Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: пилад - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-10-02 - 2017-02-02 (4 months)
OS: Indian Solidarity - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-22 - 2017-01-26 (6 months)
OS: Bavaria - Container Ship / 2015-08-16 - 2016-03-02 (6 months)
OS: Shagang Giant - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-29 - 2015-03-23 (8 months)
OS: Cape Merlin - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-31 - 2014-03-01 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Wadi elkarm - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-20 - 2017-01-07 (7 months)
Mess Boy: Bridgegate - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-01 - 2016-12-02 (9 months)
Boatswain: Шокша - Dry Cargo / 2016-04-06 - 2016-09-07 (5 months)
Boatswain: Шокша - Dry Cargo / 2015-04-15 - 2015-12-05 (8 months)
Boatswain: Сармат - Dry Cargo / 2012-10-16 - 2012-12-24 (2 months)
AB Seaman: СэйлФри - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-03 - 2011-12-09 (6 months)
AB Seaman: VOLGONEFT - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-04-18 - 2016-08-25 (4 months)
AB Seaman: VOLGONEFT - Chemical tanker / 2016-04-18 - 2016-08-15 (4 months)
OS: MOSKOVSKIY-8 - Tug boat / 2016-05-23 - 2016-08-14 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Ferry / 2016-06-13 - 2016-07-11 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: BRP Artemio Ricarte - Survey vessel / 2016-05-22 - 2016-05-28 (6 days)
Deck Cadet: M/F Seddulbahir - Ferry / 2015-10-30 - 2016-05-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Mineral New York - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-15 - 2016-05-01 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Mineral New York - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-06 - 2015-04-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Mineral New York - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-19 - 2014-05-18 (6 months)
OS: Mineral Kyoto - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-01 - 2013-08-23 (7 months)
OS: Mineral Manila - Bulk Carrier / 2012-04-08 - 2012-10-02 (6 months)
Storekeeper: M.V.Revelation - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-06-19 - 2016-03-17 (9 months)
Storekeeper: D.S.V. Seamec 1 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-11-22 - 2015-01-26 (2 months)
Store Keeper: D.S.V. Seamec Princess - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-07-16 - 2014-09-13 (2 months)
Motorman-welder: M.T.Maximus - Bunkering Vessel / 2015-05-17 - 2016-03-16 (10 months)
Cook: Vega - General cargo / 2015-09-11 - 2016-03-06 (6 months)
Cook: Cerencan - General cargo / 2015-03-17 - 2015-07-20 (4 months)
Motorman: Viking - Fishing vessel / 2015-08-22 - 2016-02-26 (6 months)
Chief Cook: faeton - Chemical tanker / 2008-08-01 - 2016-02-02 (7 years)
Motorman: RAWABI 19 - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-02-16 - 2015-12-15 (10 months)
Motorman: RAWABI 11 - AHTS / 2014-08-05 - 2015-01-31 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Don Star - Dry Cargo / 2015-01-27 - 2015-10-27 (9 months)
El. Engineer: Somia - Dry Cargo / 2015-01-12 - 2015-01-15 (3 days)
El. Engineer: Alga - Dry Cargo / 2012-09-13 - 2012-12-13 (3 months)