Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: MSC Mia Summer - Container Ship / 2019-09-17 - 2020-06-30 (9 months)
AB Seaman: MSC Jasmine - Container Ship / 2018-12-17 - 2019-06-24 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MSC Pilar - Container Ship / 2018-03-18 - 2018-10-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Spectra - General cargo / 2019-12-14 - 2020-06-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Zakamsk - General cargo / 2019-04-29 - 2019-08-31 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V SIFNOS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-19 - 2020-06-15 (8 months)
Chief Engineer: roshak - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-23 - 2020-06-07 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: delnavaz - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-07 - 2019-07-04 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: delnavaz - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-18 - 2018-09-30 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: dsc negeen - Passenger vessel / 2016-12-28 - 2017-03-05 (2 months)
Motorman: Kruzenshtern - Other vessels / 2019-11-08 - 2020-06-03 (7 months)
Motorman: Kruzenshtern - Other vessels / 2019-07-19 - 2019-08-22 (1 month)
OS: Kruzenshtern - Other vessels / 2019-03-28 - 2019-07-05 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Other vessels / 2018-04-25 - 2018-09-07 (4 months)
Motorman: Baklanovo - Fishing vessel / 2019-08-05 - 2020-05-31 (10 months)
OS: PM-82 - Other vessels / 2019-10-08 - 2020-04-18 (6 months)
Motorman: Myroslav - Tug boat / 2019-05-08 - 2020-04-15 (11 months)
Motorman: Myroslav - Tug boat / 2018-07-01 - 2019-04-16 (9 months)
Motorman: Maryupolets - Tug boat / 2017-07-01 - 2018-06-15 (11 months)
Motorman: Maryupolets - Tug boat / 2016-11-17 - 2017-06-15 (7 months)
Motorman: Gerkules - Tug boat / 2015-01-14 - 2015-12-25 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: Stellar Hudson - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-12 - 2020-04-12 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Thor Alpha - Tug boat / 2019-11-19 - 2020-03-26 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Thor Omega - Crew boat / 2019-05-01 - 2019-06-19 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Thor Alpha - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-08-01 - 2018-09-26 (3 years)
1st Officer: Thor Omega - Research vessel / 2012-04-15 - 2015-01-09 (2 years)
AB Seaman: Silver Lake - Reefer / 2020-01-08 - 2020-03-15 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Silver Lake - Reefer / 2019-09-06 - 2019-11-05 (2 months)
OS: ANDREY OSIPOV - General cargo / 2015-02-05 - 2015-06-19 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Mystic Striker - Bulk Carrier / 2012-04-30 - 2012-12-22 (8 months)
OS: Mystic Striker - Bulk Carrier / 2011-10-22 - 2012-04-30 (6 months)
Purser: M/S Princess Anastasia - Passenger vessel / 2016-07-12 - 2020-03-07 (3 years)
Cashier: M/S Princess Maria - Passenger vessel / 2014-03-12 - 2016-02-12 (1 year)
Receptionist: Grand Holiday - Cruise Liner / 2014-01-12 - 2014-02-12 (1 month)
Steward: Carnival Fascinations - Cruise Liner / 2010-03-01 - 2010-11-01 (8 months)
OS: Ossoy - AHTS / 2019-11-14 - 2020-02-29 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: STS Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-09-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: T.S PRIDE OF IMA - Training Ship / 2017-08-02 - 2020-02-24 (2 years)
Cook: MINERAL TEMSE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-21 - 2020-02-21 (2 months)
Cook: MINERAL DESTELBERGEN - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-11 - 2019-07-05 (7 months)
Cook: MIMI SELMER - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-08 - 2018-08-05 (7 months)
Cook: WEHR SCHULAU - Container Ship / 2017-01-06 - 2017-07-08 (6 months)
Cook: MIMI SELMER - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-11 - 2016-07-02 (7 months)
Painter: River Shiner - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-29 - 2020-02-20 (6 months)
Painter: FSL PERTH - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-09-09 - 2019-04-09 (7 months)
Painter: Amelia Pacific - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-11-14 - 2018-06-11 (7 months)
Painter: Brook Trout - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-11 - 2017-10-10 (5 months)
Painter: Muskie - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-14 - 2017-01-07 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M.T. Hari Sagar - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-07-04 - 2020-02-20 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: MT INFINITY 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-24 - 2018-10-26 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Daura - Other vessels / 2019-10-15 - 2020-02-15 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Bislan - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-15 - 2020-02-15 (1 month)
Dining Room Waiter: Faantasy - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-11 - 2020-02-05 (6 months)
Dining Room Head Waiter: splandor - Cruise Liner / 2018-11-11 - 2019-05-11 (6 months)
Dining Room Head Waiter: Sunshine - Cruise Liner / 2018-01-06 - 2018-08-11 (7 months)
Mess Boy: magic - Cruise Liner / 2013-10-12 - 2014-07-18 (9 months)
Cook: Miracle - Cruise Liner / 2005-12-11 - 2006-08-12 (8 months)