Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Electric Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2022-03-22 - 2022-05-25 (2 месяца)
Engine Cadet: MV Ocean Nectar - Tug boat / 2021-08-02 - 2022-05-25 (10 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MV DECCAN PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-04 - 2022-05-16 (2 месяца)
Trainee Engineer: MT AFRA ROSSI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-31 - 2021-03-15 (2 месяца)
Trainee Engineer: MT ESERK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-05 - 2020-12-30 (5 месяцев)
Trainee Engineer: MV KITE BAY - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-06 - 2020-07-06 (10 месяцев)
Trainee Engineer: Queen Luca - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-28 - 2022-05-14 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Alby Happy - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-16 - 2022-05-12 (10 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Alby Victory - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-16 - 2021-02-17 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Alby Story - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-01 - 2019-11-27 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Deccan Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-02 - 2022-05-04 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Ocean Spirit - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-25 - 2022-04-24 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM Ventania - Container Ship / 2021-10-22 - 2022-04-12 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM CARL ANTOINE - Container Ship / 2021-02-11 - 2021-06-11 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM LISA MARIE - Container Ship / 2020-03-15 - 2020-09-10 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: MSC SARISKA - Container Ship / 2019-07-16 - 2020-02-05 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: MSC CLEA - Container Ship / 2018-09-09 - 2019-04-09 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Dole Colombia - Container Ship / 2021-09-19 - 2022-04-10 (7 месяцев)
ETO: M.V ELYANA - General cargo / 2021-11-15 - 2022-03-31 (5 месяцев)
El. Engineer: M.V PARNIA - General cargo / 2020-10-02 - 2021-02-25 (5 месяцев)
El. Engineer: M.V ZARDIS - Container Ship / 2019-08-22 - 2019-12-30 (4 месяца)
El. Engineer: M.V .GOLBON - Container Ship / 2018-10-22 - 2019-01-30 (3 месяца)
El. Eng. Assistant: M.V.KIAZAND - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-10 - 2016-12-15 (4 месяца)
OS: Капитан Сулимов - Fishing vessel / 2022-02-17 - 2022-03-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Petalidi - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-25 - 2022-03-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stamos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-24 - 2020-11-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea Pearl - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-20 - 2019-11-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: DS Promoter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-17 - 2019-01-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: DS Promoter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-02-09 - 2018-05-29 (4 месяца)
Electric Cadet: "Oleg Tavolzhanskiy" - General cargo / 2021-10-15 - 2022-03-17 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: STAR N - RO-RO / 2021-11-11 - 2022-03-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ENSCO DS-7 - Drilling vessel / 2022-01-26 - 2022-03-08 (1 месяц)
Chief Engineer: ENSCO DS-7 - Drilling vessel / 2021-10-05 - 2021-12-03 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: RAWABI 502 - Construction vessel / 2021-02-02 - 2021-05-22 (4 месяца)
Trainee OS: SUZETTE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-28 - 2022-03-02 (1 год)
IT System Support Engineer: Princess Anastasia - Passenger vessel / 2021-08-27 - 2022-02-28 (6 месяцев)
OS: Patria - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-09 - 2022-02-26 (4 месяца)
OS: Anna Dorothea - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-03 - 2021-03-22 (7 месяцев)
OS: Gladiator - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-18 - 2020-06-28 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Socol 8 - General cargo / 2021-05-21 - 2022-02-25 (9 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Black Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-28 - 2022-02-24 (11 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Thor - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-24 - 2020-12-16 (10 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Black Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-02 - 2019-11-07 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Thor - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-20 - 2018-12-28 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Lord Byron - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-21 - 2018-02-21 (8 месяцев)