Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: SUNNY - Cruise Liner / 2020-08-30 - 2020-12-30 (4 months)
3rd Officer: QUEEN ANATOLIA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-23 - 2020-12-28 (5 months)
2nd Officer: DIAMANT - General cargo / 2019-08-27 - 2020-01-29 (5 months)
3rd Officer: HABIB NECCAR - RO-RO / 2018-10-20 - 2019-02-20 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: brothers-5 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-21 - 2020-12-27 (5 months)
Electrician: Mount Olympus - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-20 - 2020-12-24 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Mv Spirit of Altruism - RO-RO / 2020-12-07 - 2020-12-12 (5 days)
OS: Coral Chief - Container Ship / 2019-11-08 - 2020-06-04 (7 months)
OS: Forum Samoa 4 - Container Ship / 2018-05-21 - 2018-12-27 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Reef Endeavour - Cruise Liner / 2014-11-04 - 2017-04-18 (2 years)
Wiper: Vilena - RO-RO / 2020-09-18 - 2020-12-12 (3 months)
Oiler: Vilena - RO-RO / 2019-07-04 - 2020-03-21 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Cape ferrol - Container Ship / 2019-11-18 - 2020-12-04 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Guenther Schulte - Container Ship / 2020-08-10 - 2020-12-01 (4 months)
Electrician: Admiral Essen - NAVY / 2017-12-04 - 2020-02-17 (2 years)
Electric Cadet: Pobeda - Ferry / 2017-03-01 - 2017-06-03 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Pobeda - Ferry / 2016-10-01 - 2017-01-31 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: TORES - Tug boat / 2015-10-08 - 2015-12-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: SRIWANGI III - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-05 - 2020-11-30 (10 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Orlov - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-11 - 2020-11-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Orlov - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-13 - 2019-10-10 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Gerard Tide - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-08-06 - 2020-11-19 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Stratis Z - AHTS / 2020-01-15 - 2020-06-27 (5 months)
OS: KAN2 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-30 - 2019-12-20 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Fortune Express - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-12 - 2019-06-06 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MSM DON - General cargo / 2018-05-20 - 2018-10-25 (5 months)
OS: SBORSHCHIK-401 - Training Ship / 2020-09-14 - 2020-11-17 (2 months)
Wiper: MT KAIRO 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-24 - 2020-11-12 (9 months)
Medical Staff: DPFV ROCKPIPER - Pipe laying vessel / 2019-06-01 - 2020-11-11 (1 year)
Medical Staff: M/V Wind Ambition - Floating Hotel / 2015-10-23 - 2019-02-05 (3 years)
Engine Cadet: success energy XXXII - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-06 - 2020-10-25 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Wind - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-27 - 2020-10-25 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Commander 1 - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-22 - 2020-03-03 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Commander 1 - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-13 - 2019-06-23 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Commander 1 - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-16 - 2018-10-14 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Wave - Chemical tanker / 2017-10-31 - 2018-02-17 (4 months)
OS: Maran Virtue - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-27 - 2020-10-20 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Blue Wave - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-12 - 2020-03-16 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Begonia - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-28 - 2018-03-02 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Petrel bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-23 - 2020-10-18 (1 year)
El. Engineer: Owl bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-20 - 2019-01-27 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Grebe bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-10 - 2018-06-09 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Sandpiper bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-24 - 2017-09-22 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Owl bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-20 - 2016-12-22 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Hadjibey - Training Ship / 2020-06-29 - 2020-10-01 (3 months)
Stewardess: Skane Jet - Ferry / 2020-08-30 - 2020-09-30 (1 month)
Stewardess: Halunder jet - Crew boat / 2019-03-26 - 2019-10-31 (7 months)