Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: M/V BADE - General cargo / 2017-12-12 - 2018-12-22 (1 year)
AB / Motorman : ООО ТК-Лидер - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-08-17 - 2018-11-22 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Training simulator Kotlas - Training Ship / 2018-11-11 - 2018-11-16 (5 days)
Deck Cadet: M/V DIONE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-01 - 2018-11-05 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Oltenitsa - General cargo / 2018-07-23 - 2018-11-04 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Alithia - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-28 - 2012-12-07 (8 months)
OS: Alberta - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-28 - 2011-08-30 (10 months)
Electric Cadet: МB-169 - Tug boat / 2017-05-30 - 2018-10-28 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: M.T. WAWASAN TOPAZ - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-29 - 2018-10-05 (6 days)
Deck Cadet: M.T. MARITIME SUZANNE - Chemical tanker / 2017-11-26 - 2018-07-31 (8 months)
Master: DS Marmadura - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-06-30 - 2018-10-01 (3 months)
Master: Thorco Crystal - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-12-04 - 2017-12-04 (2 years)
Master: Marconnecticut - Container Ship / 2015-01-29 - 2015-06-08 (4 months)
Master: Marchaser - Container Ship / 2005-09-10 - 2014-10-30 (9 years)
Cook: Atlantik Ledi - Reefer / 2018-08-03 - 2018-09-23 (2 months)
Cook: Polaris - Dredger / 2017-12-01 - 2018-04-06 (4 months)
Cook: IRBENSKY - Dredger / 2016-12-22 - 2017-09-05 (8 months)
Cook: СЕЛЕМДЖА - Dry Cargo / 2016-08-14 - 2016-11-30 (4 months)
OS: MOGUCHIY - Tug boat / 2018-07-23 - 2018-09-21 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: HANSA REBDSBURG - Container Ship / 2018-07-11 - 2018-09-17 (2 months)
Motorman: Novator - Tug boat / 2018-06-13 - 2018-08-13 (2 months)
Wiper: Murjan - Tug boat / 2018-03-28 - 2018-08-09 (4 months)
AB Seaman: IVAN SERGIYENKO - General cargo / 2018-06-28 - 2018-08-01 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: City of Glasgow college - Training Ship / 2017-08-27 - 2018-08-01 (11 months)
Cook: ADES - General cargo / 2018-06-27 - 2018-07-28 (1 month)
Cook: AT 40 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-09 - 2017-12-11 (6 months)
Cook: NAVIGATOR B - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-02 - 2016-10-04 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2018-04-15 - 2018-06-15 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: MV.CoCo Gyun - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-07-14 - 2018-06-07 (11 months)
2nd Engineer: MV.Kyaukpyu - General cargo / 2016-06-15 - 2016-11-30 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: MV.Northern Volition - Container Ship / 2015-07-25 - 2015-08-08 (14 days)
2nd Engineer: MV.Magway - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-05-29 - 2015-05-23 (12 months)
3rd Engineer: MT.Kiel - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-07-01 - 2014-01-05 (6 months)
ETO: Aleksandr Tkachenko - RO-RO / 2017-09-03 - 2018-05-29 (9 months)
ETO: Aleksandr Tkachenko - RO-RO / 2017-04-06 - 2017-06-16 (2 months)
ETO: Aleksandr Tkachenko - RO-RO / 2016-08-30 - 2017-02-06 (5 months)
ETO: Richard M Currence - AHTS / 2015-06-19 - 2015-12-31 (6 months)
ETO: Richard M Currence - AHTS / 2014-10-21 - 2015-05-21 (7 months)
Electrician: ADRIANA - Passenger vessel / 2017-10-03 - 2018-05-26 (8 months)
Electrician: TIYAM - General cargo / 2016-10-10 - 2017-04-07 (6 months)
Electrician: TIYAM - General cargo / 2016-02-23 - 2016-08-19 (6 months)