Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Messman: Mt Astrea - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-13 - 2020-11-18 (4 months)
Messman: Serene jessica - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-30 - 2019-04-27 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MV Castor Troy - General cargo / 2019-11-17 - 2020-11-17 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Allan James - General cargo / 2018-05-16 - 2019-11-16 (1 year)
El. Engineer: Нептун-4 - Crane vessel / 2020-01-01 - 2020-10-29 (10 months)
El. Engineer: O.Yakovenko - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-12-18 - 2019-02-11 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Om-106 - Passenger vessel / 2016-10-03 - 2017-06-06 (8 months)
Electric Cadet: Omskiy-108 - General cargo / 2016-06-01 - 2016-10-01 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: RZK CONST ANTA - General cargo / 2020-09-04 - 2020-10-24 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: SSI TRIUMPH - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-15 - 2020-10-14 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: SSI PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-26 - 2019-09-19 (3 months)
3rd Officer: NEVSKIY PROSPECT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-28 - 2020-10-03 (3 months)
3rd Officer: SCF AMUR - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-18 - 2019-12-09 (6 months)
3rd Officer: SCF AMUR - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-27 - 2019-02-27 (4 months)
3rd Officer: SCF USSURI - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-16 - 2018-01-08 (7 months)
3rd Officer: SCF USSURI - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-12 - 2017-01-01 (5 months)
OS: Zambesi - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-10 - 2020-09-29 (9 months)
OS: Celebes Clober - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-29 - 2019-11-14 (4 months)
OS: Jp Azure - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-14 - 2019-01-12 (9 months)
Wiper: training and production vessel - Training Ship / 2020-07-24 - 2020-09-27 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: STS "Mir" - Sailing Vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-09-27 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2020-07-20 - 2020-09-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: M.T Emirates peace - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-25 - 2020-09-26 (1 year)
Oiler: M.V IDA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-18 - 2020-09-25 (9 months)
Oiler: M.V COMET - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-02 - 2019-10-17 (8 months)
Wiper: ZIM BARCELONA - Container Ship / 2017-11-01 - 2018-08-12 (9 months)
Oiler: M.V.STAR 1 - General cargo / 2016-07-04 - 2017-08-16 (1 year)
Oiler: M.V.STAR 1 - General cargo / 2014-09-24 - 2015-09-14 (12 months)
OS: M.V. STC COLUMBUS - General cargo / 2019-12-14 - 2020-09-24 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2020-06-15 - 2020-09-21 (3 months)
Motorman: m/v Zherekh - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-04 - 2020-09-17 (3 months)
Wiper: TAN BINH 134 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-03 - 2020-09-15 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: RIL - Tug boat / 2020-06-01 - 2020-09-11 (3 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Svyatitel Innokentiy - Dry Cargo / 2020-04-24 - 2020-09-10 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Svyatitel Innokentiy - General cargo / 2019-05-15 - 2019-12-04 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Dolphin2 - Container Ship / 2019-12-19 - 2020-09-08 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: MV Kristina - Container Ship / 2019-02-28 - 2019-10-06 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: M/V Panagia Armata - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-05 - 2018-11-23 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: M/V Polymnia - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-24 - 2018-01-05 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Cerigo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-06-18 - 2016-12-15 (6 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Shturman Scherbinin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-12-01 - 2020-09-05 (3 years)