Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: Maersk Sydney - Container Ship / 2022-02-05 - 2022-05-13 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Maersk Sydney - Container Ship / 2021-10-26 - 2022-02-04 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: M.T. sirvan sabou - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-26 - 2022-05-08 (9 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Bonita queen - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-11 - 2019-12-30 (10 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: GOLDEN LEAF - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-22 - 2022-05-05 (1 год)
AB Seaman: NS Commander - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-21 - 2022-04-22 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Saipem Endeavour - Drilling vessel / 2020-11-12 - 2022-04-15 (1 год)
Chief Cook: Saipem Camp Karimun indonesia - Floating Hotel / 2019-02-02 - 2020-03-22 (1 год)
Chief Cook: DEHE 5000 - Crane vessel / 2018-08-15 - 2018-12-22 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Bavenit - Drilling vessel / 2022-01-16 - 2022-04-04 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Mercury - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-05 - 2021-11-02 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Yaroslav Mudryy - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-16 - 2020-12-07 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Svyatoy Petr - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-06 - 2020-05-05 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Poltava - Reefer / 2019-08-15 - 2019-10-07 (2 месяца)
Boatswain: Resume - Container Ship / 2022-01-01 - 2022-04-01 (3 месяца)
Boatswain: Resume - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2021-02-01 - 2021-04-01 (2 месяца)
Engine Cadet: m/x "Granite" - Tug boat / 2021-10-05 - 2022-03-31 (6 месяцев)
OS: M.V ADINA - Coaster / 2021-11-20 - 2022-03-24 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Halul 51 - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-12-04 - 2022-03-18 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Halul 51 - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-04-08 - 2021-09-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: RIVER STAR - Dry Cargo / 2020-09-20 - 2021-03-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: KPS REMZİ BEY - AHTS / 2019-10-10 - 2020-01-22 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: KPS SADUN BORO - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-05-03 - 2019-08-03 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: London express - Container Ship / 2021-07-17 - 2022-03-02 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Ottawa express - Container Ship / 2020-07-22 - 2021-02-19 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Ottawa express - Container Ship / 2019-05-23 - 2019-11-29 (6 месяцев)
OS: Nibulon Max - General cargo / 2019-10-01 - 2022-02-24 (2 года)
Deck Cadet: m/v Dobrynya Nikitich - General cargo / 2019-10-12 - 2022-02-22 (2 года)
Deck Cadet: Composer Rachmaninoff - RO-RO / 2021-08-20 - 2022-02-20 (6 месяцев)
Master: TRISTAR SPIRIT - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-10-10 - 2022-02-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Star curacao - Chemical tanker / 2021-07-01 - 2021-08-01 (1 месяц)
Master: Vissel - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-02-10 - 2021-05-30 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: MV MINION - Container Ship / 2021-05-08 - 2022-01-31 (9 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Seahorse - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-30 - 2022-01-30 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Kristina-P - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-29 - 2021-07-16 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-22 - 2021-02-20 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-27 - 2020-10-21 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-14 - 2020-02-21 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: None - Other vessels / 2022-01-01 - 2022-01-30 (1 месяц)
ETO: CAPE APOLLO - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-15 - 2022-01-23 (7 месяцев)
ETO: CAPE KASOS - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-15 - 2021-03-29 (6 месяцев)
ETO: CAPE KASOS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-11 - 2019-12-04 (6 месяцев)
ETO: CAPE KENNEDY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-11 - 2017-10-24 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: New life - General cargo / 2021-07-12 - 2022-01-23 (6 месяцев)