Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Sider Martina C - General cargo / 2017-02-02 - 2017-03-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Martina C - General cargo / 2016-11-12 - 2017-02-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Martina C - General cargo / 2015-11-17 - 2016-03-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Keizersborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-02-12 - 2015-06-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fraserborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-30 - 2014-11-28 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Fembria - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-02-07 - 2017-03-07 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Fembria - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-05-10 - 2016-07-07 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Seeland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-27 - 2016-01-12 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Fembria - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-03-24 - 2015-07-24 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Norrbotten - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-06-06 - 2014-12-07 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Rhona - Chemical tanker / 2016-03-18 - 2016-07-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Elbtank Germany - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-04-16 - 2015-09-17 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Harbour Fashion - Chemical tanker / 2014-07-28 - 2014-11-22 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Elbtank Germany - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-09-13 - 2014-02-04 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Elbtank Gemany - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-11-29 - 2013-06-11 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: K-Storm - Container Ship / 2016-01-11 - 2016-04-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: K-Storm - Container Ship / 2015-05-22 - 2015-09-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: WEC Bruegel - Container Ship / 2014-09-01 - 2015-01-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nadja - Container Ship / 2013-12-06 - 2014-04-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Asian Carrier - Container Ship / 2013-07-01 - 2013-09-25 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: AOS Hauler - AHTS / 2015-09-30 - 2016-01-10 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: AOS Hauler - AHTS / 2015-06-01 - 2015-09-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MOJO - Yacht / 2013-06-21 - 2013-07-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: SIS Service - Platform Supply vessel / 2012-12-19 - 2013-06-14 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: C Mariner - Platform Supply vessel / 2012-03-04 - 2012-09-08 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Kazdanga - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-07 - 2015-08-06 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Kraslava - Chemical tanker / 2014-12-17 - 2015-04-20 (4 месяца)
Junior officer: Krisjanis Valdemars - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-20 - 2014-08-19 (4 месяца)
OS: Kanpur - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-05-08 - 2013-11-11 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Belorus - Dry Cargo / 2012-07-11 - 2012-11-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Pacific - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-05-13 - 2015-07-06 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Lotus - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-01-12 - 2015-02-14 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Nami - Chemical tanker / 2014-02-23 - 2014-07-10 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kamila - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-11-28 - 2014-02-11 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Arctic Char - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-09-24 - 2013-02-12 (5 месяцев)
Master: Al Yarmuk - Dredger / 2016-09-12 - 2016-11-22 (2 месяца)
Master: Al Yarmuk - Dredger / 2016-04-12 - 2016-07-04 (3 месяца)
Master: UDC AQUA - Dredger / 2015-08-12 - 2016-01-22 (5 месяцев)
Master: Al Qadisiyah - Dredger / 2015-06-02 - 2015-07-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Qadisiyah - Dredger / 2015-01-12 - 2015-04-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: LEDA DV - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-12-12 - 2015-01-20 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: BUKHTA SLAVYANKA - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-11-17 - 2014-12-11 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: ZOLOTOJ MOST - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-05-28 - 2014-10-21 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: PAVINO - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-02-01 - 2014-04-07 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: ARCTIC BREEZE - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-19 - 2013-09-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Green Frost - Reefer / 2014-02-19 - 2014-05-13 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Green Frost - Reefer / 2013-11-04 - 2014-02-18 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Green Frost - Reefer / 2012-11-07 - 2013-05-09 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Green Egersund - Reefer / 2012-05-27 - 2012-09-29 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Green Frost - Reefer / 2012-03-20 - 2012-05-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Trefin Leader - Chemical tanker / 2013-11-01 - 2014-03-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-10 - 2013-09-09 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-08 - 2013-06-10 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2012-07-22 - 2012-12-11 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2012-01-04 - 2012-05-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: UAL Gabon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-06-06 - 2013-10-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ocean Voyager - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-03-11 - 2011-07-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Socol 6 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-07-10 - 2009-11-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Admiral de Ribas - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2008-09-28 - 2008-12-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Admiral de Ribas - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2007-08-10 - 2008-03-21 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Frisia Inn - Container Ship / 2011-11-30 - 2012-04-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MCP Harburg - Container Ship / 2011-04-16 - 2011-08-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MCP Amsterdam - Container Ship / 2010-12-18 - 2011-02-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aspen - General cargo / 2010-07-13 - 2010-09-30 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sydgard - General cargo / 2010-02-07 - 2010-05-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: MAERSK SAIGON - Container Ship / 2024-03-03 - 2024-07-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CCMA CGM MISSISSIPPI - Container Ship / 2023-08-07 - 2023-12-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Titan - Container Ship / 2023-11-20 - 2024-04-09 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MSC TIA II - Container Ship / 2023-03-03 - 2023-07-27 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MSC FLORIANA - Container Ship / 2023-01-21 - 2023-02-25 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Alonissos - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-20 - 2022-07-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Puma - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-05 - 2021-08-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kavo Yeraki - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-19 - 2023-12-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Arch Gabriel - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-08 - 2023-03-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kavo Yeraki - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-15 - 2022-01-31 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kavo Yeraki - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-22 - 2020-11-29 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: m/v Sharief Reliance - AHTS / 2023-03-20 - 2023-08-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: m/v Sharief Supporter (OSV) - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-12-11 - 2021-04-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: m/v Sharief Supporter (OSV) - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-12-18 - 2020-09-11 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: m/v AOS Eagle (OSV/MUV) - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-02-09 - 2019-03-09 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: m/v AOS Eagle (OSV/MUV) - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-08-16 - 2018-10-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mv smurf - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-12-14 - 2023-08-09 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Merry star - Container Ship / 2022-02-12 - 2022-09-08 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mv amwaj karoon - Container Ship / 2020-08-18 - 2021-09-08 (1 год)
Master: CAPE CORFU - Container Ship / 2024-02-17 - 2024-07-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CAPE CORFU - Container Ship / 2023-03-30 - 2023-08-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CAPE SYROS - Container Ship / 2021-09-11 - 2022-05-13 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CAPE FORTIUS - Container Ship / 2020-11-27 - 2021-05-21 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CAPE FORTIUS - Container Ship / 2020-03-11 - 2020-07-17 (4 месяца)