Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Hanna - Container Ship / 2016-06-23 - 2016-10-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jork Rider - Container Ship / 2015-09-16 - 2016-01-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jork Rider - Container Ship / 2015-01-14 - 2015-05-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jork Rider - Container Ship / 2014-05-11 - 2014-09-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Helmuth Rambow - Container Ship / 2013-09-17 - 2014-01-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Topaz Triumph - AHTS / 2015-10-01 - 2015-11-11 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Topaz Triumph - AHTS / 2015-07-14 - 2015-08-31 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Topaz Triumph - AHTS / 2015-04-15 - 2015-05-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Topaz Triumph - AHTS / 2015-02-18 - 2015-03-04 (14 дней)
Chief Officer: Caspian Challenger - AHTS / 2015-01-26 - 2015-02-17 (1 месяц)
Master: DORSCH - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-10-02 - 2017-03-02 (5 месяцев)
Master: sidra doha - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-04-30 - 2016-09-03 (4 месяца)
Master: wind forrader - Other vessels / 2015-03-20 - 2015-09-09 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: naftilos - Other vessels / 2014-05-07 - 2014-12-18 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: RETREIVER - Reefer / 2013-09-20 - 2014-01-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Lord Byron - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-20 - 2014-11-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Gaurav Prem - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-25 - 2013-12-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Therese Selmer - Bulk Carrier / 2012-08-15 - 2013-01-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: United Journey - Bulk Carrier / 2012-01-29 - 2012-05-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Glorious Plumeria - Bulk Carrier / 2011-05-26 - 2011-11-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CSAV Suape - Container Ship / 2013-05-13 - 2013-09-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Leda Trader - Container Ship / 2012-06-12 - 2012-11-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Main Trader - Container Ship / 2011-10-15 - 2012-02-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Szczecin Trader - Container Ship / 2011-02-24 - 2011-07-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Elbe Trader - Container Ship / 2010-06-09 - 2010-11-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MSC Federica - Container Ship / 2012-09-19 - 2013-03-24 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MSC Carole - Container Ship / 2011-10-12 - 2012-05-03 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MSC Giovanna - Container Ship / 2011-01-07 - 2011-07-19 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MSC Peggy - Container Ship / 2010-03-12 - 2010-09-14 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MSC Corinna - Container Ship / 2009-03-23 - 2009-08-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SAREM - AHTS / 2012-12-11 - 2013-02-06 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: SAREM - AHTS / 2012-08-27 - 2012-12-10 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: SAREM - AHTS / 2012-03-13 - 2012-06-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SAREM - AHTS / 2012-01-27 - 2012-03-13 (1 месяц)
Master: Ionion Pelagos - Tug boat / 2011-10-02 - 2011-12-30 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Wild Lotus - Reefer / 2011-11-13 - 2012-03-12 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Global Harvest - Reefer / 2011-01-11 - 2011-05-27 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Crown Topaz - Reefer / 2010-02-20 - 2010-06-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Crown Topaz - Reefer / 2009-06-06 - 2009-10-14 (4 месяца)
DP Officer: Caspian Power - AHTS / 2012-12-14 - 2018-02-17 (5 лет)
DP Officer: Caspian Power - AHTS / 2012-12-14 - 2018-02-17 (5 лет)
Chief Officer: EKATERINA - General cargo / 2012-04-12 - 2012-10-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: EKATERINA - General cargo / 2012-04-12 - 2012-10-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: EKATERINA - General cargo / 2012-04-11 - 2012-10-11 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Anuket Opal - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-03-25 - 2012-07-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mauritanker - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-06-26 - 2011-11-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Maurinaphte 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-07-02 - 2011-02-22 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Yukan - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-09-10 - 2010-05-01 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Borislav - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-04-30 - 2009-08-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Hamburg - Bulk Carrier / 2012-05-06 - 2012-07-06 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ostsee Merchant - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-21 - 2012-03-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ostsee Merchant - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-08 - 2012-02-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ostsee Merchant - Bulk Carrier / 2011-01-07 - 2011-05-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Maro L - Bulk Carrier / 2010-08-19 - 2010-10-25 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: BBC - STFRIESLAND - Dry Cargo / 2013-08-10 - 2013-12-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ALIANCA SKY - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-21 - 2013-04-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FRIO ANTARTIC - Reefer / 2010-07-18 - 2011-04-24 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DESIGNER KNYSH - Reefer / 2009-12-16 - 2010-06-10 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Courier - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-01-29 - 2010-07-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ARTEMIS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2009-05-10 - 2009-10-15 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ARTEMIS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2008-11-10 - 2009-03-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SUDAK - Passenger vessel / 2008-07-28 - 2008-11-01 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: ZYGI - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-02-19 - 2008-05-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stena Suede - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-03-04 - 2024-07-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stena Superior - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-06-30 - 2023-10-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stena Surprise - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-30 - 2022-12-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Arafura - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-18 - 2022-01-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stena Surprise - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-12 - 2021-04-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: arklow bay - General cargo / 2024-02-17 - 2024-06-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: arklow view - General cargo / 2023-07-27 - 2023-10-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Arklow Viking - Coaster / 2022-08-18 - 2022-12-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vechtdiep - General cargo / 2012-07-18 - 2016-07-18 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Amalia - Reefer / 2006-07-18 - 2011-07-15 (4 года)
Chief Officer: GIUSE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-09-23 - 2024-05-02 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BIRDHUM - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-24 - 2023-06-22 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ELKA ATHINA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-24 - 2022-10-30 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: LUCTOR - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-20 - 2022-03-09 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: LUCTOR - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-16 - 2021-02-12 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sunset - General cargo / 2023-10-24 - 2024-05-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Peace - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-23 - 2023-06-03 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pegasus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-02 - 2021-11-21 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Olympic Pegasus - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-05 - 2020-08-20 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: GLOMAR SUPPORTER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-03-22 - 2024-04-21 (1 месяц)
Master: GLOMAR VANTAGE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-12-15 - 2024-02-20 (2 месяца)
Master: GLOMAR VANTAGE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-06-13 - 2023-10-20 (4 месяца)
Master: GLOMAR VANTAGE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-02-13 - 2023-04-27 (2 месяца)
Master: GLOMAR VANTAGE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-08-31 - 2022-12-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: KMAX LEADER - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-18 - 2024-04-21 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: PANAMAX NOSTOS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-07 - 2023-11-02 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MARIVICTORIA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-03 - 2023-01-24 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: STAR CENTAURUS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-17 - 2022-02-13 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: TARIFA - RO-RO / 2021-01-01 - 2021-03-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Westwood Columbia,Rainier,Olimpia,Victoria - General cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2024-03-18 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Westwood Columbia, Olimpia,Rainier,Victoria - General cargo / 2015-01-03 - 2019-05-18 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Westwood Columbia, Olimpia,Reinier,Victoria - General cargo / 2014-01-02 - 2015-01-02 (1 год)