Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Oiler: Ice Eagle - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-07 - 2020-02-28 (6 months)
Single Engineer: Ice Eagle - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-27 - 2017-11-15 (6 months)
Single Engineer: Vyacheslav Pankov - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-02 - 2016-08-16 (2 months)
Motorman: CAP Andreas - Container Ship / 2020-02-06 - 2020-02-27 (1 month)
Motorman: M/V Erving - Container Ship / 2018-10-27 - 2019-03-11 (4 months)
Buffet Server: MSC Cruises - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-10 - 2020-01-11 (8 months)
Crane Operator: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-20 - 2019-12-25 (2 months)
Crane Operator: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-12 - 2019-10-01 (3 months)
Crane Operator: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-27 - 2019-04-25 (3 months)
Crane Operator: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-02 - 2018-12-02 (2 months)
Crane Operator: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-22 - 2018-08-25 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Agat Zejt III - AHTS / 2019-08-16 - 2019-12-20 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Nordic Light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-12 - 2019-12-07 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Bareilly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-11-12 - 2019-02-27 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: Bareilly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-03 - 2018-11-11 (1 month)
Motorman: Nordic Luna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-13 - 2018-05-04 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Marina - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-01 - 2019-11-23 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Riviera - Passenger vessel / 2018-08-30 - 2019-02-26 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Sirena - Cruise Liner / 2017-12-19 - 2018-06-06 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Regatta - Cruise Liner / 2017-04-14 - 2017-10-14 (6 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Marina - Cruise Liner / 2016-08-31 - 2017-02-18 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Thalassa Hellas - Container Ship / 2019-07-07 - 2019-11-22 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Cap San Sounio - Container Ship / 2018-12-04 - 2019-02-12 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Cap San Sounio - Container Ship / 2018-03-30 - 2018-09-11 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Thalassa Elpida - Container Ship / 2017-07-12 - 2017-12-02 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Cap San Tainaro - Container Ship / 2016-11-27 - 2017-04-21 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Brigadir - Training Ship / 2019-05-15 - 2019-11-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Rix Mistral - General cargo / 2019-06-22 - 2019-11-13 (5 months)
Bar Stewardess: AIDAStella - Cruise Liner / 2019-01-15 - 2019-11-12 (10 months)
Master: Coastal Discovery - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-02-26 - 2019-11-01 (8 months)
Motorman: MSC Luna F - Container Ship / 2019-03-19 - 2019-10-24 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Inzhener Valchuk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-14 - 2018-12-17 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Brentix - Chemical tanker / 2018-02-15 - 2018-04-21 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Fenix Oil - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-17 - 2017-12-20 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Fenix Oil - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-22 - 2017-07-14 (8 months)
El. Engineer: Fesco Posyet - General cargo / 2019-04-12 - 2019-10-15 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Fesco Posyet - General cargo / 2018-06-02 - 2018-08-23 (3 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Fesco Posyet - General cargo / 2018-01-29 - 2018-06-01 (4 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Amur - General cargo / 2017-05-06 - 2017-10-12 (5 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Admiral Makarov - Icebreaker / 2016-07-06 - 2016-12-06 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: "Khadzhibey" - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-08 - 2019-09-22 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: "Druzhba" - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-06 - 2018-09-02 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Blue April - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-04 - 2019-09-18 (6 months)
OS: WONDER I - Container Ship / 2019-03-27 - 2019-09-16 (6 months)
Oiler: LCT Lily Princess - General cargo / 2017-03-13 - 2019-09-13 (2 years)
Deck Cadet: TSV "Druzhba" - Sailing Vessel / 2019-08-05 - 2019-09-01 (1 month)
AB Seaman: ST.Nicolas - General cargo / 2019-05-08 - 2019-09-01 (4 months)
OS: Spectrum 5 - General cargo / 2017-04-13 - 2017-11-16 (7 months)
OS: Babylon - General cargo / 2016-03-14 - 2016-10-22 (7 months)