Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
El. Engineer: Semen Dejnev - General cargo / 2014-05-05 - 2015-02-14 (9 months)
El. Engineer: Semen Deznev - General cargo / 2014-05-05 - 2014-11-22 (7 months)
OS: Africa - Cement Carrier / 2014-04-29 - 2014-08-12 (3 months)
OS: Petr Zhitnikov - Reefer / 2013-04-24 - 2014-04-20 (12 months)
OS: "Rodnik" - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-03-28 - 2014-05-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Aghios Makarios - Bulk Carrier / 2014-01-10 - 2014-04-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Dona Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-13 - 2013-09-07 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Tsentavr - Tug boat / 2012-12-13 - 2014-02-05 (1 year)
AB Seaman: CAPTAIN MOKEEV - Reefer / 2009-09-29 - 2010-03-11 (5 months)
AB Seaman: PROLIV LONGA - Reefer / 2008-08-09 - 2009-03-19 (7 months)
AB Seaman: AKHTIAR - Tug boat / 2006-11-06 - 2008-01-19 (1 year)
AB Seaman: черноморец-3 - Crane vessel / 2006-03-02 - 2006-10-30 (8 months)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: BBC Pluto - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-14 - 2014-01-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: BBC Balboa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-10-10 - 2013-04-04 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Mary - General cargo / 2013-08-24 - 2013-12-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Tychy - RO-RO / 2012-11-10 - 2013-05-08 (6 months)
Chief Officer: TIM B - Dry Cargo / 2012-01-01 - 2012-06-28 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Granat - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-03-15 - 2011-08-01 (5 months)
Chief Officer: GRANAT - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-03-15 - 2011-06-09 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: TAURUS - General cargo / 2013-04-07 - 2013-12-23 (9 months)
OS: Tien Hau - General cargo / 2012-02-01 - 2012-09-05 (7 months)
El. Engineer: bourbon argos - AHTS / 2013-09-07 - 2013-12-17 (3 months)
El. Engineer: js bandol - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-07 - 2013-08-19 (5 months)
El. Engineer: js bandol - Bulk Carrier / 2012-05-12 - 2012-12-31 (8 months)
El. Engineer: atlantic ocean - Container Ship / 2011-05-28 - 2011-11-26 (6 months)
ETO: champion - Container Ship / 2010-11-25 - 2011-04-05 (4 months)
Master: Zallaq - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-06-05 - 2013-12-05 (6 months)
Master: Zirku - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-01-12 - 2013-05-15 (4 months)
Master: Zallaq - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-04-14 - 2012-11-15 (7 months)
Master: Titan Glory - VLCC / 2011-11-26 - 2012-03-14 (4 months)
Master: Dewi Maeswara - VLCC / 2011-04-25 - 2011-09-18 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Bultic Novel - Reefer / 2013-09-20 - 2013-12-01 (2 months)
Electrician: Bultic Sun - Reefer / 2013-04-17 - 2013-06-21 (2 months)
Chief Cook: Borislav - Chemical tanker / 2012-12-17 - 2013-07-17 (7 months)
Cook: seaways 2 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-07-15 - 2011-10-09 (3 months)
Cook: m/v ACT - General cargo / 2010-05-22 - 2011-02-10 (9 months)
Cook: m/v EUROTRADER - General cargo / 2009-09-21 - 2010-03-31 (6 months)
Master: ARCTIC BREEZE - Chemical tanker / 2013-02-07 - 2013-06-30 (5 months)
Master: Hermitage Bridge - Chemical tanker / 2012-02-03 - 2012-06-19 (5 months)
Master: Orestina - Chemical tanker / 2011-05-09 - 2011-09-17 (4 months)
Master: Chem Norma - Chemical tanker / 2010-07-08 - 2010-11-11 (4 months)
Master: Skledros - Chemical tanker / 2009-12-15 - 2010-04-26 (4 months)
Senior DPO: dfqdqwef - Accomodation barge / 2013-04-18 - 2013-04-30 (12 days)
DP Officer: adsfdsa - Accomodation barge / 2013-04-10 - 2013-04-23 (13 days)
Motorman: Offshore rani - Accommodation barge / 2012-07-19 - 2013-03-13 (8 months)
Motorman: Falkor - AHTS / 2011-11-24 - 2012-07-16 (8 months)
Motorman: INYA - AHTS / 2011-06-17 - 2011-11-24 (5 months)
Motorman: Birychy - Chemical tanker / 2009-05-02 - 2010-11-05 (1 year)
Motorman: Tarhankyt - Tug boat / 2000-08-15 - 2004-10-10 (4 years)
2nd Engineer: Oryx - AHT / 2012-10-10 - 2013-02-06 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Oryx - AHT / 2012-09-12 - 2013-02-01 (5 months)
Motorman: Munevver - General cargo / 2012-07-14 - 2013-01-15 (6 months)
Motorman: Evaluna - Bulk Carrier / 2011-06-02 - 2011-11-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Pontica - Bulk Carrier / 2010-06-11 - 2010-11-17 (5 months)
Motorman: Pontica - Bulk Carrier / 2009-09-22 - 2010-04-12 (7 months)
Motorman: "Nama" - Bulk Carrier / 2009-05-22 - 2009-06-26 (1 month)
OS: Медногорск - Dry Cargo / 2012-06-18 - 2012-12-20 (6 months)
Motorman: Flying Enterprise - Survey vessel / 2012-09-05 - 2012-12-18 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: DON - Bunkering Vessel / 2011-02-06 - 2011-04-08 (2 months)