Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Majuro Chief - Container Ship / 2022-01-03 - 2022-05-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Chengtu - Container Ship / 2021-05-08 - 2021-09-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Music - Container Ship / 2020-07-26 - 2020-11-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Barrier - Container Ship / 2019-10-18 - 2020-02-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kreta S - Container Ship / 2019-04-10 - 2019-08-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ELANDRA OSPREY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-01-31 - 2022-05-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ELANDRA OSPREY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-28 - 2021-11-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ELANDRA OSPREY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-03 - 2021-05-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vivit Dubhe - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-25 - 2022-04-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vivit Thuban - LPG / LNG / 2021-04-19 - 2021-07-30 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Seashine - LPG / LNG / 2020-08-09 - 2021-01-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Seashine - LPG / LNG / 2019-10-02 - 2020-02-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Seasuccess - LPG / LNG / 2018-12-08 - 2019-05-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Asia - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-09 - 2022-04-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Asia - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-11 - 2021-10-26 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kalahari - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-28 - 2021-02-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Arctic - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-16 - 2020-07-14 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hafnia America - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-07-17 - 2019-12-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: FILIAB GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-24 - 2022-02-04 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: FILIAB GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-29 - 2020-10-17 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: FILIA JOY - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-07 - 2019-10-02 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: LION - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-05 - 2018-05-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kaileen - General cargo / 2021-12-06 - 2022-01-10 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Krislin - General cargo / 2021-09-26 - 2021-10-07 (11 дней)
Chief Officer: Astrol 1 - General cargo / 2021-03-09 - 2021-08-03 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Pola Alexia - General cargo / 2020-09-13 - 2021-01-18 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Pola Pelagia - General cargo / 2020-03-13 - 2020-07-28 (4 месяца)
Master: RCC ASIA - RO-RO / 2022-05-10 - 2022-09-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: RCC Antwerp - RO-RO / 2021-07-12 - 2021-12-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Amber Arrow - RO-RO / 2020-08-07 - 2020-12-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hoegh Antwerp - RO-RO / 2019-09-15 - 2020-01-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TALIA - RO-RO / 2018-11-10 - 2019-04-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Zakum - VLCC / 2021-03-30 - 2021-11-24 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-05 - 2019-11-16 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-01-29 - 2019-04-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-07-19 - 2018-10-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-25 - 2018-04-14 (4 месяца)
Master: EGS Ventus - Survey vessel / 2022-04-27 - 2022-07-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Donnalax - Other vessels / 2020-12-17 - 2021-11-16 (11 месяцев)
Master: Artemis Atlantic - Seismic vessel / 2019-06-03 - 2020-02-26 (9 месяцев)
Master: Artemis Athene - Cable laying vessel / 2016-01-14 - 2018-07-04 (2 года)
Chief Officer: Artemis Athene - Cable laying vessel / 2013-11-06 - 2015-12-12 (2 года)
Chief Officer: BBC Bergen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-06-26 - 2021-11-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: BBC Bergen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-10-08 - 2021-02-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kurt Paul - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-02-24 - 2020-07-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kurt Paul - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-03-04 - 2019-09-02 (6 месяцев)
Master: Manisa Sole - General cargo / 2024-02-03 - 2024-06-20 (5 месяцев)
Master: Manisa Silvana - General cargo / 2023-08-12 - 2023-12-09 (4 месяца)
Master: Manisa Sole - General cargo / 2022-11-04 - 2023-04-03 (5 месяцев)
Master: Manisa Balu - General cargo / 2022-02-23 - 2022-07-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Manisa Silvana - General cargo / 2021-05-08 - 2021-10-15 (5 месяцев)
Master: RAMBO - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-28 - 2024-07-23 (8 месяцев)
Master: LILA SEOUL - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-20 - 2023-08-01 (5 месяцев)
Master: LILA SEOUL - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-08 - 2023-01-07 (3 месяца)
Master: SHAIL AL RAYAN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-13 - 2022-07-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KAVO YERAKI - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-28 - 2021-09-17 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Orchard - Citrus Juice Tanker / 2021-06-20 - 2021-09-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Orchard - Citrus Juice Tanker / 2020-10-20 - 2021-03-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Medi Egadi - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-15 - 2020-08-15 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cielo di Jari - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-06 - 2019-09-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cielo di Tocopilla - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-25 - 2019-03-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Front Lynx - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-21 - 2021-08-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Front Ocelot - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-14 - 2020-10-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: NS Commander - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-16 - 2018-09-23 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: NS Clipper - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-11 - 2018-03-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SCF Anadyr - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-12-26 - 2017-05-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: THALASSA TYHI - Container Ship / 2021-03-10 - 2021-08-10 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: THALASSA ELPIDA - Container Ship / 2020-05-28 - 2020-09-22 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: THALASSA MANA - Container Ship / 2019-09-13 - 2020-01-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: THALASSA PATRIS - Container Ship / 2018-11-06 - 2019-03-27 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: THALASSA PISTIS - Container Ship / 2017-11-17 - 2018-04-21 (5 месяцев)
Master: Ofco Synergy - Standby-safety vessel / 2022-12-09 - 2023-04-01 (4 месяца)
Master: Ofco Cynergy - Standby-safety vessel / 2022-06-07 - 2022-09-27 (4 месяца)
Master: Farida A - Barge / 2021-10-24 - 2022-06-01 (7 месяцев)
Master: Ofco Cynergy - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-09-01 - 2021-10-20 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zakher Duty - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-01-27 - 2021-06-10 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: D Angels - Container Ship / 2020-12-07 - 2021-04-29 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Conger - Container Ship / 2020-02-24 - 2020-08-01 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Conger - Container Ship / 2019-06-01 - 2019-10-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Conger - Container Ship / 2019-04-29 - 2019-05-30 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Conger - Container Ship / 2018-07-16 - 2018-12-14 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: KOYSUG - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-15 - 2021-04-19 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Sormovskiy 71 - General cargo / 2020-04-28 - 2020-07-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Sormovskiy 71 - General cargo / 2019-08-27 - 2019-12-25 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: SYNERGY-2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-29 - 2019-04-11 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: VF Tanker -12 - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-12 - 2018-07-05 (3 месяца)
Master: M/T Centenario - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-03 - 2024-03-20 (3 года)
Chief Officer: M/T Neo Trader - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-03 - 2021-02-24 (4 года)
Chief Officer: M/T Star Baboa - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-09-28 - 2016-02-22 (2 года)
Chief Officer: M/T Kelly Trader - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-05-17 - 2012-12-18 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M/T Centenario Trader - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-12-08 - 2012-05-14 (3 года)
Master: Pola Onega - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-07 - 2022-10-30 (4 месяца)
Master: Pola Onega - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-09 - 2022-02-28 (3 месяца)
Master: Pola Ilaria - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-10 - 2021-05-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: WL Uglich - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-17 - 2020-10-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pola Onega - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-11 - 2019-12-06 (5 месяцев)