Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: OLYMPIC PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-19 - 2021-07-16 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: OLYMPIC GALAXY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-14 - 2020-09-09 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: OLYMPIC PIONEER - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-18 - 2019-07-14 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: OLYMPIC GEMINI - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-19 - 2018-08-18 (4 месяца)
Fitter / Welder: Rio de la plata - Container Ship / 2021-01-19 - 2021-07-13 (6 месяцев)
OS: SIG - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-07 - 2021-07-07 (3 месяца)
OS: Sv.Knyaz Vladimir - General cargo / 2020-08-17 - 2020-12-17 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: STS"Khersones" - Sailing Vessel / 2017-09-01 - 2017-11-10 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: LPG Essex - LPG / LNG / 2021-04-05 - 2021-07-03 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Kings Road - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-17 - 2019-03-26 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Pogodin - Chemical tanker / 2021-02-28 - 2021-07-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Pogodin - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-26 - 2020-10-26 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Panteleev - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-29 - 2020-03-13 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: VF Tanker 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-07 - 2019-07-12 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: VF Tanker 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-20 - 2018-10-24 (4 месяца)
ETO: Cape Race - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-08 - 2021-06-11 (9 месяцев)
Motorman: Energy 6503 - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-11-06 - 2021-06-10 (7 месяцев)
OS: Краб - Tug boat / 2021-04-09 - 2021-06-08 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: LPG MARIA - LPG / LNG / 2020-10-03 - 2021-06-06 (8 месяцев)
4th Engineer: BLPG SOPHIA - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-06 - 2020-06-28 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MV JAHAN SISTERS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-03 - 2017-02-27 (10 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MV MAA SALEHA BEGUM - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-12 - 2015-08-28 (6 месяцев)
Master: Mv Discoverer - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-08 - 2021-06-03 (6 месяцев)
Master: Mv Olympic Harmony - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-02 - 2020-07-06 (7 месяцев)
Master: Mv Olympic Hope - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-10 - 2019-07-23 (5 месяцев)
Master: Mv Olympic Hope - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-04 - 2018-08-11 (3 месяца)
Master: Mv Olympic Harmony - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-27 - 2017-09-18 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: RN Primorie - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-12-20 - 2021-05-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Novouralsk - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-17 - 2020-06-08 (12 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Yaroslav Mydry - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-09 - 2018-10-10 (9 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Yason - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-14 - 2017-10-10 (8 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Mistral - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-10 - 2016-11-14 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Horyzont || - Training Ship / 2021-05-12 - 2021-05-25 (13 дней)
Deck Cadet: Dar młodzieży - Training Ship / 2020-06-15 - 2020-07-14 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: Dar młodzieży - Training Ship / 2019-06-28 - 2019-08-01 (1 месяц)
OS: Passenger ship - Floating Hotel / 2021-04-01 - 2021-05-22 (2 месяца)
Cook: Sea sprinter - Dry Cargo / 2020-11-27 - 2021-05-18 (6 месяцев)
Messman: Port osaka - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-22 - 2020-08-23 (6 месяцев)
Chief Cook: allianz silver - AHTS / 2019-05-24 - 2019-10-24 (5 месяцев)
Wiper: MSC Weser - Container Ship / 2020-07-06 - 2021-05-09 (10 месяцев)
Wiper: MSC Celine - Container Ship / 2019-11-03 - 2020-01-29 (3 месяца)
Master: Northern Light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-01 - 2021-05-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Dream Voyager - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-01 - 2019-06-01 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Sea Explorer - Container Ship / 2017-02-01 - 2018-02-01 (1 год)
3rd Engineer: Ocean Titan - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-03-15 - 2016-09-15 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Viking Sea" - RO-RO / 2020-10-22 - 2021-04-27 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Viking Princess" - RO-RO / 2019-07-30 - 2020-02-16 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Fetida" - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-31 - 2018-10-19 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Alexander Kosmodemyanskiy - Tug boat / 2017-07-18 - 2017-08-18 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: m/v “Princess Nicole” - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-09 - 2021-04-23 (7 месяцев)
Cook: Evaluna - General cargo / 2020-10-10 - 2021-04-23 (6 месяцев)
Cook: Sunny Lisa - Reefer / 2019-12-06 - 2020-06-10 (6 месяцев)
Cook: Valeriy Platonov - General cargo / 2018-04-27 - 2018-10-26 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: TAMARA 1 - Other vessels / 2020-09-01 - 2021-04-01 (7 месяцев)