Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: Chrysalis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-27 - 2023-03-09 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Stealth haralambos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-01 - 2022-04-21 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Chios Lion - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-27 - 2021-06-30 (9 месяцев)
AB / Welder: CMA CGM CENDRILLON - Container Ship / 2021-09-20 - 2022-04-09 (7 месяцев)
AB / Crane Operator: CMA CGM HERODOTE - Container Ship / 2020-09-20 - 2021-05-19 (8 месяцев)
OS: CMACGM CARL ANTONIE - Container Ship / 2020-01-22 - 2020-07-18 (6 месяцев)
OS: Hamburg - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-21 - 2014-11-23 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Bugas - Tug boat / 2013-10-24 - 2013-12-22 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: MV Hongli 8 - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-15 - 2022-02-17 (1 год)
Deck Cadet: MV Aoli 5 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-25 - 2020-02-20 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Graf - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-25 - 2021-12-31 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: VISMAR - Reefer / 2021-05-09 - 2021-10-28 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: VISMAR - Reefer / 2020-05-18 - 2020-10-30 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Prometheus - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-05 - 2021-08-19 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-26 - 2022-07-30 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Guardians - Chemical tanker / 2021-01-19 - 2021-08-30 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Guardians - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-03 - 2020-09-05 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Guardians - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-15 - 2020-07-02 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sonangol Girassol - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-03-25 - 2019-10-04 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: NYK Delphinus - Container Ship / 2022-08-18 - 2023-04-23 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M/V MOUNT KINABALU - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-01 - 2020-08-27 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: M/V MOUNT KINABALU - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-20 - 2020-06-30 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M/V HANDAN STEEL - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-12 - 2019-06-24 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M/V SHAGANG GIANT - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-21 - 2018-09-26 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Rixta Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-25 - 2022-01-27 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Corato - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-30 - 2021-02-16 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Unity Force - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-01 - 2020-01-23 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MG Neptune - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-28 - 2018-09-24 (11 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Glovis Mermaid - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-28 - 2017-03-27 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Star Flyer - Passenger vessel / 2019-07-13 - 2020-01-18 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sayan Polaris - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-09-04 - 2019-10-10 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Sayan Polaris - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-08-02 - 2019-09-03 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Baltika - MRSV / 2019-02-04 - 2019-06-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Spasatel Karev - MRSV / 2018-04-26 - 2018-06-21 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Baltika - MRSV / 2017-08-22 - 2017-12-21 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: YORK - Container Ship / 2018-10-19 - 2019-04-27 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SEALAND NEW YORK - Container Ship / 2018-02-04 - 2018-08-03 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SEALAND MICHIGAN - Container Ship / 2017-04-28 - 2017-12-02 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SEALAND ILLINOIS - Container Ship / 2016-08-20 - 2016-12-14 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Norgas Innovation - LPG / LNG / 2016-05-08 - 2016-10-31 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Norgas Invention - LPG / LNG / 2015-06-16 - 2015-11-04 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sanar-2 - Chemical tanker / 2016-05-17 - 2016-09-17 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Nordic Sprite - Crude Oil Tanker / 2010-08-30 - 2011-03-31 (7 месяцев)
Junior officer: Nordic Sprite - Crude Oil Tanker / 2009-11-29 - 2010-04-26 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Wan Hai 802 - Container Ship / 2016-12-01 - 2017-04-01 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Wan hai 802 - Container Ship / 2016-05-01 - 2016-09-01 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: MSC Vienna - Container Ship / 2015-08-28 - 2016-01-12 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: МИР - Sailing Vessel / 2015-06-27 - 2015-09-28 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Geo Caspian - Seismic vessel / 2015-05-25 - 2015-07-04 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Iskatel - Drilling Vessel / 2014-08-11 - 2014-10-20 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Kapitan Shiriaev - Bunkering Vessel / 2012-08-01 - 2013-01-31 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Poseidon Express - RO-RO / 2014-06-26 - 2014-08-29 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: Poseidon Express - RO-RO / 2014-06-16 - 2014-06-26 (10 дней)
AB Seaman: Divina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-07-19 - 2014-02-27 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: ARISTEA M - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-26 - 2013-03-15 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: ST. PETER - Bulk Carrier / 2011-12-10 - 2012-03-25 (3 месяца)
AB Seaman: ST. PETER - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-21 - 2011-12-09 (3 месяца)
OS: ST. PETER - Bulk Carrier / 2011-05-17 - 2011-09-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Batur - General cargo / 2012-02-15 - 2012-07-29 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Ergene - Dry Cargo / 2011-08-19 - 2012-01-09 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Svetla - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-25 - 2011-03-16 (8 месяцев)