Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Master: CATHERINE BRIGHT / PANAMA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-13 - 2021-03-06 (6 месяцев)
Master: SKY LOVER - General cargo / 2020-01-24 - 2020-07-25 (6 месяцев)
Master: Atlantic Warrior (Sea Condor) - Other vessels / 2019-02-14 - 2019-08-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ANL EUROA - Container Ship / 2015-11-10 - 2016-04-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: OTTERHOUND - Container Ship / 2014-09-17 - 2014-12-21 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM CHATEAU D'IF - Container Ship / 2015-08-06 - 2015-12-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Northern Promotion - Container Ship / 2015-03-30 - 2015-06-26 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: NORTHERN DECISION - Container Ship / 2014-08-12 - 2014-12-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: WILHELM E - Container Ship / 2014-03-28 - 2014-07-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: NORTHERN ENDURANCE - Container Ship / 2013-06-05 - 2013-11-10 (5 месяцев)
Master: Pieter Caland - Dredger / 2018-04-12 - 2019-06-30 (1 год)
Master: Marquis de Prie - Barge / 2015-12-21 - 2018-03-11 (2 года)
Chief Officer: Le Guerrier - Barge / 2015-07-06 - 2015-08-17 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Le Guerrier - Barge / 2015-04-04 - 2015-05-26 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Le Guerrier - Barge / 2014-12-28 - 2015-02-16 (2 месяца)
Master: Crest Spartan 1 - Cable laying vessel / 2019-09-10 - 2021-06-30 (1 год)
Master: Fugro Searcher - Research vessel / 2012-07-22 - 2018-12-10 (6 лет)
Chief Officer: BGP Explorer - Seismic vessel / 2011-09-14 - 2012-05-25 (8 месяцев)
Master: Nordic Ventura - Seismic vessel / 2009-11-20 - 2011-06-15 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Falcon Explorer - Seismic vessel / 2007-03-10 - 2009-09-15 (2 года)
Chief Officer: St. Johannis - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-04-23 - 2011-09-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: St. Michaelis - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-08-18 - 2010-12-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Pretty Jewelry - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-12-13 - 2010-05-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: OVERSEAS ORION - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-03-25 - 2009-07-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: PRETTY SCENE - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-10-08 - 2009-03-01 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: TIEN HAU - Bulk Carrier / 2010-12-04 - 2011-06-02 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: DORIC GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2010-02-03 - 2010-11-30 (10 месяцев)
AB Seaman: S RAFAEL - Container Ship / 2009-07-10 - 2010-01-30 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: s rafael - Container Ship / 2008-12-10 - 2009-05-16 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Alberta - Bulk Carrier / 2007-12-23 - 2008-09-30 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Amalia - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-04-19 - 2024-08-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Amalia - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-08 - 2023-12-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: M/T ARIANE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-26 - 2023-05-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FRONT LYNX - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-13 - 2022-10-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Front Jaguar - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-18 - 2021-12-31 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hav Pike - General cargo / 2024-04-02 - 2024-08-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Germanica Hav - General cargo / 2023-12-08 - 2024-03-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Germanica Hav - General cargo / 2023-05-21 - 2023-09-05 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ice Grace - Reefer / 2022-09-22 - 2023-01-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Baltic Jasmine - Reefer / 2022-02-25 - 2022-07-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KATHRINE KOSAN - LPG / LNG / 2024-02-21 - 2024-07-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BWEK ANHOLT - LPG / LNG / 2023-03-25 - 2023-09-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BOW GUARDIAN - LPG / LNG / 2022-06-13 - 2022-11-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vivian - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-11 - 2022-02-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Queen Zenobia` - LPG / LNG / 2021-02-24 - 2021-06-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Star Energy - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-03-07 - 2024-07-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea shell - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-06-23 - 2023-12-24 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea shell - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-10 - 2023-01-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: STK-1016 - Dry Cargo / 2024-05-25 - 2024-07-17 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Pyatlin - Dry Cargo / 2023-05-27 - 2023-10-18 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Baltiyskiy-202 - Dry Cargo / 2022-06-09 - 2023-02-11 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: A380 - RO-RO / 2024-06-04 - 2024-07-13 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Orel-5 - General cargo / 2023-08-08 - 2024-04-05 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Orel-5 - General cargo / 2022-08-06 - 2023-02-19 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Orel-5 - General cargo / 2021-11-11 - 2022-08-04 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Orel-5 - General cargo / 2021-02-03 - 2021-06-11 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: LORAX - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-12-05 - 2024-06-29 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: PAPILLON - Chemical tanker / 2023-01-13 - 2023-07-21 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MILOU - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-09 - 2022-09-17 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sunshine - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-14 - 2021-11-11 (8 месяцев)
Junior officer: Papillon - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-16 - 2020-09-27 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MIHELLE 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-02 - 2024-06-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: LADA 2005 - General cargo / 2023-05-24 - 2023-10-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: VOGE MIA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-17 - 2024-06-24 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ROSTRUM AFRICA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-22 - 2023-10-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ROSTRUM EUROPE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-14 - 2022-09-29 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: ROSTRUM EUROPE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-19 - 2022-06-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ARMADA HIBISCUS - Accommodation barge / 2024-03-14 - 2024-06-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ARMADA HIBISCUS - Accommodation barge / 2023-09-14 - 2023-12-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: MAGDA - Accommodation barge / 2023-06-09 - 2023-07-24 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: MAGDA - Accommodation barge / 2023-03-18 - 2023-05-29 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: MAGDA - Accommodation barge / 2022-10-27 - 2023-01-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: MV. ARTABAZ - Container Ship / 2024-03-01 - 2024-06-08 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: MT. JIONVILLE I - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-10 - 2023-09-29 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MT. ANDIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-04 - 2023-03-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: MV.GOLBON - Container Ship / 2022-10-11 - 2022-10-28 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: MV.SHIBA - Container Ship / 2021-12-05 - 2022-05-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Johann - General cargo / 2024-01-15 - 2024-05-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ruhrtal - General cargo / 2023-03-10 - 2023-07-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Emstal - General cargo / 2022-05-12 - 2022-09-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Danae R - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-12 - 2021-11-19 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Danae R - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-19 - 2021-06-02 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Mezaira’a - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-12-05 - 2024-05-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bani Yas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-25 - 2023-09-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mezaira’a - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-06 - 2023-01-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bani Yas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-30 - 2022-05-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bani Yas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-10 - 2021-08-02 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: WHISTLER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-02 - 2024-05-07 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MANDARIN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-26 - 2023-07-01 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: BLACKY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-06 - 2022-08-22 (10 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SEAPEARL - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-08 - 2021-05-15 (11 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SEALION - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-29 - 2020-01-20 (2 месяца)