Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: CAPTAIN MICHALIS - Pilot boat / 2017-11-08 - 2018-01-09 (2 months)
2nd Officer: CANOPUS - Reefer / 2017-06-01 - 2018-01-01 (7 months)
OS: MSC "Suez" - Container Ship / 2017-07-27 - 2017-12-21 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: PTR-509 - Other vessels / 2015-06-16 - 2015-10-26 (4 months)
Messman: MOTTLER - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-22 - 2017-12-14 (7 months)
Messman: MV Silver - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-04 - 2017-02-20 (7 months)
Cook Assistant: MV Deep True - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-29 - 2015-09-30 (6 months)
Motorman: Hasan - Other vessels / 2017-10-09 - 2017-12-08 (2 months)
Motorman: "EBESU" - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-17 - 2017-12-07 (2 months)
Motorman: "Волк -Арктики" - Fishing vessel / 2017-01-05 - 2017-07-10 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Семён Будённый - Passenger vessel / 2017-04-26 - 2017-10-10 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Сапфир - Passenger vessel / 2016-05-23 - 2016-08-21 (3 months)
Oiler: MV SAND WEAVER - Dredger / 2016-12-12 - 2017-09-25 (9 months)
Trainee Wiper: MV SUWERTE - Landing Craft / 2015-04-01 - 2016-08-01 (1 year)
Motorman: Geofizik - Barge / 2017-05-01 - 2017-08-31 (4 months)
OS: Portovik - Tug boat / 2017-05-22 - 2017-07-22 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: MV GOLDEN SKY 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-31 - 2017-05-17 (10 months)
Motorman: Vancouver - General cargo / 2017-03-08 - 2017-04-21 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Universal Baltimore - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-15 - 2015-12-15 (7 months)
OS: Хаджибей - Passenger vessel / 2017-01-25 - 2017-03-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: konkvest - Tug boat / 2017-01-18 - 2017-03-20 (2 months)
Motorman: Hetman Sagaidachny frigate - Fishing vessel / 2012-04-05 - 2013-04-05 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Vancouver - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-14 - 2017-01-17 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Vancouver - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-06 - 2017-01-15 (7 months)
El. Engineer: dd - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-01 - 2016-12-14 (13 days)
ETO: as - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-06 - 2016-12-14 (8 days)
El. Engineer: aaaa - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-01 - 2016-11-02 (1 day)
El. Engineer: a - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-01 - 2016-11-02 (1 day)
Chief Officer: Kish spring - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-11-30 - 2016-07-29 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Smarghand - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-05-25 - 2015-07-24 (1 year)
3rd Officer: SCF Baikal - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-14 - 2016-06-28 (4 months)
3rd Officer: SCF Baikal - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-04-27 - 2015-09-27 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Petrokrepost - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-08-11 - 2015-01-25 (5 months)