Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Engineer: Mol Gateway - Container Ship / 2018-07-14 - 2018-10-17 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Mol Gateway - Container Ship / 2017-11-23 - 2018-03-20 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Mol Gateway - Container Ship / 2017-03-06 - 2017-07-10 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Mol Generosity - Container Ship / 2016-07-28 - 2016-11-28 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Mol Gateway - Container Ship / 2015-11-30 - 2016-03-24 (4 months)
OS: m/v Chelsea-6 - General cargo / 2018-05-16 - 2018-10-12 (5 months)
OS: m/v Aspro - General cargo / 2017-09-15 - 2018-01-12 (4 months)
OS: m/v SEVERUS - Reefer / 2017-05-20 - 2017-08-31 (3 months)
OS: F/V SENATOR - Fishing vessel / 2017-01-10 - 2017-04-08 (3 months)
OS: JUROS VILKAS - Fishing vessel / 2016-02-08 - 2016-07-15 (5 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Tonjer - MRSV / 2018-08-21 - 2018-10-09 (2 months)
Motorman: Mutawa 106 - AHTS / 2017-06-15 - 2018-01-26 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Klavdiya Elanskaya - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-20 - 2018-09-26 (1 year)
Electrician: AMUR 2505 - General cargo / 2018-03-20 - 2018-09-22 (6 months)
Electrician: Albany - General cargo / 2017-07-06 - 2018-01-10 (6 months)
Electrician: "AMUR 2520" - General cargo / 2017-01-20 - 2017-05-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MV INTERLINK QUALITY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-17 - 2018-09-20 (1 year)
Motorman: Yuniy Baltiets - Training Ship / 2018-06-28 - 2018-09-20 (3 months)
Motorman: Porada - General cargo / 2018-07-03 - 2018-09-05 (2 months)
Motorman: Zuid - Tug boat / 2018-07-04 - 2018-09-01 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Atlantic South - Container Ship / 2018-04-19 - 2018-09-01 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Max Producer - Container Ship / 2017-11-15 - 2018-03-25 (4 months)
Chief Officer: VIKING EMERALD - RO-RO / 2017-02-11 - 2017-06-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: VIKING EMERALD - RO-RO / 2016-09-26 - 2016-11-28 (2 months)
Chief Officer: VIKING EMERALD - RO-RO / 2016-02-15 - 2016-06-09 (4 months)
OS / Welder: Sibirskiy-2133 - General cargo / 2018-03-04 - 2018-08-31 (6 months)
OS / Welder: Byward - General cargo / 2017-05-28 - 2017-10-19 (5 months)
OS / Welder: English Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-15 - 2016-05-12 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: m/t "NOX" - Chemical tanker / 2018-02-27 - 2018-08-31 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: m/t "Limar" - Chemical tanker / 2016-08-19 - 2016-12-28 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: m/t "Limar" - Chemical tanker / 2016-08-25 - 2016-12-28 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: M/T AKAMAS - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-17 - 2015-08-20 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: M/T AKAMAS - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-17 - 2015-08-20 (5 months)
OS: Mexanik Alekseev - Tug boat / 2017-09-05 - 2018-08-20 (11 months)
OS: Kuyalnik - Dredger / 2011-09-10 - 2012-03-10 (6 months)
OS: Kuyalnik - Dredger / 2011-01-20 - 2011-07-27 (6 months)
OS: Skulptor Tomskiy - Reefer / 2008-10-03 - 2009-03-30 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V Jack Daniel - RO-RO / 2017-08-10 - 2018-08-11 (1 year)
Fitter / Welder: Deribas - Other vessels / 2018-02-15 - 2018-08-06 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: DERIBAS - Other vessels / 2017-06-03 - 2017-08-18 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: AFTERHOURS - Other vessels / 2017-01-23 - 2017-04-02 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Ariadne - Other vessels / 2016-01-16 - 2016-07-23 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Boston - Other vessels / 2015-02-01 - 2015-07-23 (6 months)
Trainee Engineer: Prabhu Vidya - Barge / 2018-02-16 - 2018-07-23 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Kaiser Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-02-22 - 2018-07-23 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Kaiser Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-14 - 2017-09-01 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Kaiser Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-07-19 - 2016-12-01 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Kaiser Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-11-22 - 2016-03-23 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Kaiser Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-03-21 - 2015-07-20 (4 months)
OS: Svyataya Anna - General cargo / 2018-01-05 - 2018-07-18 (6 months)
OS: Annabella 1 - General cargo / 2017-04-12 - 2017-08-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Volgo Don 5038 - General cargo / 2015-05-02 - 2015-11-12 (6 months)
Motorman: Leonid Leonov - General cargo / 2017-09-24 - 2018-07-17 (10 months)
Wiper : m/v Ionian Sea - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-02 - 2012-03-15 (6 months)
Wiper : m/v Ionian Sea - Bulk Carrier / 2010-11-16 - 2011-04-30 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Ice Star - Container Ship / 2018-04-08 - 2018-06-21 (2 months)
2nd Officer: SUDEROOG - Container Ship / 2017-08-01 - 2017-12-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: BBC Amazon - General cargo / 2016-10-14 - 2017-03-21 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Langeness - Container Ship / 2015-11-20 - 2016-05-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: BBC Nile - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-10-10 - 2015-06-21 (8 months)