Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Evmar - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-14 - 2023-09-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Achilleas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-07 - 2022-07-06 (11 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ferbec - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-30 - 2020-03-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Flamenco - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-09 - 2019-09-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ferbec - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-03 - 2019-03-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Olga - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-18 - 2023-09-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Helga - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-23 - 2023-02-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Onego Bora - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-10-21 - 2022-05-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Falkenberg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-01-04 - 2020-10-12 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Goteborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-08 - 2019-07-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mesdar - VLCC / 2023-04-12 - 2023-08-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mesdar - VLCC / 2022-08-24 - 2023-01-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mesdar - VLCC / 2022-06-15 - 2022-07-04 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Mesdar - VLCC / 2021-12-16 - 2022-05-06 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Mesdar - VLCC / 2021-02-11 - 2021-07-25 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Iolcos Dignity - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-27 - 2023-07-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Iolcos Dignity - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-20 - 2021-12-28 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Iolcos Confidence - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-28 - 2020-08-19 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Iolcos Ambition - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-12 - 2019-06-30 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Evangelia Petrakis - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-19 - 2018-08-12 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Marinicki - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-20 - 2023-07-06 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SERENE JESSICA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-19 - 2022-09-14 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SHUANG XI - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-14 - 2021-09-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SHUANG XI - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-19 - 2021-02-17 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BRYANT - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-26 - 2019-12-03 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SAGA - Floating Hotel / 2023-04-18 - 2023-05-30 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Connemara - Ferry / 2023-01-06 - 2023-03-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Connemara - Ferry / 2022-11-07 - 2022-12-10 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Connemara - RO-RO / 2022-09-16 - 2022-10-13 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Connemara - RO-RO / 2022-07-21 - 2022-08-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Pacific Trader - Chemical tanker / 2023-01-14 - 2023-05-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jason - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-21 - 2022-07-08 (6 месяцев)
Master: Primo 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-19 - 2021-03-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Boray - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-12-14 - 2019-04-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Boray - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-03-30 - 2018-07-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Supra Thessal - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-03 - 2023-05-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mike Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-31 - 2022-08-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Dory - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-06 - 2021-12-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Antero - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-05 - 2021-04-25 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Um Elhanaya - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-24 - 2020-02-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sutton Tide - AHTS / 2023-01-08 - 2023-05-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Foster Tide - AHTS / 2022-07-05 - 2022-09-12 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Foster Tide - AHTS / 2022-01-21 - 2022-04-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sentosa - AHT / 2021-08-16 - 2021-10-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Harthy Tide - AHTS / 2021-05-14 - 2021-05-27 (13 дней)
Chief Officer: M. T. MEZAIRA'A - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-08 - 2023-04-17 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: M. T. MEZAIRA'A - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-02 - 2022-08-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HILI - VLCC / 2021-07-18 - 2021-12-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BANI YAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-17 - 2020-10-04 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BANI YAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-05 - 2019-09-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-08 - 2023-02-26 (6 месяцев)
Navigation Officer: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-28 - 2021-11-19 (6 месяцев)
Navigation Officer: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-03 - 2021-04-22 (8 месяцев)
Navigation Officer: Ocean Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-22 - 2019-08-23 (5 месяцев)
Safety Officer: Ocean Brother Shipping Company LTD. - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-14 - 2019-03-21 (1 месяц)
Master: LINDA I - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-03-29 - 2023-09-30 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-01 - 2023-01-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-22 - 2022-05-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Abu Dhabi - III - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-25 - 2021-09-21 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Taipan - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-24 - 2020-07-07 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KPS Turker Bey - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-09-18 - 2022-12-05 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Euphrates - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-11-25 - 2022-02-12 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: OOC Tiger - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-08-11 - 2021-11-09 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ocean Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2021-01-24 - 2021-04-20 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Diamond-T - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-23 - 2021-01-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: wilson Borg - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-11 - 2022-11-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: wilson Borg - General cargo / 2018-01-10 - 2022-01-10 (4 года)
Chief Officer: wilson Borg - Bulk Carrier / 2013-01-10 - 2017-01-10 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Silver Hessa - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-04 - 2022-10-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Gulf Huwaylat - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-01 - 2021-11-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NCC Huda - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-31 - 2021-01-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NCC Mekka - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-17 - 2020-02-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NCC Huda - Chemical tanker / 2019-01-22 - 2019-05-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Southern Liner - General cargo / 2022-06-14 - 2022-09-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Marielyst - Container Ship / 2019-11-15 - 2019-12-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Sky - Container Ship / 2017-06-13 - 2017-10-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Grande Atlantico - RO-RO / 2016-11-29 - 2017-01-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Grande Argentina - RO-RO / 2016-02-03 - 2016-03-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Wilson Maas - Dry Cargo / 2022-06-12 - 2022-09-11 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Wilson Cadiz - Dry Cargo / 2021-09-05 - 2022-02-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Wilson Cadiz - Dry Cargo / 2021-02-19 - 2021-06-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Wilson Cadiz - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-17 - 2020-09-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Wilson Cadiz - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-19 - 2019-12-13 (4 месяца)
Master: Inda - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-05 - 2022-09-09 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Linda - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-14 - 2022-02-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Lady D - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-20 - 2021-05-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Clio - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-07 - 2020-02-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Clio - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-02 - 2019-06-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: M/TKR EBC MARICEL 1 - Citrus Juice Tanker / 2022-03-14 - 2022-07-13 (4 месяца)
OS: Monte Pascoal - Container Ship / 2021-01-24 - 2021-10-31 (9 месяцев)
OS: Leda maersk - Container Ship / 2020-01-01 - 2020-09-06 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M/TKR TAPILON - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-27 - 2019-07-26 (1 год)
2nd Officer: M/TKR TAPILON - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-07-13 - 2018-06-26 (11 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bengel - AHT / 2022-04-24 - 2022-06-08 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Bengel - AHT / 2021-10-27 - 2021-12-03 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: NORMAND PIONEER - Tug boat / 2021-07-30 - 2021-08-16 (1 месяц)
Marine Coordinator: NORMAND JARL - Tug boat / 2020-06-26 - 2020-10-20 (4 месяца)