Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Venturer - Seismic vessel / 2018-01-31 - 2018-04-11 (2 months)
Mechanic: Topaz Captain - Construction vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-10-14 (3 months)
Mechanic: Topaz Captain - Construction vessel / 2017-03-05 - 2017-05-18 (2 months)
Mechanic: Athens Star - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-11 - 2016-01-18 (2 months)
4th Engineer: SIEM STINGRAY - Construction vessel / 2015-01-25 - 2015-03-09 (1 month)
Messman: MSC KOREA - Container Ship / 2017-09-14 - 2018-04-10 (7 months)
Messman: MSC ALABAMA - Container Ship / 2016-10-22 - 2017-05-23 (7 months)
Messman: MSC KOREA - Container Ship / 2016-01-16 - 2016-07-25 (6 months)
Messman: MSC JAPAN - Container Ship / 2015-05-05 - 2015-11-04 (6 months)
Messman: MSCJOY - Container Ship / 2014-06-29 - 2015-01-21 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Nordic Light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-30 - 2018-04-05 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Nordic Passat - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-03-17 - 2017-07-24 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Mare Baltic - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-13 - 2017-02-04 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mare Baltic - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-29 - 2016-04-30 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mare Baltic - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-26 - 2015-07-02 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Spanaco Reliability - General cargo / 2017-08-21 - 2017-09-20 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Spanaco Loyalty - General cargo / 2017-01-24 - 2017-05-21 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Spanaco Loyalty - General cargo / 2016-04-16 - 2016-08-15 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Spanaco Reliability - General cargo / 2015-06-12 - 2015-10-05 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Industrial Aim - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-11-24 - 2018-03-25 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Industrial Aim - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-02-25 - 2017-05-22 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Industrial Challenger - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-05-09 - 2016-08-01 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Industrial Challenger - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-03-29 - 2016-05-09 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Industrial Challenger - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-12-08 - 2016-03-28 (4 months)
Master: Bakhtiyar Vahabzade - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-18 - 2018-03-14 (6 months)
Master: Bakhtiyar Vahabzade - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-08 - 2017-03-04 (5 months)
Master: Begim Aslanova - Chemical tanker / 2015-10-04 - 2016-03-11 (5 months)
Master: Fariz Ismailkhanov - Chemical tanker / 2014-08-29 - 2015-02-01 (5 months)
Master: Fariz Ismailkhanov - Chemical tanker / 2013-10-29 - 2014-03-28 (5 months)
Single Engineer: KOSTERBERG - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-11-13 - 2018-03-16 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Norgas Camilla - LPG / LNG / 2016-09-12 - 2017-01-03 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Norgas Pan - LPG / LNG / 2016-03-15 - 2016-07-17 (4 months)
AB Seaman: qawsed - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-07 - 2018-03-12 (5 days)
AB / Welder: tyr - Accommodation barge / 2018-03-01 - 2018-03-04 (3 days)
AB / Welder: alkor - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-30 - 2017-01-03 (8 months)
AB / Motorman : Carnival Cruise Line - Cruise Liner / 2014-02-06 - 2018-02-28 (4 years)
Motorman: m/v "Porada" general cargo, U - General cargo / 2017-12-18 - 2018-02-17 (2 months)
Chief Cook: NIKOLAY KUZNETSOV - General cargo / 2017-10-28 - 2018-02-17 (4 months)
Chief Cook: River Grace - General cargo / 2016-09-09 - 2016-12-10 (3 months)
Chief Cook: Greywin - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-15 - 2016-02-11 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Margit Gorthon - General cargo / 2008-12-10 - 2009-06-12 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Alida Gorthon - Dry Cargo / 2007-08-13 - 2008-08-23 (1 year)
Fitter / Welder: Sanar-7 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-11-22 - 2018-02-08 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: Boray - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-04-27 - 2017-10-30 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Afrodite - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-05-22 - 2016-11-18 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: orient transit - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-07 - 2016-03-07 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: orient trail - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-30 - 2015-02-19 (8 months)
Master: Admire Chinook - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-19 - 2018-01-27 (4 months)
Master: Ardmore Chinook - Chemical tanker / 2017-01-26 - 2017-05-10 (3 months)
Master: Ardmore Chinook - Chemical tanker / 2016-06-16 - 2016-10-07 (4 months)
Master: Ardmore Chinook - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-28 - 2016-02-14 (3 months)
Master: Pacific Lady - Chemical tanker / 2015-05-08 - 2015-07-22 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Regal Bay - Reefer / 2017-07-24 - 2018-01-22 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Regal Bay - Reefer / 2016-10-14 - 2017-04-09 (6 months)
ETO: Caribbean Mermaid - Reefer / 2014-08-23 - 2015-03-10 (6 months)
ETO: Eastern Bay - Reefer / 2013-10-04 - 2014-04-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Buzzard Bay - Reefer / 2012-09-04 - 2013-02-12 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: HA LONG BAY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-05 - 2018-01-17 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: PERSEAS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-09 - 2016-12-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: AS PATRIA - Container Ship / 2015-09-22 - 2016-01-13 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: LAVRIO - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-07 - 2015-05-19 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: LAVRIO - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-27 - 2014-08-03 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Leonidas - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-30 - 2018-01-15 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Crux - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-24 - 2017-03-09 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MSC Gabriella - Container Ship / 2015-08-25 - 2016-03-25 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Venus - Container Ship / 2013-12-08 - 2014-04-14 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Taurus - Container Ship / 2013-05-11 - 2013-10-20 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: bosco-gilan - General cargo / 2017-10-11 - 2018-01-10 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: bosco-gilan - General cargo / 2017-01-19 - 2017-10-06 (9 months)
2nd Engineer: Soren - General cargo / 2015-11-13 - 2016-05-08 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: FORAR - General cargo / 2015-01-30 - 2015-07-28 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: VODGAS - General cargo / 2014-06-13 - 2014-10-15 (4 months)
Motorman: New Orion - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-28 - 2018-01-06 (6 months)
Motorman: Baltic Mercyr2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-06-01 - 2016-11-06 (5 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Projekt 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-12-28 - 2016-05-16 (5 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Projekt 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-04-29 - 2015-08-24 (4 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Novigator - General cargo / 2014-10-17 - 2015-03-03 (4 months)
Motorman: ELITA - Training Ship / 2017-09-25 - 2017-12-25 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Silver lion - General cargo / 2017-07-12 - 2017-12-22 (5 months)
2nd Officer: DMYTRO KOTIUZHENKO - General cargo / 2015-06-10 - 2015-12-01 (6 months)
3rd Officer: HEROI STAKHORSKYI - General cargo / 2014-10-15 - 2014-11-25 (1 month)
2nd Officer: HEROI STAKHORSKYI - General cargo / 2014-10-03 - 2014-10-15 (12 days)
3rd Officer: HEROI STAKHORSKYI - General cargo / 2014-07-17 - 2014-10-03 (3 months)