Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
OS: SHAUN 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-28 - 2022-10-29 (4 месяца)
OS: Oman pride - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-15 - 2022-05-16 (2 месяца)
OS: GENERAL CARGO - General cargo / 2020-08-24 - 2021-05-25 (9 месяцев)
Boatswain: Limo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-21 - 2022-10-28 (3 месяца)
Boatswain: Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-26 - 2022-07-20 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Freedom - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-15 - 2021-05-02 (9 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Vathy - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-08 - 2019-10-10 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Vathy - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-25 - 2019-02-10 (7 месяцев)
ETO: M.T.RAYYAN 1 - Chemical tanker / 2022-06-18 - 2022-10-18 (4 месяца)
ETO: Zehra 1 - Dry Cargo / 2021-05-29 - 2022-02-15 (9 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M/V KLC COMMANDER - General cargo / 2022-03-21 - 2022-10-17 (7 месяцев)
Security Staff: more then 11 vessel - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-09 - 2022-10-07 (1 год)
1st Officer: GERDA - General cargo / 2022-04-23 - 2022-10-06 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Jason 34 - Pipe laying vessel / 2022-07-17 - 2022-10-05 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: OLIMPIA - General cargo / 2020-09-23 - 2021-01-25 (4 месяца)
AB / Motorman: Tavrida - Jack-up Platform / 2012-09-25 - 2017-09-07 (4 года)
3rd Engineer: MV VARSHNE - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-04-08 - 2022-10-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: IVAN SHCHEPETOV - General cargo / 2022-03-04 - 2022-09-16 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: IVAN SHCHEPETOV - General cargo / 2021-07-07 - 2021-11-03 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: KAPITAN DANILKIN - General cargo / 2020-12-11 - 2021-02-05 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: PETR ANOKHIN - General cargo / 2020-05-29 - 2020-10-29 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Seacon Manila - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-17 - 2022-09-12 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: PMS Auerhahn - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-04 - 2021-07-03 (12 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: M.V POS LOGISTIC 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-10 - 2022-09-06 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Emmakris 3 - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-24 - 2022-09-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Four Aida - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-17 - 2022-09-03 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Four Emerald - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-18 - 2021-10-04 (6 месяцев)
Electric Cadet: PALLADA - Sailing Vessel / 2022-06-01 - 2022-09-01 (3 месяца)
Rigger: ARMADA INSTALLER/BARGE - Pipe laying vessel / 2022-06-22 - 2022-08-31 (2 месяца)
Rigger: VALESTO NAGA 8 - Drilling vessel / 2021-06-15 - 2021-07-28 (1 месяц)
Rigger: PETRA ENDEAVOUR - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-15 - 2020-11-23 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2022-06-10 - 2022-08-25 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Greendale - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-25 - 2022-08-25 (2 месяца)
Engine Cadet: СБ-742 - Tug boat / 2019-12-24 - 2020-05-30 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Профессор Николай Муру - Tug boat / 2019-01-23 - 2019-06-30 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT TRINITY - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-15 - 2022-08-22 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: MT CRYSTAL 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-19 - 2022-04-01 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT HARMONY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-28 - 2021-07-12 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: DSV Akademik Tofiq Ismayilov - DSV (Diving Support) / 2018-06-08 - 2022-08-18 (4 года)
3rd Engineer: DSV Akademik Tofiq Ismayilov - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-11-24 - 2017-06-08 (2 года)
2nd Engineer: M/V TK Rotterdam - General cargo / 2014-01-09 - 2014-10-19 (9 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: M/V Shah Ismayil Khatai - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-10-30 - 2013-01-10 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: M/V Islam Seferli - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-06-28 - 2012-02-10 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: QMS BANI YAS - Accommodation barge / 2022-05-01 - 2022-08-16 (3 месяца)