Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Bylat - Tug boat / 2015-07-24 - 2015-09-22 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Delphin - General cargo / 2015-02-25 - 2015-09-03 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Mechta S - General cargo / 2014-03-27 - 2014-08-05 (4 months)
Guest Services Manager: Norwegian Dawn - Cruise Liner / 2015-05-06 - 2015-08-15 (3 months)
Guest Services Manager: Norwegian Dawn - Cruise Liner / 2014-12-07 - 2015-04-12 (4 months)
Guest Services Manager: Norwegian Dawn - Cruise Liner / 2014-09-12 - 2014-10-24 (1 month)
Guest Services Manager: Norwegian Dawn - Cruise Liner / 2014-01-12 - 2014-05-16 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: SMART - General cargo / 2015-02-04 - 2015-08-08 (6 months)
Wiper: Tug chatu - Tug boat / 2014-08-02 - 2015-07-21 (12 months)
Chief Engineer: IBEEV - Standby-safety vessel / 2012-05-15 - 2015-06-29 (3 years)
Chief Engineer: Ievoli Orange - AHTS / 2012-02-02 - 2012-03-30 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: P-1 - Accommodation barge / 2011-10-07 - 2011-12-30 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Ievoleco Secondo - Platform Supply vessel / 2011-09-05 - 2011-10-03 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Goodway - Dry Cargo / 2010-12-27 - 2011-06-25 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Princess Jerlyn - General cargo / 2014-04-10 - 2015-04-21 (1 year)
Chief Cook: Pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-08-18 - 2015-04-15 (8 months)
Chief Cook: Pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-01-08 - 2014-04-30 (4 months)
Mess Boy: Pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-04-29 - 2013-10-10 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Tour Pomerol - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-21 - 2015-03-17 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Tour Pomerol - Chemical tanker / 2014-08-19 - 2014-11-24 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Tour Pomerol - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-07 - 2014-07-11 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Tour Margaux - Chemical tanker / 2013-11-19 - 2014-02-23 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Sichem Melbourne - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-26 - 2013-08-23 (4 months)
3rd Officer: DRESDEN - RO-RO / 2014-09-29 - 2014-12-20 (3 months)
3rd Officer: VIKING DIAMOND - RO-RO / 2014-05-20 - 2014-09-06 (4 months)
3rd Officer: VIKING CORAL - RO-RO / 2013-10-10 - 2014-03-08 (5 months)
3rd Officer: VIKING DIAMOND - RO-RO / 2013-04-25 - 2013-09-08 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Sea Star - General cargo / 2014-01-06 - 2014-11-01 (10 months)
Motorman: Sea Star - General cargo / 2013-03-31 - 2013-07-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Arabatsky - Dredger / 2011-03-31 - 2011-10-11 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Diorit - Research vessel / 2010-09-08 - 2010-11-10 (2 months)
OS-Cook: acm deysi - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-09-11 - 2014-09-05 (12 months)
Cook: delphina - Dry Cargo / 2012-12-02 - 2013-05-03 (5 months)
Cook: feruz - RO-RO / 2011-10-23 - 2012-05-02 (6 months)
Cook: Fauna - Livestock / 2010-10-16 - 2011-05-03 (7 months)
Cook: sukriye - Dry Cargo / 2010-10-11 - 2011-04-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: m/v "Sormovskiy 48" - Dry Cargo / 2002-07-05 - 2014-08-31 (12 years)
Oiler: m/v Rawabi 26 - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-04-17 - 2014-07-11 (3 months)
Motorman: M/V Tase - General cargo / 2013-04-11 - 2013-07-02 (3 months)
Motorman: N/t TEC 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-06-12 - 2012-10-25 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: M/v lime - General cargo / 2011-05-26 - 2011-11-27 (6 months)
Master: ALI BEY - General cargo / 2014-06-11 - 2014-06-29 (1 month)
Master: SUAT BEY - General cargo / 2012-10-18 - 2012-10-22 (4 days)
Master: SUAT BEY - General cargo / 2009-10-26 - 2012-05-02 (2 years)
Master: CAROLA - General cargo / 2007-02-25 - 2008-05-25 (1 year)
Master: CHRISTINA - General cargo / 2006-08-06 - 2006-11-18 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Modulus 2 - General cargo / 2014-01-16 - 2014-06-28 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Modulu-2 - General cargo / 2014-01-19 - 2014-06-24 (5 months)
El. Engineer: TITAN 2 - Crane vessel / 2013-11-17 - 2014-02-26 (3 months)
El. Engineer: TITAN 2 - Crane vessel / 2013-05-05 - 2013-07-31 (3 months)
El. Engineer: TITAN 2 - Crane vessel / 2012-10-08 - 2013-02-05 (4 months)
El. Engineer: TITAN 2 - Crane vessel / 2012-03-20 - 2012-06-12 (3 months)
El. Engineer: Courbet - Tug boat / 2011-01-25 - 2011-07-25 (6 months)
El. Engineer: svir - General cargo / 2013-12-15 - 2014-01-24 (1 month)
El. Engineer: svir - General cargo / 2013-12-15 - 2014-01-21 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: m/v Irida - General cargo / 2013-07-10 - 2014-01-11 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Bislan - General cargo / 2013-05-28 - 2013-07-02 (1 month)
Chief Officer: SANDRA II - Dry Cargo / 2013-09-11 - 2014-01-08 (4 months)
Chief Officer: AMUR 2516 - General cargo / 2012-11-05 - 2013-04-22 (6 months)
2nd Officer: AMUR 2516 - General cargo / 2011-11-11 - 2012-07-11 (8 months)
2nd Officer: AMUR 2516 - General cargo / 2011-03-11 - 2011-07-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: AMUR 2516 - General cargo / 2010-11-06 - 2011-02-06 (3 months)