Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
AB Seaman: M/t "CARUZO" TBR "OSPREY" - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-20 - 2023-08-28 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M/t "ZEVS" - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-25 - 2022-07-18 (9 месяцев)
OS: M/T "CRIMSON" TBR "RIMSON" - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-13 - 2021-08-10 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Aviona - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-16 - 2023-06-24 (8 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Karelia II - Fishing vessel / 2022-09-30 - 2023-02-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Tosa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-13 - 2023-07-07 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: TSUGARU - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-25 - 2022-11-13 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: One Falcon - Container Ship / 2021-08-31 - 2022-02-16 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M.T TENJUN - VLCC / 2020-12-06 - 2021-04-28 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M.T.TOYA - VLCC / 2020-03-21 - 2020-09-30 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: APL DUBLIN - Container Ship / 2021-12-30 - 2022-10-08 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: APL LE HAVRE - Container Ship / 2021-08-11 - 2021-11-05 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: APL VANDA - Container Ship / 2020-11-14 - 2021-05-14 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: AZOV - Chemical tanker / 2022-08-31 - 2022-10-08 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Captain Ivan Vikulov - General cargo / 2021-01-19 - 2021-02-27 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Almuntazah - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-15 - 2023-05-05 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Unicom Alpha - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-30 - 2022-09-20 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: TORO - Chemical tanker / 2022-04-02 - 2022-07-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Iskatel - ROV Support vessel / 2014-03-11 - 2014-07-08 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Юрий Лисянский - Icebreaker / 2012-11-01 - 2013-01-01 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: PMS Seagull - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-27 - 2022-07-24 (11 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Victoria - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-15 - 2021-03-16 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sophiana - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-03 - 2020-03-07 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Tesoro - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-07 - 2019-04-30 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Rego - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-15 - 2018-04-19 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Hunter - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-10 - 2022-03-07 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Kapitan Margun - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-24 - 2021-08-23 (4 месяца)
Trainee Officer: Harbour Feature - Chemical tanker / 2021-09-19 - 2022-02-25 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Harbour Progress - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-22 - 2021-03-30 (3 месяца)
Deck Cadet: STI Wembley - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-22 - 2020-08-28 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Daniel - Container Ship / 2019-07-23 - 2019-09-27 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Training Ship / 2018-03-23 - 2019-08-30 (1 год)
3rd Officer: Oriental Acacia - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-18 - 2021-12-12 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: ESER K - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-20 - 2019-03-30 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M T AL AGAILA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-08-01 - 2018-03-07 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: DDKG2 - Drilling platform / 2015-03-02 - 2017-01-26 (1 год)
Deck Cadet: GSF EXPLORER - Drilling platform / 2013-07-21 - 2014-12-16 (1 год)
3rd Officer: ECOSTORY - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-15 - 2021-10-05 (6 месяцев)
OS: LEON - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-12 - 2020-07-24 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: AFINA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-04 - 2017-08-26 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Federal cedar - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-18 - 2021-09-07 (11 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Saga adventure - General cargo / 2019-11-01 - 2020-06-07 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: AL SHAFFIAH - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-29 - 2021-03-12 (8 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT TRANZNAV HAZEL - Chemical tanker / 2016-06-07 - 2016-12-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT ELOHIM - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-04-16 - 2015-11-13 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM MUSSET - Container Ship / 2020-06-27 - 2021-02-15 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MONTESTENA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-12 - 2020-12-12 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MONTE ULIA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-11 - 2019-12-23 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kaley - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-13 - 2022-02-26 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Strange Attractor - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-16 - 2020-09-11 (1 год)
3rd Officer: Kennadi - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-02 - 2019-04-16 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Madredeus - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-07 - 2018-01-16 (8 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Cielo di Capalbio - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-27 - 2016-07-07 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-09 - 2020-04-25 (8 месяцев)
OS: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-20 - 2019-03-30 (6 месяцев)
OS: Pictor J - Container Ship / 2017-05-12 - 2018-01-14 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Pictor J - Container Ship / 2016-04-19 - 2016-11-25 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Swissco Neptune - Research vessel / 2019-08-07 - 2019-12-07 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: MSC Sines R - Container Ship / 2021-12-24 - 2022-08-07 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Celsius London - Container Ship / 2021-03-26 - 2021-10-10 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Dakota - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-22 - 2020-12-17 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Norma - General cargo / 2019-02-02 - 2019-10-12 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Atria - General cargo / 2018-01-04 - 2018-06-27 (6 месяцев)