Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: M/V LYNX - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-01 - 2018-06-06 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: APELLIS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-11 - 2016-08-01 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: ORIENT SPIRIT - Container Ship / 2015-02-03 - 2015-08-10 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: RED SPIRIT - Container Ship / 2014-04-17 - 2014-10-01 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: GEISE - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-06-23 - 2013-12-26 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: JUPITER II - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-09 - 2017-12-18 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: SMEW - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-16 - 2017-04-03 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: SILVER - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-25 - 2016-08-04 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: CHESTNUT - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-14 - 2015-09-27 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: SEXTA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-16 - 2014-03-16 (8 місяців)
Master: Flagship Violet - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-12 - 2021-10-03 (4 місяця)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-05 - 2020-07-23 (9 місяців)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-13 - 2019-05-10 (5 місяців)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Chemical tanker / 2018-04-13 - 2018-08-08 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Emerald Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-04-12 - 2017-09-08 (5 місяців)
Master: FESCO NAVARIN - Container Ship / 2017-12-07 - 2018-06-06 (6 місяців)
Master: FESCO NAVARIN - Container Ship / 2016-12-01 - 2017-06-02 (6 місяців)
Master: Amur - General cargo / 2016-10-14 - 2016-11-02 (1 місяць)
Master: Kapitan Gnezdilov - Container Ship / 2015-06-25 - 2015-12-25 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Gnezdilov - Container Ship / 2015-05-15 - 2015-06-24 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: CFL Prospect - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-12-17 - 2015-04-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: CFL Penhar - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-21 - 2014-09-02 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Arklow Resolve - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-09-16 - 2013-12-09 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Arklow Resolve - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-02-22 - 2013-05-18 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Lindaunis - Container Ship / 2014-12-01 - 2015-04-03 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Lindaunis - Container Ship / 2013-12-13 - 2014-07-13 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Maasholm - Container Ship / 2013-04-25 - 2013-09-07 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Kappeln - Container Ship / 2012-06-20 - 2012-11-23 (5 місяців)
Master: New Leo - Dry Cargo / 2017-09-08 - 2018-03-15 (6 місяців)
Master: Angela - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-12 - 2016-10-15 (6 місяців)
Master: Jana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-06-30 - 2016-01-31 (7 місяців)
Master: Angela - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-08 - 2015-04-17 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Angela - Dry Cargo / 2013-10-15 - 2014-05-12 (7 місяців)
Master: Afon Llifon - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-01-13 - 2016-02-28 (1 місяць)
Master: Amer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-01-12 - 2015-05-07 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Fanja - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-11-04 - 2014-03-25 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Hamra - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-01-15 - 2013-06-13 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Marselisborg - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-03-29 - 2012-06-17 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2014-12-04 - 2017-01-25 (2 року)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Liberty 163 - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-05-15 - 2014-06-23 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Adeline - RO-RO / 2013-01-21 - 2014-01-29 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: Ankie - General cargo / 2024-07-01 - 2024-09-11 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2024-04-06 - 2024-05-20 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2023-11-20 - 2024-01-19 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2023-07-28 - 2023-09-25 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: LEONIE - General cargo / 2023-03-02 - 2023-05-24 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: NOURAN ED - General cargo / 2024-01-01 - 2024-08-22 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: NYK Demeter - Container Ship / 2024-04-08 - 2024-08-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Safeen Pearl - Container Ship / 2023-11-16 - 2024-02-18 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Safeen Power - Container Ship / 2022-12-03 - 2023-04-22 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Spirit Of Lisbon - Container Ship / 2022-06-07 - 2022-10-02 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Barrier - Container Ship / 2021-07-23 - 2021-11-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Devon - Container Ship / 2024-03-12 - 2024-07-20 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordic Hamburg - Container Ship / 2023-08-14 - 2023-12-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordic Hamburg - Container Ship / 2022-12-24 - 2023-04-23 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordic Hamburg - Container Ship / 2022-05-19 - 2022-09-17 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Sonderborg - Container Ship / 2021-07-22 - 2021-12-12 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: James Joyce - Passenger vessel / 2024-06-10 - 2024-07-07 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Oscar Wilde - Passenger vessel / 2023-05-05 - 2024-06-09 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: Irtysh River - Chemical tanker / 2024-01-18 - 2024-05-18 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Irtysh River - Chemical tanker / 2023-04-18 - 2023-09-07 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Irtysh River - Chemical tanker / 2022-05-23 - 2022-11-26 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Irtysh River - Chemical tanker / 2021-09-10 - 2022-01-19 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Vilesh River - Chemical tanker / 2021-02-10 - 2021-06-03 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Belgravia V - LPG / LNG / 2024-02-07 - 2024-05-15 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: BELGRAVIA V - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-17 - 2023-12-11 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Belgravia V - LPG / LNG / 2023-02-13 - 2023-05-09 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: DANIEL B - LPG / LNG / 2022-08-17 - 2022-11-29 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: GITTA KOSAN - LPG / LNG / 2016-03-03 - 2016-06-12 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: AL Moustafa - Chemical tanker / 2024-01-05 - 2024-03-31 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: AL Moustafa - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-21 - 2023-10-03 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Mermaid - Chemical tanker / 2023-03-22 - 2023-06-20 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Barys - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-05 - 2022-12-02 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Barys - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-08 - 2022-04-04 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: FLORIANA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-09 - 2024-01-08 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: TIZIANA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-28 - 2023-06-04 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: SVYATOY PYOTR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-22 - 2021-12-29 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: SVYATOY PYOTR - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-21 - 2021-04-03 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: SMARTA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-29 - 2020-12-14 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Gas Maryam - LPG / LNG / 2023-06-15 - 2023-12-29 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Queen Luca - LPG / LNG / 2022-03-01 - 2022-09-21 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Ithacki - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-12 - 2021-08-05 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Anafi - LPG / LNG / 2020-08-18 - 2020-12-31 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Antikithira - LPG / LNG / 2019-06-12 - 2020-01-12 (7 місяців)