Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Master: MORAZ - General cargo / 2019-10-10 - 2020-02-18 (4 месяца)
Master: DOUWENT - General cargo / 2018-12-11 - 2019-05-11 (5 месяцев)
Master: RMS NEUDORF - General cargo / 2018-07-20 - 2018-10-04 (2 месяца)
Master: NEPTUNE HELLAS - RO-RO / 2017-11-05 - 2018-03-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: NEPTUNE HELLAS - RO-RO / 2017-04-19 - 2017-08-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Eems Dublin - Construction vessel / 2017-01-03 - 2017-03-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abis Calais - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-09-30 - 2016-11-12 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Abis Bremen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-18 - 2016-09-30 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Abis Albufeira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-03-21 - 2016-06-17 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abis Albufeira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-12 - 2015-12-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: New Gemini - General cargo / 2016-10-24 - 2017-03-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nikita Kozhemyaka - General cargo / 2016-03-18 - 2016-08-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MELITA - General cargo / 2015-06-20 - 2015-12-02 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ALMERIA - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-05 - 2014-12-01 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kapitan Shyriagin - General cargo / 2012-10-15 - 2013-03-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Koningsborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-22 - 2017-01-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Willeke - Coaster / 2016-06-20 - 2016-09-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SDS Rain - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-08-28 - 2016-01-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: El Nino - Reefer / 2015-02-02 - 2015-03-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: El Nino - Reefer / 2014-08-08 - 2014-10-14 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Limanskiy - Other vessels / 2016-04-16 - 2016-08-06 (4 месяца)
Master: GRIF - Other vessels / 2015-06-26 - 2015-11-30 (5 месяцев)
Master: GORNOZAVODSK - General cargo / 2015-04-16 - 2015-06-06 (2 месяца)
Master: ALEXANDER - Reefer / 2014-09-04 - 2015-01-26 (5 месяцев)
Master: Nadiz - Reefer / 2012-01-23 - 2014-12-26 (2 года)
Chief Officer: Angelina - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-15 - 2016-06-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Giovani Bottiglieri - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-11 - 2015-10-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Navios Felicity - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-21 - 2015-06-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mardinik - Bulk Carrier / 2013-12-26 - 2014-09-12 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Fugro Meridian - ROV Support vessel / 2016-04-06 - 2016-05-31 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fugro Meridian - ROV Support vessel / 2015-12-16 - 2016-02-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fugro Meridian - ROV Support vessel / 2015-08-26 - 2015-10-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fugro Meridian - ROV Support vessel / 2015-06-03 - 2015-07-01 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Fugro Navigator - Survey vessel / 2014-11-11 - 2015-01-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fouma - Container Ship / 2015-05-01 - 2015-08-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Arsos - Container Ship / 2014-05-15 - 2014-10-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Knock - Container Ship / 2013-11-18 - 2014-01-25 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Knock - Container Ship / 2013-09-20 - 2013-11-17 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Alice - Container Ship / 2013-01-24 - 2013-05-23 (4 месяца)
Master: VARNAVA - General cargo / 2017-08-30 - 2018-02-08 (5 месяцев)
Master: SOLIKAMSK - General cargo / 2016-05-10 - 2016-11-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AOLLONIA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-10 - 2015-05-23 (7 месяцев)
Master: VOGE FANTASY - Dry Cargo / 2013-09-14 - 2013-12-06 (3 месяца)
Master: Voge Fantasy - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-14 - 2013-12-06 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Dubai Star - AHTS / 2014-12-09 - 2015-05-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Al Wahsh - AHT / 2014-03-08 - 2014-09-29 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Duma - AHT / 2013-07-07 - 2014-01-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Germanica HAV - General cargo / 2014-08-27 - 2014-12-10 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Germanica HAV - General cargo / 2014-04-27 - 2014-06-27 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Germanica HAV - General cargo / 2013-12-23 - 2014-02-25 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Germanica HAV - General cargo / 2013-08-09 - 2013-10-09 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Germanica HAV - General cargo / 2013-02-25 - 2013-05-29 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Gaz Concord - LPG / LNG / 2014-04-28 - 2014-10-01 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Eleonora Lembo - LPG / LNG / 2013-07-12 - 2013-10-21 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Gas Puffer - LPG / LNG / 2012-09-04 - 2013-01-23 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Margherita Iuliano - LPG / LNG / 2012-05-30 - 2012-07-09 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Ocean Primero - LPG / LNG / 2011-08-06 - 2011-12-02 (4 месяца)
Master: OCEAN WINNER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-10-08 - 2017-04-01 (6 месяцев)
Master: OCEAN FORTUNE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-11-13 - 2016-08-06 (9 месяцев)
Master: LS AIZENSHTAT - Container Ship / 2015-01-28 - 2015-07-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sofia - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-27 - 2014-09-13 (6 месяцев)
Master: BBC ADRIATIC - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-04-18 - 2013-09-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Nova Caledonia - Reefer / 2013-08-01 - 2014-01-18 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Eiger - Reefer / 2012-01-14 - 2012-05-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Eiger - Reefer / 2011-06-09 - 2011-11-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Eiger - Reefer / 2010-06-08 - 2011-01-22 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Eiger - Reefer / 2009-01-22 - 2009-08-17 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Atlas Force - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-06-13 - 2014-01-01 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Atlas Wind - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-02-25 - 2013-04-27 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Global Carrier - Dry Cargo / 2012-01-08 - 2012-03-08 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Med Salvador - General cargo / 2010-10-28 - 2011-06-07 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Vasilios N - Dry Cargo / 2009-02-03 - 2009-12-03 (10 месяцев)
2nd Officer: DULAM RESPONDER - DSV (Diving Support) / 2013-07-18 - 2013-09-18 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Stella Becrux - Bulk Carrier / 2012-01-25 - 2013-05-25 (1 год)
2nd Officer: anna - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-02-11 - 2012-07-09 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: anna - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-06-28 - 2011-10-15 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Pride - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-11-11 - 2011-04-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ostsee - Dredger / 2013-06-15 - 2013-07-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: NAVRUZ - Accomodation barge / 2013-05-05 - 2013-05-16 (11 дней)
Chief Officer: ARAL - AHTS / 2013-02-10 - 2013-04-20 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Blue Wave - Barge / 2009-12-14 - 2012-10-28 (2 года)
Chief Officer: Alina GDY-46 - Research vessel / 2009-04-17 - 2009-10-28 (6 месяцев)
Master: Stolt Sapphire - Chemical tanker / 2013-01-20 - 2013-04-25 (3 месяца)
Master: Stolt Sapphire - Chemical tanker / 2012-07-14 - 2012-10-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stolt Sapphire - Chemical tanker / 2012-03-20 - 2012-07-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stolt Aquamarine - Chemical tanker / 2011-12-12 - 2012-02-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stolt Sapphire - Chemical tanker / 2011-06-27 - 2011-11-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TORONTO - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-18 - 2012-01-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: M\V LUOAY-K - Bulk Carrier / 2010-03-12 - 2010-09-07 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M\V VALENTIA - RO-RO / 2008-08-30 - 2009-03-10 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ROYAL RAY - RO-RO / 2008-01-01 - 2008-07-28 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: SACHA - Bulk Carrier / 2006-08-09 - 2008-07-16 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Jabal Ali 11 - RO-RO / 2024-07-02 - 2024-09-04 (2 месяца)