Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: ILYA MUROMETS - General cargo / 2019-05-10 - 2019-10-25 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ILYA MUROMETS - General cargo / 2018-06-20 - 2018-12-10 (6 months)
Motorman: ILYA MUROMETS - General cargo / 2017-10-29 - 2018-04-07 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: ALYOSHA POPOVICH - General cargo / 2016-10-07 - 2017-04-05 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Amazonia - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-10 - 2015-02-10 (6 months)
2nd Cook: Regal Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-09-22 - 2019-10-24 (1 month)
Waiter: Mein Schiff 1 - Cruise Liner / 2011-08-13 - 2011-12-13 (4 months)
Wiper: MOGUCHIY - Tug boat / 2019-08-14 - 2019-10-14 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Atlantic Geneva - Container Ship / 2019-05-04 - 2019-10-12 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Max Champion / Atlantic Geneva - Container Ship / 2018-08-17 - 2018-12-09 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Thorco Crown - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-11-21 - 2018-03-12 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Thorco Cassiopeia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-04-20 - 2017-08-16 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Thorco Cassiopeia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-06-07 - 2016-11-12 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: TELEPASS - RO-RO / 2019-08-10 - 2019-10-09 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Yunyi Baltiets - Training Ship / 2019-09-27 - 2019-10-09 (12 days)
Engine Cadet: Yunyi Baltiets - Training Ship / 2019-06-27 - 2019-07-20 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Yunyi Baltiets - Training Ship / 2019-05-23 - 2019-06-21 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: KM INDAH COSTA - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-01 - 2019-10-05 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Nivenskoye - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-17 - 2019-10-05 (4 months)
Chief Officer: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-10 - 2019-10-05 (5 months)
Chief Officer: ROSALIA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-31 - 2019-01-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: ARAMIS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-23 - 2018-04-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: CORONA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-22 - 2017-05-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: PORTLAND - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-19 - 2016-05-01 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Могучий буксир - Tug boat / 2019-07-27 - 2019-09-30 (2 months)
Chief Cook: PIONEER - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-15 - 2019-09-27 (6 months)
Chief Cook: PIONEER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-29 - 2018-10-15 (6 months)
Chief Cook: pioneer - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-06-01 - 2017-11-17 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Catharina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-01 - 2019-09-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Catharina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-14 - 2018-11-20 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Catharina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-08 - 2018-03-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Cataharina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-30 - 2017-06-30 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Catharina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-17 - 2017-03-29 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: Ivan Krusebshtern - Icebreaker / 2019-08-26 - 2019-09-25 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: Ivan Krusebshtern - Icebreaker / 2019-07-16 - 2019-08-15 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2018-09-12 - 2018-11-15 (2 months)
Cook: Crucestar - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-28 - 2019-09-16 (6 months)
Cook: Fidelio - Passenger vessel / 2018-12-17 - 2019-01-12 (1 month)
Cook: Fidelio - Passenger vessel / 2018-05-16 - 2018-11-05 (6 months)
Cook: Dniper Princess - Passenger vessel / 2017-05-15 - 2017-10-09 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: ELITA - Training Ship / 2019-06-14 - 2019-09-14 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: ELITA - Training Ship / 2018-06-15 - 2018-09-15 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: USHBA - Tug boat / 2019-03-01 - 2019-09-09 (6 months)
Motorman: "GZS-I" - Dredger / 2019-06-01 - 2019-09-03 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: Glykofilousa III - RO-RO / 2018-06-01 - 2018-08-10 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: Glykofilousa III - RO-RO / 2018-04-01 - 2018-05-15 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Niko Nikoladze - Dredger / 2019-03-01 - 2019-08-31 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Нептун - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-08 - 2019-08-31 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Александр Яковенко - Tug boat / 2018-08-02 - 2018-08-29 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Капитан Меркулов - Tug boat / 2018-04-11 - 2018-06-11 (2 months)
Electrician: PERLITA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-31 - 2019-08-26 (5 months)
Electrician: Starry Metropolis - Passenger vessel / 2018-03-08 - 2018-10-30 (8 months)
Electrician: LADY BO - General cargo / 2017-06-09 - 2017-11-21 (5 months)