Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: EVPATORIA - Dry Cargo / 2015-01-19 - 2015-03-19 (2 months)
El. Engineer: sdf - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-01 - 2014-12-25 (1 month)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: eeerty - Bulk Carrier / 2002-12-05 - 2003-12-04 (12 months)
Cargo Operator: Ave Caesar - Dredger / 2014-02-02 - 2014-12-02 (10 months)
Cargo Operator: Ave Caesar - Dredger / 2013-02-21 - 2013-12-02 (9 months)
Cargo Operator: Ave Caesar - Dredger / 2011-10-29 - 2012-07-02 (8 months)
DP Officer: Jascon 55 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-09-24 - 2014-11-03 (1 month)
Senior DPO: Stanford Buzzard - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-05-10 - 2013-07-11 (2 months)
DP Officer: Stanford Buzzard - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-03-10 - 2013-05-09 (2 months)
DP Officer: Stanford Buzzard - Offshore Supply vessel / 2012-11-02 - 2012-12-29 (2 months)
DP Officer: Stanford buzzard - Offshore Supply vessel / 2012-06-06 - 2012-08-21 (2 months)
Chief Officer: SAINT NEKTARIS - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-04 - 2014-10-25 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Brave - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-03 - 2013-12-04 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Brave - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-03 - 2013-12-04 (1 year)
Chief Officer: hamburg - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-06 - 2013-09-08 (6 months)
Chief Officer: HAMBURG - Bulk Carrier / 2013-01-15 - 2013-05-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: CMS - 3 - AHT / 2014-10-09 - 2014-10-20 (11 days)
Chief Officer: CMS Igid - AHT / 2014-09-29 - 2014-10-08 (9 days)
Chief Officer: VOS Athos - AHTS / 2013-12-21 - 2014-02-24 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Helios - 5501 - AHTS / 2013-07-15 - 2013-09-07 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Helios - 5501 - AHTS / 2013-01-11 - 2013-04-05 (3 months)
Boatswain: SCF Khibiny - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-08-14 - 2014-08-21 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Dp Star - Survey vessel / 2014-04-20 - 2014-07-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM IVANHOE - Container Ship / 2013-08-03 - 2013-11-30 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Cap Harvey - Container Ship / 2013-02-22 - 2013-05-29 (3 months)
Motorman: Нептун 4 - Crane vessel / 2013-09-01 - 2013-12-31 (4 months)
Motorman: Palmira - Dry Cargo / 2013-06-14 - 2013-12-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Окский-56 - General cargo / 2012-06-23 - 2012-08-23 (2 months)
Motorman: Окский-56 - General cargo / 2012-06-23 - 2012-08-23 (2 months)
Steward: MARE CARRIBEAN - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-29 - 2013-11-28 (7 months)
Steward: Baltic Commander1 - Chemical tanker / 2012-05-24 - 2013-01-18 (8 months)
Steward: Ocean Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2009-05-02 - 2009-09-30 (5 months)
Steward: Sider Blu - Bulk Carrier / 2007-10-16 - 2008-04-26 (6 months)
Steward: LT Bianca - Container Ship / 2006-09-30 - 2007-05-11 (7 months)
OS: ISADORA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-17 - 2013-11-05 (6 months)
OS: ISADORA - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-15 - 2013-04-05 (7 months)
OS: moscov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-04-13 - 2013-10-13 (6 months)
OS: moscov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-04-13 - 2013-10-13 (6 months)
No Experience
OS: TIO - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-05 - 2013-08-09 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Phoenix - Tug boat / 2012-07-24 - 2013-07-24 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: m/v Esil - Tug boat / 2006-07-27 - 2012-03-01 (5 years)
2nd Officer: Markborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-12-29 - 2013-07-23 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Medemborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-02-26 - 2012-09-06 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Merian - Bulk Carrier / 2011-01-04 - 2011-09-15 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Merian - Bulk Carrier / 2010-02-18 - 2010-09-28 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Pavian - Bulk Carrier / 2009-01-15 - 2009-08-11 (7 months)
Motorman: athenian phoenix - Bulk Carrier / 2013-01-29 - 2013-07-09 (5 months)
Motorman: Front Guider - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-11 - 2012-09-06 (7 months)
Motorman: Front Stiver - Bulk Carrier / 2011-03-04 - 2011-08-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Front Leader - Bulk Carrier / 2010-06-19 - 2010-11-27 (5 months)
Motorman: Front Leader - Bulk Carrier / 2010-06-19 - 2010-11-27 (5 months)
Motorman: Gruper - General cargo / 2013-01-18 - 2013-06-14 (5 months)