-12 (6 months)
Wiper : WILSON ASTAKOS - General cargo / 2014-11-19 - 2015-06-08 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: FOKKO UKENA - General cargo / 2013-07-13 - 2014-01-12 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Geo Ocean 3 - Survey vessel / 2018-08-15 - 2018-08-15 (0 days)
Chief Cook: Hyde Park - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-28 - 2018-07-28 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Max Limit - Container Ship / 2017-03-21 - 2017-07-16 (4 months)
Chief Cook: ROADRUNNER - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-01 - 2016-09-03 (5 months)
Chief Cook: LADOGA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-04 - 2015-09-02 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2018-06-07 - 2018-08-04 (2 months)
Master: Pacon - Container Ship / 2018-03-03 - 2018-07-22 (5 months)
Master: Pacon - Container Ship / 2017-08-09 - 2017-11-17 (3 months)
Master: Pacon - Container Ship / 2016-11-16 - 2017-03-28 (4 months)
Master: Pacon - Container Ship / 2016-04-18 - 2016-07-17 (3 months)
Master: Cape Nabil - Container Ship / 2015-08-02 - 2015-12-20 (5 months)
Oiler: MT WV UNO - Tug boat / 2017-05-16 - 2018-07-20 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: General Cargo - General cargo / 2015-07-07 - 2016-07-09 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: SUSU - Fishing vessel / 2005-06-01 - 2018-07-20 (13 years)
Deck Cadet: CADET - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-01-20 - 2018-07-20 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MV well sailing 1 - General cargo / 2017-10-28 - 2018-07-17 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: MV sino 7 - General cargo / 2016-07-28 - 2017-01-27 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Эвпатория - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-04 - 2018-06-04 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Portovyj-26 - Repair Vessel / 2017-07-10 - 2017-08-06 (1 month)
Painter: Cape Bari - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-08 - 2018-05-15 (4 months)
Painter: Ugale - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-14 - 2017-11-16 (4 months)
Painter: Elbtank Italy - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-20 - 2015-08-05 (5 months)
Painter: Elbtank Denmark - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-07-04 - 2014-11-07 (4 months)
Painter: Elbtank Denmark - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-12-12 - 2014-04-08 (4 months)
Master: Sanna - General cargo / 2018-02-25 - 2018-05-13 (3 months)
Master: Silda - General cargo / 2017-08-06 - 2017-12-27 (5 months)
Master: Industrial Maya - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-25 - 2017-04-27 (5 months)
Master: CFL Perfect - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-03-29 - 2016-08-07 (4 months)
Master: Industrial More - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-10-23 - 2016-01-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Granit - Tug boat / 2018-03-05 - 2018-05-04 (2 months)
OS: GULF - General cargo / 2017-11-05 - 2018-04-13 (5 months)
OS: varyag - RO-RO / 2017-07-20 - 2017-08-17 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: BBS RUSHMORE - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-05-28 - 2015-11-30 (6 months)
Master: Elaziz - General cargo / 2017-11-15 - 2018-03-04 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Elaziz - General cargo / 2017-05-10 - 2017-09-21 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: KOTLAS - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-09-18 - 2018-02-16 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: KOTLAS - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-01-29 - 2017-04-21 (3 months)
AB Seaman: ST.ANDREW - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-15 - 2018-02-13 (5 months)
OS: ST.GEORGE - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-27 - 2017-03-26 (8 months)
Steward: Orion Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-02 - 2018-02-07 (9 months)
OS: Danapris 1 - Dry cargo / 2016-11-24 - 2017-01-22 (2 months)
Mess Boy: Jaeger - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-16 - 2016-07-23 (7 months)
OS: ken orhid - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-15 - 2018-01-27 (5 months)
OS: tigris - Other vessels / 2017-02-08 - 2017-04-10 (2 months)
Messman: Stamford Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-15 - 2018-01-22 (7 months)
Messman: Wedellsborg - RO-RO / 2015-12-02 - 2016-06-04 (6 months)
Messman: Andean - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-22 - 2015-09-04 (7 months)
Mess Boy: Mozambique - Container Ship / 2014-01-16 - 2014-08-11 (7 months)