Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: NEW DESTINY - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-20 - 2023-02-20 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: NEW DESTINY - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-23 - 2022-10-19 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: NEW VICTORY - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-11 - 2022-04-20 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: NEW GALAXY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-20 - 2021-09-17 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: NEW HORIZON - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-10 - 2020-09-27 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: GS Future - Chemical tanker / 2022-09-15 - 2022-12-17 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: GS Future - Chemical tanker / 2022-02-11 - 2022-05-26 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Stena Immortal - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-12 - 2021-10-26 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Stena Performance - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-26 - 2019-02-17 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Stena Impeccable - Chemical tanker / 2017-12-18 - 2018-05-09 (5 місяців)
1st Officer: CHRISTINA B - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-28 - 2022-12-13 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Menaro - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-24 - 2022-11-26 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Krenom - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-26 - 2022-04-17 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: Daxia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-14 - 2021-04-04 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: Daxia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-24 - 2019-12-09 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Daxia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-07 - 2019-07-23 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: BBC VERMONT - General cargo / 2021-10-12 - 2022-04-30 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: MEDITERRANEAN EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2021-08-21 - 2022-04-15 (8 місяців)
Master: Star Amethyst - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-26 - 2022-11-26 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Maribella - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-06 - 2022-04-03 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: SBI Macarena - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-16 - 2020-06-20 (11 місяців)
Chief Officer: SBI Macarena - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-24 - 2019-02-13 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: SBI Leo - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-18 - 2018-05-07 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: PS LONDON - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-02 - 2022-01-18 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: MESABI - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-15 - 2020-12-22 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: LUTSEN - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-19 - 2019-12-15 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: LUTSEN - Chemical tanker / 2018-08-16 - 2019-01-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: MESABI - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-09-17 - 2018-03-10 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Kanysh Satpayev - Survey vessel / 2019-11-07 - 2021-08-10 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: SA JET 1 - Crew boat / 2018-03-15 - 2019-07-15 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: Alpamys, Batyrkhan, Dzhigit - Tug boat / 2018-11-24 - 2018-12-24 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Turkestan - General cargo / 2017-09-03 - 2018-02-08 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Mercury - Tug boat / 2017-06-23 - 2017-08-31 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Zarnata Express - Container Ship / 2020-10-16 - 2021-04-01 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Cardiff Trader - Container Ship / 2020-02-21 - 2020-08-03 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Taipei Trader - Container Ship / 2019-07-15 - 2019-10-27 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Taipei Trader - Container Ship / 2018-11-17 - 2019-03-25 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Kent Trader - Container Ship / 2018-07-18 - 2018-09-05 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Elong Elong - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-02 - 2021-03-03 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Universal Baltimore - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-12 - 2019-10-01 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Universal Baltimore - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-06 - 2018-10-15 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Universal Baltimore - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-29 - 2018-02-05 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-05 - 2020-12-03 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-15 - 2019-11-07 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-18 - 2019-02-15 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-09 - 2018-05-05 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Gazpromneft Zuid - East - Chemical tanker / 2017-04-24 - 2017-07-14 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Vitus Bering - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-20 - 2020-09-11 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: ORIENT TRADER - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-06 - 2019-06-12 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: BARBARA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-09 - 2018-10-31 (4 місяця)
Master: TANJA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-15 - 2018-04-23 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: TANJA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-03 - 2018-03-15 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Gennaro Ievoli - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-07 - 2020-08-28 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Stanley Park - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-19 - 2019-10-28 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Battersea Park - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-27 - 2019-05-27 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Goldengate Park - Chemical tanker / 2018-05-09 - 2018-09-20 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Goldengate Park - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-08 - 2017-12-31 (5 місяців)
Master: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-19 - 2021-07-10 (1 місяць)
Master: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-17 - 2021-01-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-08 - 2020-07-23 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-29 - 2020-02-26 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-29 - 2019-11-27 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: OYA - DSV (Diving Support) / 2020-02-13 - 2020-07-06 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Hermit Galaxy - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-08-10 - 2019-11-06 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Markab - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-05-09 - 2019-06-06 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Far Starling - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-01-16 - 2019-02-28 (1 місяць)
2nd Officer: Far Starling - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-04-11 - 2018-12-17 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: Anuket Jade - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-08 - 2020-02-07 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Anuket Jade - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-08 - 2019-06-24 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Anuket Amber - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-07 - 2018-08-31 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Olesya - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-26 - 2018-01-08 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Olesya - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-10-09 - 2017-04-18 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: New Cap - General cargo / 2019-08-21 - 2020-01-23 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: New Cap - General cargo / 2019-03-22 - 2019-06-11 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: New Cap - General cargo / 2018-11-06 - 2019-03-21 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: New Cap - General cargo / 2017-09-09 - 2018-04-28 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Svetlana - General cargo / 2016-12-04 - 2017-05-18 (5 місяців)
Master: ARZIN - Container Ship / 2021-07-04 - 2021-11-06 (4 місяця)
Master: GFS RUBY - Container Ship / 2020-10-12 - 2021-04-06 (6 місяців)
Master: PACIFIC VICTOR - General cargo / 2019-10-09 - 2020-02-06 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: PACIFIC VICTOR - General cargo / 2019-08-09 - 2019-10-08 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: AVANG - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-18 - 2019-04-28 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Georgy Sedov - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-02-05 - 2019-06-29 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Grigory Shelikhov - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-01-15 - 2018-10-10 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: Vladimir Rusanov - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-10 - 2017-11-12 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Nataly - VLCC / 2016-07-26 - 2017-01-14 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: SVL Pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-02-08 - 2016-06-15 (4 місяця)